Fox v. Intl Bro Teamsters, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cv-01734-DWF-AJB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Beverly Fox, Petitioner

Represented by Gregg M Corwin & Associates Law Office, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg M. Corwin +1 952 544 7774 +1 952 544 7151 gcorwin@gcorwin,com

Represented by McGrann Shea Carnival Straughn & Lamb, Chtd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda R Cefalu +1 612 338 2525 +1 612 339 2386 arc@mcgrannshea.com
v.
No Logo Northwest Airlines, Inc., Respondent

Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TIMOTHY ROBERT THORNTON +1 612 334 8400 +1 612 977 8650 tthornton@briggs.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com
Office DMN
Filed 9/20/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 740 - Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause Section 45 U.S.C. § 151 Railway Labor Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hennepin
Terminated 9/24/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Petition
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - AMENDED PETITION for review of the System Board of Adjustments Award, filed by Beverly Fox. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(VEM) Modified text on 3/23/2005 (VEM).
    LREF
    Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Order
    JUDGMENT is entered. (1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
      LREF
      Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF THE PETITION FOR REVIEW OF THE SYSTEM BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT AWARD AND ORDER (Judge Donovan W. Frank ) that the Clerk of this Court shall enter judgment dismissing the action with prejudice, without costs, attorney's fees or disbursements against either party. Further, this minor dispute shall be remanded to a System Board of Adjustment chaired by Jack Flagler for resolution pursuant to the Flight Attendant Collective Bargaining Agreement & consistent with this Court's Order in this case [20-1],[1-1], [1-2]. (4pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DDB)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
        ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Timothy Gary Gelinske for Northwest Airlines and substituting attorney Kevin M. Magnuson. (1pg(s) (DDB)
          LREF
          Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          AMENDED NOTICE OF ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan / 8/28/02) Pretrial conference set for 10:00 am on 9/19/02; Rule 26(f) report ddl set for 9/13/02 4 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
            LREF
            Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan / 8/9/02) ; pretrial conference set for 10:00 on 9/19/02 ; Rule 26(f) report ddl set for 9/13/02 . (5 pgs) (cc: all counsel) (MKC)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/3/2002 Answer
              ANSWER by respondent Northwest Airlines to the amended petition for review of the System Board of Adjusment's Award. (3 pg(s) (DDB)
                LREF
                Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW OF THE SYSTEM BOARD AWARD AND ORDER (Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ). (3pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                  AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW OF THE SYSTEM BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT'S AWARD by pet per the Court's Order dated 6/18/2. (26pg(s) (DDB)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER AND MEMORANDUM ( Judge Donovan W. Frank / 6/18/02) Mag. Judge Boylan's Report and Recommendaiton dated 4/18/02 [16] is adopted. Respondent's motion to dismiss is denied contingent upon petitioner submitting an appropriate amended complaint within 10 days of the date of this order. (c: attys.) 4pgs (JMR)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by petitioner to report & recommendation objection [17-1], [16-1] 8pg(s) (JMR)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                        OBJECTIONS by respondent Northwest Airlines to the 4/18/02 Report and Recommendation [16-1] 12pg(s) (JMR)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002, Terminated: 6/19/2002 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan / 4/18/02) that respondent's motion to dismiss be denied, contingent upon petitioner submitting an appropriate amended complaint within 10 days from the date upon which the District Court denies said motion [14-1] 7pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                            NOTICE by petitioner Beverly Fox of association of counsel Amanda R Cefalu (MMC)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              MINUTES:( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan /) Def's motion to dismiss . Under advisement. [14-1] (1 pg) (MKC)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                Amended Notice and MOTION by respondent Northwest Airlines to dismiss ( to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) ret. 4/11/02 at 11:00 a.m. 2pg(s) (JMR)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Affidavit
                                  AFFIDAVIT of Kevin M. Magnuson 2pg(s) + exhibits (separate) (JMR)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM by respondent Northwest Airlines in support of motion to dismiss [3-1] 19pg(s) (JMR)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY memorandum by respondent Northwest Airlines to motion to dismiss [3-1] 11pg(s) (JMR)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Affidavit
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Amanda R. Cefalu 2pg(s) + exhibits (separate) (JMR)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          REPLY memorandum in opposition by petitioner to motion to dismiss [3-1] 19pg(s) (JMR)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Affidavit
                                            AFFIDAVIT of Kevin M. Magnuson 2pg(s) + exhibits (separate) (JMR)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM by respondent Northwest Airlines in support of motion to dismiss [3-1] 29pg(s) (JMR)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Judge Donovan W. Frank ) of dismissal of respondent Teamsters Local Union No. 2000, only, with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs terminating party Intl Brotherhood of Teamsters 2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (JMR)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER OF REFERENCE ( Judge Donovan W. Frank / 11/19/1) that deft Northwest Airlines Inc's motion to dismiss (Doc #3) is referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan [3-1]. (1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES ( Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum / 11/7/1) Case reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and Case referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan (1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                      RULE 12 MOTION by res Inc. Northwest Airlines to dismiss (was to Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum - now to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan) (5pg(s) (DDB) Modified on 11/21/2001
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE of summons & complaint executed upon res Intl Bro Teamsters & Northwest Airlines on 9/20/01. (3pg(s) (DDB)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                          PETITION by pet for review of the System Board of Adjustment's Award ( to Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) (23pg(s) Assigned per Master List to Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. Receipt #242502 (DDB) Modified on 11/09/2001
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?