Alpha Cepheus LLC v. Chu
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-14322
District Judge Madeline Cox Arleo, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 30, 2018 at 11:15 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alpha Cepheus LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parlatore Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TIMOTHY CHARLES PARLATORE +1 212 679 6312 +1 212 202 4787 timothy.parlatore@parlatorelawgroup.com
No Logo Constellation Health Investment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parlatore Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TIMOTHY CHARLES PARLATORE +1 212 679 6312 +1 212 202 4787 timothy.parlatore@parlatorelawgroup.com
No Logo Constellation Health LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parlatore Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TIMOTHY CHARLES PARLATORE +1 212 679 6312 +1 212 202 4787 timothy.parlatore@parlatorelawgroup.com
No Logo First United Health LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parlatore Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TIMOTHY CHARLES PARLATORE +1 212 679 6312 +1 212 202 4787 timothy.parlatore@parlatorelawgroup.com
No Logo Naya Constellation Health LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parlatore Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TIMOTHY CHARLES PARLATORE +1 212 679 6312 +1 212 202 4787 timothy.parlatore@parlatorelawgroup.com
v.
No Logo Chinh Chu, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cechi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY CAROLINE FABEND BARTLETT +1 973 994 1700 +1 973 994 1744 cbartlett@carellabyrne.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James E Cecchi +1 973 994 1700 +1 973 994 1744 JCecchi@CarellaByrne.com
No Logo Douglas Newton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carella, Byrne, Cechi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY CAROLINE FABEND BARTLETT +1 973 994 1700 +1 973 994 1744 cbartlett@carellabyrne.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James E Cecchi +1 973 994 1700 +1 973 994 1744 JCecchi@CarellaByrne.com
No Logo James Stepien, Defendant
No Logo Truc To, Defendant
No Logo Victor Cardona, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY HUGO R. HARMATZ +1 732 845 1331 lawyur@aol.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter from James E. Cecchi to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, USMJ. (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Letter from James E. Cecchi to Judge Arleo (Corrected). (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Letter from Hugo Harmatz, Esquire. (HARMATZ, HUGO) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Letter re 22 Notice of Appearance, 25 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Article, # 2 Exhibit B - Article, # 3 Exhibit C - MOSAIC website)(PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Letter re 26 Stipulation. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Stipulation for Extension of Time)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER by Chinh Chu, Douglas Newton. (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Letter. (HARMATZ, HUGO) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  STIPULATION by Victor Cardona. (HARMATZ, HUGO) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE by Victor Cardona (HARMATZ, HUGO) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by HUGO R. HARMATZ on behalf of Victor Cardona (HARMATZ, HUGO) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying Plaintiff's 13 Motion for an Order to Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction, etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/26/2018. (sm) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Chinh Chu, Douglas Newton re 13 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Order to Show Cause MOTION for Disclosure expedited and limited (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Chinh Chu, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 1), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Part 2), # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Declaration Douglas Newton)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chinh Chu, Douglas Newton. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration James E. Cecchi, # 2 Certification Eric J. Brenner, # 3 Certification Julian M. Beach, # 4 Certification Joseph Alm, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE F. BARTLETT on behalf of Chinh Chu, Douglas Newton (BARTLETT, CAROLINE) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E. CECCHI on behalf of Chinh Chu, Douglas Newton (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E. CECCHI on behalf of Chinh Chu, Douglas Newton (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Honorable Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J. re 14 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 13 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Order to Show Cause MOTION for Disclosure expedited and limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Criminal Complaint)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Alpha Cepheus LLC, Constellation Health Investment LLC, Constellation Health LLC, First United Health LLC, Naya Constellation Health LLC re 13 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Order to Show Cause MOTION for Disclosure expedited and limited (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Disclosure expedited and limited by Alpha Cepheus LLC, Constellation Health Investment LLC, Constellation Health LLC, First United Health LLC, Naya Constellation Health LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A - Photo, # 3 Exhibit B - Photo, # 4 Exhibit C - Police Report)(PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Victor Cardona, Chinh Chu, Douglas Newton, James Stepien, Truc To. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Constellation Health Investment LLC. (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Naya Constellation Health LLC. (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Constellation Health LLC. (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by First United Health LLC. (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alpha Cepheus LLC. (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Request for Summons to be Issued by Constellation Health LLC, First United Health LLC, Alpha Cepheus LLC, Naya Constellation Health LLC, Constellation Health Investment LLC as to Victor Cardona. (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Request for Summons to be Issued by Constellation Health LLC, First United Health LLC, Alpha Cepheus LLC, Naya Constellation Health LLC, Constellation Health Investment LLC as to James Stepien. (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Request for Summons to be Issued by Constellation Health LLC, First United Health LLC, Alpha Cepheus LLC, Naya Constellation Health LLC, Constellation Health Investment LLC as to Douglas Newton. (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Request for Summons to be Issued by Constellation Health LLC, First United Health LLC, Alpha Cepheus LLC, Naya Constellation Health LLC, Constellation Health Investment LLC as to Truc To. (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Request for Summons to be Issued by Constellation Health LLC, First United Health LLC, Alpha Cepheus LLC, Naya Constellation Health LLC, Constellation Health Investment LLC as to Chinh Chu. (PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                COMPLAINT against Victor Cardona, Chinh Chu, Douglas Newton, James Stepien, Truc To ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9052502) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Constellation Health LLC, First United Health LLC, Alpha Cepheus LLC, Naya Constellation Health LLC, Constellation Health Investment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PARLATORE, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?