Lumsden v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04470

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2020 at 12:40 PM DT (7.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Raymond Lumsden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #2109472

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond Lumsden
v.
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID, Defendant
No Logo Mark Harris, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Givens, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Return of Property
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Return of Property
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Initial Partial Filing Fee
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal (FORM,noticing) - Civil
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (PRIVATE PDF)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal (FORM,noticing) - Civil
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Certified Mail Receipt Returned
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Final
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Transfer Case (to a different court)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                        AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID, Mark Harris filed by Raymond Lumsden. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Request for Production of Documents
                                          REQUEST for Production of Documents from Defendant by Raymond Lumsden, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(XavierAvalos, 7)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER Striking Doc. 1 the complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this case within 30 days of this order. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                Continuation of Exhibit E re: 1 Complaint by Raymond Lumsden, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                                                    NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) Modified file date on 11/27/2018 (SarahShelby, 4). (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                        MOTION /Memorandum of Law in Support for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Raymond Lumsden, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                            MOTION for Class Certification by Raymond Lumsden, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Appointment
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Appointment
                                                                MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Raymond Lumsden, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/17/2018. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                    MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Raymond Lumsden, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/17/2018. (SarahShelby, 4)` (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                                                                        Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID, John Doe(Major Castillo, in both his individual and official capacity), John Doe(Major Robinson, in both his individual and official capacity), Ronald Givens, Mark Harris (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Raymond Lumsden. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Cover Letter, # 7 Envelope)(SarahShelby, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2018: # 8 Summons) (SarahShelby, 4). (Entered: 11/27/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?