United States v. Lynch
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cr-00577-CRB

Tags
Last Updated May 18, 2021 at 12:05 PM DT (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam A. Reeves +1 415 436 7200 +1 415 436 7234 adam.reeves@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Michael Richard Lynch, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Michael Richard Lynch (1)
Office San Francisco
Filed 11/29/2018
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 Conspiracy to Commit Wire Fraud
Count 2-14
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 and 2 Wire Fraud
Defendant Custody Status
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/1/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Ex Parte Application
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Indictment
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: CR16-0462-CRB and CR18-0577 CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/5/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                Notice of Related Case by USA as to Michael Richard Lynch, Stephen Keith Chamberlain (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 indictment
                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Michael Richard Lynch (1) count(s) 1, 2-14, Stephen Keith Chamberlain (2) count(s) 1, 2-14. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?