PROETTI v. ZIMMER INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-11080

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 26, 2019 at 4:17 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Susan Proetti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cechi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James E Cecchi +1 973 994 1700 +1 973 994 1744 JCecchi@CarellaByrne.com
v.
No Logo Zimmer Holdings,Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MACCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY EDWARD J. FANNING, JR. +1 973 622 4444 efanning@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jean P Patterson +1 973 622 4444 +1 973 624 7070 jpatterson@mccarter.com
No Logo Zimmer, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MACCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY EDWARD J. FANNING, JR. +1 973 622 4444 efanning@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jean P Patterson +1 973 622 4444 +1 973 624 7070 jpatterson@mccarter.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332pi
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, The Court issues this Order to, among other things, (1) adopt Plaintiffs' Leadership Structure; (2) establish direct filing; and (3) set a schedule for initial case management orders. On November 12, 2018, on behalf of the plaintiffs, Temporary Lead Counsel submitted Plaintiffs' proposed permanent leadership structure. This leadership structure included the following as further set forth in this Order. Plaintiffs' Executive Committee shall submit a proposed order defining the authority, duties, and responsibilities of counsel, including specific guidelines and rules regarding staffing, fees, expenses, and billing records, on or before January 22, 2019. The Parties will submit a direct filing order as described in Section III(a) below on or before January 21, 2019. On or before January 21, 2019, counsel for the Zimmer Defendants and Plaintiffs' Executive Committee shall meet and confer and submit joint proposed case management orders as further set forth in this Order. The Court refers the case for any desired settlement discussions with the Court to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Dkt. 28.) No action regarding settlement is ordered at this time, but the parties may contact Magistrate Judge Freeman should they wish to begin settlement discussions at some point in the future. The Court will conduct the next Status Conference on January 29, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14-C of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United State Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Counsel should check in with the Courtroom Deputy at least fifteen minutes in advance. Counsel should arrive at the Courthouse with sufficient time to go through security. Seats in the Courtroom may not be reserved. In advance of each future Status Conference, counsel for the Zimmer Defendants and Plaintiffs' Executive Committee shall meet and confer regarding the agenda for the Conference. No later than five (5) days prior to each Status Conference, counsel shall file a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) single-spaced pages and to be filed in both 18-MD-2859 and 18-MC-2859, setting forth the parties' tentative agenda and the parties' proposals on those issues (and, to the extent applicable, submitting any proposed orders-joint or otherwise-in accordance with Section VI below). SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/13/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al.(yv) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
        CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey; Case Number: 2:18-cv-12424. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of New York.(MDL 2859 CTO-3 Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.] (Entered: 11/26/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 10:30 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordereed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/12/2018. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.] (Entered: 11/12/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting 6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ZANE CHRISTIAN RIESTER terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/18/18. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.] (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Zane C. Riester) by ZIMMER HOLDINGS,INC., ZIMMER, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(RIESTER, ZANE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by JEAN PAIGE PATTERSON on behalf of ZIMMER HOLDINGS,INC., ZIMMER, INC. (PATTERSON, JEAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER to Complaint by ZIMMER HOLDINGS,INC., ZIMMER, INC..(RIESTER, ZANE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. FANNING, JR on behalf of ZIMMER HOLDINGS,INC., ZIMMER, INC. (FANNING, EDWARD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZIMMER HOLDINGS,INC., ZIMMER INC. d/b/a ZIMMER BIOMET. (RIESTER, ZANE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ZIMMER HOLDINGS,INC., ZIMMER INC. d/b/a ZIMMER BIOMET from Superior Court of NJ, Law Division, Bergen County, case number BER-L-4405-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8929393), filed by ZIMMER HOLDINGS,INC., ZIMMER INC. d/b/a ZIMMER BIOMET. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notice to Adversary with attached Notice to State Court of Removal, # 3 Statement of Filing and Service)(RIESTER, ZANE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.] (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al.(sjo)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Set Deadlines as to 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Zane C. Riester). Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/28/2018.]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?