LG Electronics Inc. v. Saint Lawrence Communications LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-11082

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 28, 2020 at 11:43 AM ST (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LG Electronics Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Dryer +1 202 626 7728 dryer@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jude McKeon +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 mckeon@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Andrew Schwentker +1 202 626 6357 schwentker@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Anh Vu Chu +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 chu@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Walsh Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SELINA MIRIAM ELLIS +1 973 757 1100 sellis@thewalshfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PETER JOSEPH PIZZI +1 973 757 1100 +1 973 757 1090 ppizzi@thewalshfirm.com
v.
No Logo Saint Lawrence Communications LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Anaipakos, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amir H. Alavi +1 713 655 1101 +1 713 655 0062 aalavi@azalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Demetrios Anaipakos +1 713 655 1101 +1 713 655 0062 danaipakos@azalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Masood Anjom +1 713 655 1101 +1 713 655 0062 masood.anjom@azalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Weining Bai +1 713 655 1101 wbai@azalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Yee-Jin Chen +1 713 655 1101 +1 713 655 0062 jchen@azalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott W Clark +1 713 655 1101 +1 713 655 0062 sclark@azalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alisa Anne Lipski +1 713 600 4948 +1 713 655 0062 alipski@azalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Dean McBride +1 713 600 4940 mmcbride@azalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Ervin Simmons +1 713 655 1101 +1 713 655 0062 bsimmons@azalaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332bc
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (224) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None extension of time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of COMPLIANCE REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,. (Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of COMPLIANCE REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Clark, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/23/2019) (gr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/23/2019) (gr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,. (Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,. (Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Peter J. Pizzi dated 1/23/2019 re: submission of Proposed Protective Order and Proposed Order Regarding Electronically Stored Information. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,.(Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth at the pretrial conference held pursuant to Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., on January 18, 2019, the following schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case......All fact discovery must be completed by June 28, 2019.....All expert discovery must be completed by August 23, 2019.....Any motion for summary judgment -Motion served by September 20, 2019-Opposition served by October 11-Reply served by October 25.......In the event no motion is filed, the Joint Pretrial Order must be filed by September 20, 2019...... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/22/2019) (gr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 54 Motion for Weining Bai to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Weining Bai to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16193514. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit ISO Motion, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Bai, Weining)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,.(Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Alavi, Amir) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 49 Motion for Masood Anjom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 48 Motion for Justin Y. Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Masood Anjom to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16165661. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit ISO Mtn for Admission, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Anjom, Masood)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Justin Y. Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16159080. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit ISO, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 45 Motion for Michael Dean McBride to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 37 Motion for Alisa Lipski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Michael Dean McBride to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16151271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit ISO Mtn for Admission PHV, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(McBride, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation for Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC.(Anaipakos, Demetrios)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Peter J. Pizzi dated 1/4/2019 re: basis for diversity of citizenship jurisdiction. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,.(Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 38 Letter filed by LG Electronics Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Redactions are approved. The 1/4/19 conference is cancelled. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/3/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC.(Anaipakos, Demetrios) Modified on 1/4/2019 (lb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 2 Complaint,. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC.(Anaipakos, Demetrios)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Peter J. Pizzi dated 1/3/2019 re: Court's December 21, 2018 Order regarding the confidentiality of the pleadings in this case. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,.(Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Alisa Lipski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16125157. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit ISO Motion, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing - CA, # 3 Cartificate of Good Standing - TX, # 4 Proposed Order)(Lipski, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: On November 28, 2018, plaintiff was granted permission to file its complaint under seal. On December 20, 2018, defendant requested permission to file its answer under seal for substantially the same reasons. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that a telephone conference is scheduled for January 4, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. to address whether the complaint and answer in this action should be filed publicly without redactions. Counsel for the defendant shall have all parties on the line and call chambers at 212-805-0202. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/21/2018) (gr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Peter J. Pizzi dated 12/21/2018 opposing defendant Saint Lawrence Communications LLC's Related Case Statement, which was filed on 12/20/2018. ENDORSEMENT: The case will remain on this Court's docket; it is not "related" to the Sony case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/21/2018) (gr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Peter J. Pizzi dated 12/21/2018 re: opposing defendant Saint Lawrence Communications LLCs Related Case Statement, filed on December 20, 2018 (Dkt. Nos. 31 & 33). Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,.(Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Statement of Relatedness
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-9518 (JSR). Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC.(Clark, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Demetrios Anaipakos dated December 20, 2018 re: Request to File Answer to LG's Complaint Under Seal. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC.(Anaipakos, Demetrios)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Statement of Relatedness
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-9518 (JSR). Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC.(Lipski, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 29 Motion for Amir H. Alavi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Amir H. Alavi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $200.00 paid, receipt no. ANYSDC-16075054. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit ISO Motion to Appear PHV, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Alavi, Amir) Modified on 12/18/2018 (bcu). Modified on 12/18/2018 (jc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Dryer on behalf of LG Electronics Inc.,. (Dryer, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Andrew Schwentker on behalf of LG Electronics Inc.,. (Schwentker, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Chu on behalf of LG Electronics Inc.,. (Chu, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Jude McKeon on behalf of LG Electronics Inc.,. (McKeon, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 20 Motion for CHRISTOPHER W. DRYER to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 19 Motion for R. ANDREW SCHWENTKER to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 18 Motion for MICHAEL J. MCKEON to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 17 Motion for CHRISTIAN A. CHU to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for CHRISTOPHER W. DRYER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16051040. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Christopher W. Dryer, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for R. ANDREW SCHWENTKER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16050999. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of R. Andrew Schwentker, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for MICHAEL J. MCKEON to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16050922. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael J. McKeon, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for CHRISTIAN A. CHU to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-16049365. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Christian A. Chu, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/11/2018) (gr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER....defendant Saint Lawrence Communications LLC's time to respond to the complaint is extended up to and including 1/3/2019. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/11/2018) (gr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 10 Motion for Scott W. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 9 Motion for Brian E. Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 8 Motion for Demetrios Anaipakos to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Scott W. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16015732. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Clark, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Brian E. Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16015708. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Simmons, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Demetrios Anaipakos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16015650. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Saint Lawrence Communications LLC served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. Service was accepted by DIANA LILLY. Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,. (Pizzi, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Selina Miriam Ellis on behalf of LG Electronics Inc.,. (Ellis, Selina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LG ELECTRONICS INC.'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL: The Court having reviewed the motion and supporting papers (including copies of the proposed complaint in redacted and unreacted form) and good cause appearing the motion is granted and IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. The Clerk shall accept for filing the original Complaint and Exhibits thereto, in unredacted form and shall seal them in accordance with the Clerk's regular processes and procedures for sealed filings. 2. The Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk with, and the Clerk shall accept for filing on the public CM/ECF system, a redacted copy of the Complaint with the allegations in paragraphs 4-5, 9-14, 16, 22-24, 28-31, 39-40, 45-49, 51 of the Complaint and Prayer for Relief paragraph (c) redacted and Exhibit A omitted. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Part I Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/28/2018) (cf) Transmission to Civil Case Openings Clerk for processing. Modified on 11/29/2018 (cf).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pne) (pc). (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401223433)Document filed by LG Electronics Inc.,.(pne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2018: # 1 Ex A, # 2 Ex B, # 3 Ex C, # 4 Ex D, # 5 Ex E, # 6 Ex F, # 7 Ex G) (pc). (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL: COMPLAINT/PETITION; OTHER DOCUMENTS/EXHIBITS (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/28/2018) (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/18/2019. (gr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 54 MOTION for Weining Bai to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16193514. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 49 MOTION for Masood Anjom to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16165661. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REJECTION OF PROPOSED ORDER TO BRING PERSONAL ELECTRONIC DEVICE(S) OR GENERAL PURPOSE COMPUTING DEVICE(S) INTO THE COURTHOUSES OF THE SDNY FOR USE IN A PROCEEDING OR TRIAL. Notice to Attorney Amir Alavi re: Document 52 Proposed Order was rejected by the Clerk's Office for the following reason, the Order to Bring Personal Electronic Device(s) or General Purpose Computing Device(s) Into the Courthouses of the SDNY for Use in a Proceeding or Trial should not be electronically filed. Please download and review the Local Rules, Judge's Individual Rules of Practice and ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (km)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 48 MOTION for Justin Y. Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16159080. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 45 MOTION for Michael Dean McBride to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16151271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Demetrios Anaipakos to RE-FILE Document 40 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 37 MOTION for Alisa Lipski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16125157. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 29 MOTION for Amir H. Alavi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 17 MOTION for CHRISTIAN A. CHU to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-16049365. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 18 MOTION for MICHAEL J. MCKEON to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16050922. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 20 MOTION for CHRISTOPHER W. DRYER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16051040. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 19 MOTION for R. ANDREW SCHWENTKER to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16050999. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 8 MOTION for Demetrios Anaipakos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16015650. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 9 MOTION for Brian E. Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16015708. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 10 MOTION for Scott W. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16015732. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Peter Joseph Pizzi for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 3 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Designated ECF. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS ISSUED as to Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?