HORNE v. ASHBRITT, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-07181

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2020 at 9:38 PM DT (6.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BARBARA ZOELLNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BARBARA ZOELLNER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BARBARA ZOELLNER
No Logo CHARLES T. WALTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CHARLES T. WALTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES T. WALTER
No Logo CHARLOTTE HORNE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CHARLOTTE HORNE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLOTTE HORNE
No Logo JAMES GEHRKE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES GEHRKE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES GEHRKE
No Logo RUTH GEHRKE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by RUTH GEHRKE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RUTH GEHRKE
No Logo WILBERT HORNE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by WILBERT HORNE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILBERT HORNE
v.
No Logo Ashbritt, Inc., Defendant
No Logo RIGHT WAY TREE AND CONSTRUCTION dba TATES TREE SERVICE AND CONSTRUCTION LLC, Defendant
No Logo Tetra Tech Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/18/2019, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?