Dewitt v. Solarcity Engineering Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, Case No. 37-2018-00023408-CU-OE-CTL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dewitt, Justin, Plaintiff
v.
SolarCity Engineering, Inc. SolarCity Engineering, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018
Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation to Submit Case to Binding Arbitration and Request for Stay Pending Arbitration) filed by Dewitt, Justin; SolarCity Engineering Inc.
    Blank 10 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018
    Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/07/2018 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.
      Blank 9 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018
      The Status Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 12/07/2018 at 10:00:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.
        Blank 8 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018
        Proof of Service filed by Dewitt, Justin.
          Blank 7 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018
          Summons issued.
            Blank 6 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018
            Case initiation form printed.
              Blank 5 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018
              Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/12/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.
                Blank 4 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018
                Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.
                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018
                  Original Summons filed by Dewitt, Justin. Refers to: SolarCity Engineering Inc
                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018
                    Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dewitt, Justin. Refers to: SolarCity Engineering Inc
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018
                      Complaint filed by Dewitt, Justin. Refers to: SolarCity Engineering Inc

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 15 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?