Antoine v. Ogg
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04532

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 10:42 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Duane Anthony Antoine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #02263475

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duane Anthony Antoine
v.
No Logo Katheline Flavins, Defendant
No Logo Kim Ogg, Defendant
No Logo Lance Craig Hamm, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None supplement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Final
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & ORDERCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Email sent to Manager of Three Strikes List. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Katheline Flavins, Lance Craig Hamm, Kim Ogg (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Duane Anthony Antoine.(SarahShelby, 4)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?