Henderson v. State of Nevada, ex rel. its Southern Nevada Adult Mental Health Services
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01728

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 7, 2019 at 5:21 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Jobs
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                      ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 1 Complaint. State of Nevada, ex rel. answer due 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None QC Notice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None ENE Notice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Assign Judges in Civil Case
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?