Paul v. Harris County Texas
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04535

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2019 at 1:43 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Paul Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #01267684

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Jackson
v.
No Logo Harris County Texas, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Final
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
            MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Paul Jackson, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2018. (SarahShelby, 4)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
              Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Harris County Texas (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Paul Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(SarahShelby, 4)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?