Muehlemann v. Lange
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04491

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 1:23 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Edward Muehlemann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edward Muehlemann
v.
No Logo Bell County Jail, Defendant
No Logo Sheriff Eddy Lange, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Receipt of Transfer Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Transfer Case (to a different court)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
            Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Sheriff Eddy Lange, filed. (lrivera, 2)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
              MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Michael Edward Muehlemann, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 proceed IFP)(lrivera, 2)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Bell County Jail, Sheriff Eddy Lange (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Michael Edward Muehlemann. (Attachments: # 1 cover letter, # 2 envelope)(lrivera, 2)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?