Kelly v. Department of Corrections
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01883

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2020 at 7:31 PM DT (7.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bernell Edward Kelly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bernell Edward Kelly
v.
No Logo CO Oberts, Defendant
No Logo Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wisconsin Dept. of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
No Logo HSU Staff, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Mail Returned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Mail Returned
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Request
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Request
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Request
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order Directing Prisoner Payment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            LETTER from the clerk to Bernell Edward Kelly re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form and trust account statement be filed within 21 days (mac)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Bernell Edward Kelly. (mac)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Bernell Edward Kelly. (mac)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?