Coalition of Clergy v. George W Bush
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-00570
District Judge A. Howard Matz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 12:25 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allen Freehling, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Arthur L Margolis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Carol A Watson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Coalition of Clergy Lawyers and Professors, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo George Regas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Derek Larwick +1 541 600 4598 +1 541 600 4598 derek@larwicklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by The Corson & Johnson Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Don Corson +1 541 484 2525 +1 541 484 2929 dcorson@corsonjohnsonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Haim Dov Beliak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Harold S Lewis, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Hugh R Manes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Joseph Reichmann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Kathryn S Bloomfield, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Kenneth B Noble, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Lawrence W Schilling, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Marion R Yagman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Ramsey Clark, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Robert A Berger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Stephen Yagman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marion R Yagman +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
No Logo Steven Jacobs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by David S. Toy, Esq.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Holmesly +1 713 653 5600 mholmesly@spaglaw.com
Space Marcus Raymond Spagnoletti +1 713 653 5600 marcus@spaglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
v.
No Logo 1,000 Unknown Named United States Military Personnel, Defendant
No Logo Donald H Rumsfeld, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joseph P Griffith, Jr. +1 843 225 5563 +1 843 722 6254 joegriffithjr@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Darian Ronald Bartram +1 202 861 1735 dbartram@bakerlaw.com
, Lee Casey +1 202 861 1730 +1 202 861 1783 lcasey@bakerlaw.com
, David Rivkin +1 202 861 1731 +1 202 861 1783 drivkin@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagins Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , C Todd Hagins +1 803 200 1060 +1 888 959 3613 todd@haginslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Musick Peeler & Garrett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Daniel J Woods +1 213 629 7622 +1 213 624 1376 d.woods@mpglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Kevin F McDonald +1 803 929 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy Michael Rusche +1 213 270 9600 +1 213 270 9601 trusche@seyfarth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, Jennifer J Aldrich +1 803 929 3000 +1 803 733 5966 jennifer.aldrich@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas A Axel USACC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Barbara Murcier Bowens +1 803 929 3000 +1 803 252 2759 barbara.bowens@usdoj.gov
, , , Stephen J. Buckingham +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 stephen.buckingham@usdoj.gov
, , , Bryan R. Diederich +1 202 305 0198 +1 202 616 8460 bryan.diederich@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
, Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Glenn Stewart Greene +1 202 616 4143 +1 202 616 4314 glenn.greene@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mary H Mason +1 202 616 4123 +1 202 616 4314 mary.mason@usdoj.gov
, , , Marion J. Mittet +1 206 553 7970 Jamie.Mittet@usdoj.gov
, Ryan B Parker +1 202 514 4336 +1 202 616 8470 ryan.parker@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Peter J. Phipps +1 202 616 8482 +1 202 616 8470 peter.phipps@usdoj.gov
, W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov
No Logo Ellen Mustain, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas A Axel USACC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George Walker Bush"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas A Axel USACC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
, Alice S Fisher +1 202 307 0480
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert Ira Lester +1 213 894 2464 +1 213 894 7819 robert.lester@usdoj.gov
No Logo Gordon R England, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas A Axel USACC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
No Logo James L Jones, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by James L Jones

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L Jones

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas A Axel USACC.Criminal@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward Keenan & Barrett PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael James Keenan +1 602 279 1717 +1 602 279 8908 mkeenan@wardkeenanbarrett.com
No Logo Michael Fair, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas A Axel USACC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Lehnert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas A Axel USACC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
No Logo Richard B Myers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas A Axel USACC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert A Buehn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas A Axel USACC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
No Logo Erwin Chemerinsky, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY HAS NOT CONSENTED TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Reichmann +1 310 452 3200

Toggle Switch Represented by Gupta Beck PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Deepak Gupta +1 202 470 3826 +1 202 328 7030 deepak@guptabeck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strindberg & Scholnick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Erika Birch +1 208 336 1788 +1 208 287 3708 erika@idahojobjustice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Melissa Hart +1 303 735 6344 +1 303 492 1200 melissa.hart@colorado.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Uto, Taichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Yagman +1 310 452 3200
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE from Circuit Court of Appeals: THE COURT ORDERS that the mandate of the 9th CCA Affirming in part vacating in part is hereby filed and spread upon the minutes of this US District Court (dw) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CERTIFIED COPY of Appellate Court Order: It is now here ordered and adjudged by this Court that the judgment of the said District Court in this cause [22-1] (Appeal No. 02-55367) be AFFIRMED in part VACATED in part (dw) (Entered: 03/07/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RECORD on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals re appeal [22-1] vols: 1 transcripts: 1. (cbr) (Entered: 02/11/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CLERK'S record on appeal transmitted to Circuit [22-1] vols: 1; transcripts: 1. (02-55367) (wdc) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 2/21/02 (Re: [22-1]) CR: Lynne Smith (weap) (Entered: 03/22/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and ordering form for dates: 1/22/02, 2/21/02 CR: Lynne Smith (weap) (Entered: 03/21/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number appeal [22-1] 02-55367 (dlu) (Entered: 03/07/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE by petrs Coalition of Clergy, Haim Dov Beliak, Robert A Berger, Kathryn S Bloomfield, Erwin Chemerinsky, Ramsey Clark, Allen Freehling, Steven Jacobs, Harold S Lewis Jr, Hugh R Manes, Arthur L Margolis, Kenneth B Noble, George Regas, Joseph Reichmann, Lawrence W Schilling, Carol A Watson, Marion R Yagman re Respondents response to petrs' suggestion of bias [16-1] (rl) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MINUTES: HEARING RE JURISDICTION; Hearing held. Cnsl argue. Crt makes oral findings and dismisses the 1st amd habeas corpus petition [15-1], dismissing the habeas corpus petition [1-1]. Order to issue by Judge A. Matz; CR: Lynne Smith (rl) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONDENTS SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION in suppt of resp to OSC [3-1], [3-2], re jurisdiction & motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [6-1] (jj) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and ordering form for dates: none requested. (pjap) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Coalition of Clergy, plaintiff Haim Dov Beliak, plaintiff Robert A Berger, plaintiff Kathryn S Bloomfield, plaintiff Erwin Chemerinsky, plaintiff Ramsey Clark, plaintiff Allen Freehling, plaintiff Steven Jacobs, plaintiff Harold S Lewis Jr, plaintiff Hugh R Manes, plaintiff Arthur L Margolis, plaintiff Kenneth B Noble, plaintiff George Regas, plaintiff Joseph Reichmann, plaintiff Lawrence W Schilling, plaintiff Carol A Watson, plaintiff Marion R Yagman, plaintiff Stephen Yagman to 9th C/A from Dist. Court Ord fld 2/21/02 & ent 2/22/02 [21-2] (cc: Stephen Yagman, Yagman & Yagman & Reichmann & Bloomfield; Douglas Axel, AUSA) Fee: Billed. (pjap) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge A. H. Matz dismissing w/prej the verified 1st amd habeas corpus petition [15-1], dismissing w/prej the verified habeas corpus petition [1-1] IT IS SO ORDERED terminating case (MD JS-6) (ENT 2/22/02) (rl) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Petrs having fld a "Ntc of Suggestion of Potential Bias or Prej or Appearance of Potentional[sic] Bias...(etc)" which the Crt construed as a Mot to Recuse, that mot was randomly assigned to the Honorable Florence M Cooper. Purs to 28 USC 144, this Crt "shall proceed no fur...." vacating Scheduling order IN COURT HEARING RE: hrg on OSC jurisdiction set on 8:45 2/14/02 [8-1], minutes [8-2]. The mtr is under submission (cc: by fax plf/dft (or ptys) by Judge A. H. Matz; CR: none (rl) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper denying recusal motion to disqualify Judge A. Howard Matz [11-1] (rl) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) IN COURT HEARING RE: jurisdictional issue set on 8:45 2/21/02 CR: not reported (rl) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DECLARATION of A Howard Matz (rl) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM OF PA IN RESPONSE by dfts George Walker Bush, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Richard B. Myers, Gordon R. England, James L. Jones, Robert A. Buehn, Michael Fair, Ellen Mustain & Michael Lehnert to petrs' "Ntc of suggestion of potential bias or prej" [11-1]; decl of Douglas A. Axel; exh. (gk) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS [1-1] by plaintiff (dw) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        REFERRAL OF MOTION To Disqualify Judge/Magistrate Judge filed. Purs to GO 224 and GO 194, referring motion to disqualify Judge A. Howard Matz [11-1] to Judge Florence-Marie Cooper for determination; all procdgs stayed until determination of motion. (cc: all counsel) (rn) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge A. H. Matz Cnsl for Petitioners have today filed a "Ntc of Suggestion of Potential Bias or Prej" concerning the Crt; Although the ntc is not styled as a mot & the petitioners' cnsl states that he does "not take a position on it" Crt ORD that t the Ntc be treated as a motion to disqualify Judge A. Howard Matz [11-1]; Accordingly, Clk's Offices shall randomly assign the "motion" to another Dist Judge, purs to General Ord 224 (ir) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            OPPOSITION by plaintiffs to Respondents' ex parte application for leave to file reply memo in suppt of response to OSC and mot to dism [10-1] (ir) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF POTENTIAL BIAS OR PREJUDICE OR APPEARANCE OF POTENTIAL BIAS OR PREJUDICE OF JUDGE ALVIN HOWARD MATZ by plaintiff to disqualify Judge A. Howard Matz Lodged (rn) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by resps George Walker Bush, Donald H Rumsfeld, Richard B Myers, Gordon R England, James L Jones, Robert A Buehn, Michael Fair, Ellen Mustain, Michael Lehnert, 1,000 Unk Named U S for leave to file reply memo in suppt of response to OSC and mot to dism ; Lodged propsd ord (rl) (Entered: 02/12/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RESPONSE by petrs Coalition of Clergy, Haim Dov Beliak, Robert A Berger, Kathryn S Bloomfield, Erwin Chemerinsky, Ramsey Clark, Allen Freehling, Steven Jacobs, Harold S Lewis Jr, Hugh R Manes, Arthur L Margolis, Kenneth B Noble, George Regas, Joseph Reichmann, Lawrence W Schilling, Carol A Watson, Marion R Yagman, Stephen Yagman re response to OSC re jurisdiction [6-1] (rl) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTES: IN COURT HEARING RE: hrg on OSC jurisdiction set on 8:45 2/14/02 by Judge A. H. Matz; CR: not reported (rl) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      DOCUMENTS FLILED IN SUPPORT OF respondent's resp to OSC re jurisdiction and mot to dism for lack of jurisdiction by George Walker Bush [6-1] (rl) (Entered: 02/05/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION by George Walker Bush to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ; memo of PA; motion hearing set for 1:30 2/14/02 (rl) (Entered: 02/04/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Dfts are hereby ord to provide the Crt w/a true and correct copy of Lease to the US of Lands in Cuba for Coaling and Naval Stations, 2/16-23, 1903, US Cuba, TS #418, 6 Bevans 1113, cited at pages 3 and 20 of Dfts' resp to OSC. Dfts shall file and provide the Crt w/a courtesy copy of the requested doc NLT 2/1/02 at 5:00pm by Judge A. H. Matz CR: none (rl) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTES: Status Conference re: Petn for writ of H/C. Cause called; appearances made. Crt & cnsl confer re : status of svc (Rule 4i). Crt issues its questionnaire & draft OSC re: jurisdiction & hears oral argument. Crt sets the fol schedule: Gov's resp to OSC shall be fld NLT 1/31/02; Petrs' reply shall be fld NLT 2/8/02; and Hrg on OSC re: Jurisdiction for 2/14/02 @1:30pm by Judge A. H. Matz CR: Lynne Smith (rl) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JURISDICTION why they should not be subject to the jurisdiction of this Crt in a H/C proceeding purportedly brought under 28 USC 2241 et seq on behalf of persons allegedly held by them at the US Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba ("GITMO"). Resps shall file their resp by NLT 12:00 noon on 1/31/02. They shall hand svc (or fax) petrs' cnsl & shall lodge 2 courtesy copies w/the Crt. Petrs shall file their reply by NLT 12:00 noon on 2/8/02. They shall hand svc (or fax) resps' cnsl & shall lodge 2 courtesy copies w/the Crt. The Crt requests that these briefs be pithy & deal only w/the question of this Crt's jurisdiction by Judge A. H. Matz ; The Crt will conduct a hrg on 1:30 2/14/02 ; IT IS SO ORD (rl) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer T. Lum (jag) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer T. Lum . (jag) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?