Krauss Craft, Inc. v. Ross Recreational Equipment Company, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-03062-CL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 2:49 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit Interstate Commerce
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: Denying Motion to Dismiss Case or transfer 10 ; Adopting Magistrate Judge Clarke's Report and Recommendation 28 . Please access document by number hyperlink for complete review and details of order. Signed on 2/12/2009 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (dkj)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Findings & Recommendation: The Court recommends that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 10 be denied and it's Motion to Transfer be denied. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 2/2/2009. If objections are filed, responses to the objections are due 14 days after objections are filed. Signed on 01/16/2009 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Order. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Signed on 08/14/2008 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 3 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?