USA v. Cohen
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00850-WHP

Tags
Last Updated January 14, 2020 at 12:32 PM ST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L. Rush Atkinson +L RAu sdojgov
v.
No Logo Cohen, Michael Dean, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Cohen"

Toggle Switch Represented by Petrillo Klein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Lester +1 212 370 0330 +1 212 370 0391 alester@pkbllp.com
Space Guy T. Petrillo +1 212 370 0330 +1 212 609 6921 gpetrillo@pkbllp.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Michael Cohen (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 11/29/2018
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
181001.F STATEMENTS OR ENTRIES GENERALLY (FALSE STATEMENTS)
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag ECF
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Sentencing Submission
      SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Michael Cohen. (Atkinson, Lawrence)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Michael Cohen. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Plea proceeding held on 11/29/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Michael Cohen re: Plea held on 11/29/18 before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 LetterCourt Filing
                  LETTER by Michael Cohen addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Guy Petrillo, Esq. dated December 7, 2018 re: Sentencing Memorandum (Lester, Amy)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER as to Michael Cohen. The United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York and the Special Counsel's Office at the U.S. Department of Justice are directed to hand deliver copies of their sentencing submissions to Chambers no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, December 7, 2018. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/5/2018) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in 18-Cr-602(WHP). ***] (bw)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018 Sentencing Submission
                          SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Michael Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37)(Lester, Amy)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Sentencing Submission
                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE [10] Sentencing Submission) - SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Michael Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37)(Lester, Amy) Modified on 12/6/2018 (db).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Guy Petrillo, Esq. dated November 29, 2018 re: Request to Transfer for Sentencing Purposes . Document filed by Michael Cohen. (Lester, Amy)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018, Terminated: 11/29/2018 Motion to transfer case
                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Transfer Case for Purposes of Sentencing. Document filed by Michael Cohen. (Lester, Amy) Modified on 11/29/2018 (ka).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amy Ruth Lester appearing for Michael Cohen. Appearance Type: Retained. (Lester, Amy)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Guy Petrillo appearing for Michael Cohen. Appearance Type: Retained. (Petrillo, Guy)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Waiver of Indictment
                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Michael Cohen. (jm)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 information - felony
                                        INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Michael Cohen (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                          NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT as to Michael Cohen, to Judge Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                            NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT as to Michael Cohen, to Judge Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Change of Not Guilty Plea
                                              Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea as to Michael Cohen (1) Count 1. (jbo)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Change of Plea Hearing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Change of Plea Hearing as to Michael Cohen held on 11/29/2018. Plea entered by Michael Cohen (1) Guilty as to Count 1. Defendant Michael Cohen appears with attorneys Guy Petrillo and Amy Lester. Jeannie Rhee, Andrew Goldstein and L. Rush Atkinson, The Special Counsel's Office, for the Government. Defendant sworn and advised of his rights. Defendant withdraws his previously entered plea of not guilty and enters a plea of GUILTY to the Sole-Count Information. Plea ACCEPTED. Defendant released ROR. See transcript for complete details. Court Reporter: Sam Mauro. (jbo)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  initial appearance
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Michael Cohen held on 11/29/2018. (jbo)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                    Attorney update in case as to Michael Cohen. Attorney Andrew D. Goldstein,Jeannie S. Rhee,L. Rush Atkinson for USA added. (jm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                      Case Designated ECF as to Michael Cohen. (jm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Notice of Intent to File Information
                                                        NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Michael Cohen. (jm)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 96 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?