Blueitt v. Collier
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04464

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 12, 2020 at 4:22 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Earnest Blueitt, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #02145450

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Earnest Blueitt, Jr
v.
No Logo Bryan Collier, Defendant
No Logo DA Ruby, Defendant
No Logo Kelvin Bett, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/12/2020, Entered: None Order Denying Certificate of Appealability
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Final
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None return of service unexecuted
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None return of service unexecuted
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None return of service unexecuted
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None return of service unexecuted
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Opinion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                                          NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (PRIVATE PDF)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (PRIVATE PDF)
                                              Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Earnest Blueitt, Jr, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                  MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Earnest Blueitt, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/17/2018. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                                                      Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Kelvin Bett, Bryan Collier, DA Ruby (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Earnest Blueitt, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Attachments, # 3 Cover Letter, # 4 Envelope)(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?