ANDERSON v. OMAR
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 1994-1-CV-740012

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 23, 2018 at 2:22 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Cafe Sophia Cafe Sophia, Defendant
No Logo Anderson, James E., Plaintiff/Cross Defendant
No Logo Omar, Sophia K., Defendant/Cross Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Packard
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Document: Other
ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY:; PACKARD, LAW OFFICES OF DAVID R.; PACKARD, DAVID R.; 706 COWPER STREET; PALO ALTO, CA 94301-2604; Legacy Name = Attorney Information; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
    Blank 15 Filed: 6/28/2003, Entered: None Not Active
    Case data converted on 06/28/2003; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
      Blank 14 Filed: 5/12/1995, Entered: None Request Dismissal
      REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION; WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY DAVID PACKARD, ESQ.; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
        Blank 13 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: None statement
        STATEMENT AGREEMENT OF MEDIATION IN FULL FILED; BY MEIDATOR THOMAS REESE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
          Blank 12 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: None stipulation
          STIP & ORDER RE: WAIVING 90 DAY RULE; BY:JUDGE RUSHING; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
            Blank 11 Filed: 1/27/1995, Entered: None stipulation
            STIP & ORDER FOR MEDIATION IN LIEU OF JUDICIAL; ARBITRATION SIGNED HON. AMBLER; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
              Blank 10 Filed: 12/30/1994, Entered: None Substitution-Attorney
              SUB OF ATTY FOR PLTF, JAMES E. ANDERSON; OLD: (JAMES BAGEMAN) NEW:(PAUL E. RICE; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                Blank 9 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: None Notice
                875 - ORDERED REMOVED FROM ARB/MEDIATION; ARBITRATION HEARING DATE; (INFORMATION ONLY); PER LETTER FROM JOHN MCBRIDE; Decision = M; Closed = 01/27/1995
                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/19/1994, Entered: None Notice
                  871 - RETURN OF SELECTION LIST; NOTICE - RANDOM SELECT OF ARBITRATORS; LIST OF 3 NAMES; BUSINESS PANEL; Decision = M; Closed = 09/27/1994
                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: None Stipulation and Order: ADR
                    STIP TO ARBITRATION BY ALL PARITES VIA CMC; DISCOVERY TO REMAIN OPEN 30 DAYS BEFORE TRIAL; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
                      ANSWER OF JAMES E. ANDERSON TO XCMPL; BY: J.C. BAGEMAN; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                        * CMCQ FILED BY DAVID R. PACKARD; STIP TO ARB/DISC OPEN (5E); Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/15/1994, Entered: None Notice
                          MEMO THAT CASE IS AT ISSUE; FILED BY J.C. BAGEMAN; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/3/1994, Entered: None Cross Complaint
                            CROSS-COMPLAINT BY SOPHIA M. OMAR; BY: DAVID R. PACKARD; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/3/1994, Entered: None Response - Other than Dissolution, 1st Paper Filing
                              ANSWER BY SOPHIA OMAR TO CMPL; BY: DAVID R. PACKARD; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003
                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/19/1994, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED; BY J.C. BAGEMAN; Decision = M; Closed = 06/28/2003

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?