Sabol
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-11169

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 13, 2020 at 12:08 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332pi
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to McKesson Corporation, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marcia Sabol. (Burke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GE Healthcare Inc., re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marcia Sabol. (Burke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Electric Company, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marcia Sabol. (Burke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bracco Diagnostics, Inc., re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marcia Sabol. (Burke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc,, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marcia Sabol. (Burke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Healthcare LLC, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marcia Sabol. (Burke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Corporation, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marcia Sabol. (Burke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bracco Diagnostics, Inc., GE Healthcare Inc, General Electric Company, McKesson Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15983979)Document filed by Marcia Sabol.(Burke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?