Farrier v. Pittman
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-11524

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 7:54 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony Dwayne Farrier, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #621114

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Dwayne Farrier
v.
No Logo Darrel Vannoy, Defendant
No Logo Leon Cannizzaro, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Robin D. Pittman, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Pauper Order Directing Prisoner Payment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re 1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 12/19/2018. (jeg)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      **DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT against Leon Cannizzaro, Jr, Robin D. Pittman, Darrel Vannoy filed by Anthony Dwayne Farrier. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jeg) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?