Gentleman v. Davol Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01540

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 5:35 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jolene Gentleman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cutter Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/27/2018 David Nelson Henderson +1 907 677 1234 +1 888 965 9338 dh@henderson-law.com
v.
No Logo C.R. Bard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & Ball

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Darrell Kloss, Jr. +1 614 464 6360 +1 614 719 4807 wdklossjr@vorys.com
No Logo Davol Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & Ball

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Darrell Kloss, Jr. +1 614 464 6360 +1 614 719 4807 wdklossjr@vorys.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Unknown Document Type
SHORT FORM ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Kloss, William)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Order on Motion To Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David Nelson Henderson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/27/2018. (ew)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Substitute Attorney
      MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiff Jolene Gentleman. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Cutter, Curtis)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Case Transferred In - District
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 5 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?