Cherne Industries v. IPS Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cv-02071-DWF-SRN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cherne Industries, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A Allgeyer +1 612 371 3216 +1 612 371 3207 dallgeyer@lindquist.com
Space Ann E Kennedy +1 612 371 3247 +1 612 371 3207 akennedy@lindquist.com
Space Mark R Privratsky +1 612 371 3211 +1 612 371 3207 mprivratsky@lindquist.com
v.
No Logo Buchen, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ted Grabowski
Space Sean T Osborn +1 310 551 2966
Space Joseph A Yanny +1 310 551 5966 +1 310 551 1949 joeyanny@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by flplaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P Martin mmartin@flplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Bauersfeld Lowry & Kelley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Dinardo +1 818 347 7900 +1 818 340 2859 mike@kelly-kelleylaw.com
No Logo Ips Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ted Grabowski
Space Sean T Osborn +1 310 551 2966
Space Joseph A Yanny +1 310 551 5966 +1 310 551 1949 joeyanny@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by flplaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P Martin mmartin@flplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Bauersfeld Lowry & Kelley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Dinardo +1 818 347 7900 +1 818 340 2859 mike@kelly-kelleylaw.com
Office DMN
Filed 11/13/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hennepin
Terminated 9/11/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ATYADM, CLOSED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER (Judge Donovan W. Frank ) that the above-captioned matter is dismissed without prejudice without further cost to any party [9-1], [9-2], [12-1]. (2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DDB)
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
    NOTICE by defts of setting hearing for their motion to dismiss & to strike ( to Judge Donovan W. Frank )ret. at 11:00 a.m. on 9/20/2 [9-1] [9-2]. (2pg(s) (DDB)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Notice of Hearing.
      NOTICE by defendants setting hearing for motion to dismiss [31-1] and to strike. [31-2] 9:00 am on 9/6/02 2 pg(s) (JVN)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Letter
        LETTER to the court from Jeanette Bazis counsel for defendants dated 6/18/02 with attached exhibits U, V, and W (certified copies of three trademarks) to the declaration of Michael Martin in opposition to pltfs' motion for a preliminary injunction (previously submitted uncertified) 1pg(s)s + attachments (separate) (JMR) Modified on 06/20/2002
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Letter
          LETTER to court from Jeanette Bazis dated 6/12/02 with certified copies of U.S. Patents (uncertified copies of patents were previously submitted as exhibits R and Q to the declaration of Michale Martin filed in opposition to pltfs' motion for a Preliminary Injunction. 1pg(s) (JMR) Modified on 06/17/2002
            LREF
            Blank 34 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY memorandum by defendants to motion to dismiss and to strike [31-]1 [31-2] 6pgs (JMR)
              LREF
              Blank 33 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to motion to dismiss and strike [31-1], [31-2] 9pg(s) (JMR)
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM by defendants in support of motion to dismiss and to strike [31-1], [31-2] 12pg(s) (JMR)
                  LREF
                  Blank 36 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                  DECLARATION of Michael P. Martin in support of notice of errata to defts' exhibits in support of opposition to motion for preliminary injunction [35-1] [30-1] [29-1] [28-1] [27-1] [21-1][12-1] 2pgs + attachments (separate) (JMR)
                    LREF
                    Blank 35 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE by defendants of errata to defts' exhibits in support of opposition to motion for preliminary injunction 3pg(s) (JMR)
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                      EXHIBIT V by defendants in opposition to motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] (separate) (JMR)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                        EXHIBIT U by defendants in opposition to motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] (separate) (JMR)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                          EXHIBIT W by defendants in opposition to motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] (separate) (JMR)
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                            EXHIBITS by defendants in opposition to motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] (separate) (JMR)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Affidavit
                              AFFIDAVIT of Jeanette M. Bazis regarding motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 1pg(s) + exhibits (JMR)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                DECLARATION of Michael P. Martin re motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 3pg(s) (JMR)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                  DECLARATION of Ernest Mannerino re motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 4pg(s) (copy) (JMR)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                    DECLARATION of Richard E. Larson re motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 9pgs (copy) (JMR)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                      DECLARATION of Victor Schun re motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 4pg(s) (copy) (JMR)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        MEMORANDUM by defendants in opposition to motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 35pg(s) (JMR)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                          REPLY memorandum by plaintiff to motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 10pg(s) (JMR)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                            DECLARATION of Gregory Danaher 2pg(s) (JMR)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                              DECLARATION of Anthony G. Eggink 3pg(s) (copy) (JMR)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                Second DECLARATION of Mark Winkelman re motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 3pg(s) (JMR)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                  Second DECLARATION of Niles Peter Rogers re motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 4pg(s) (JMR)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                    DECLARATION of Mark Winkelman re motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 40pg(s) (JMR)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                      DECLARATION of Niles Peter Rogers re motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 7pg(s) + exhibits (separate) (JMR)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of motion for preliminary injunction [12-1] 28pg(s) (JMR)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                          Summons - RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant IPS Corporation on 3/11/02 4pg(s) (JMR)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Order
                                                            PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten ) on behalf of defendants by Sean T Osborn, Michael A DiNardo, Michael P Martin, Joseph A Yanny 4pg(s) (VEM) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2004 (akl).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                              Notice and MOTION by defendants to dismiss ( to Judge Donovan W. Frank ) , and to strike ret. 6/21/02 at 11:00 a.m. 3pg(s) (JMR)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                MOTION by defendants to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) ( to Judge Donovan W. Frank ) , and to strike pursuant to Rule 12(f) 3pg(s) (JMR)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 MOTION - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                  LETTER RE: SVC OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION PAPERS by defendants to dismiss SVC LTR ( to Judge Donovan W. Frank ) , and to strike pursuant to Rule 12(f) 2pg(s) (JMR)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                    ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Daniel W McDonald for defts and substituting attorneys Jeanette Bazis Joseph A Yanny and Ted Grabowski 2pg(s) (JMR)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                      Pro hac vice request to Admission's Clerk on behalf of atty., Joseph Yanny and Ted Grabowski (JMR)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice and MOTION by plaintiff for preliminary injunction (to Judge Donovan W. Frank) ret. 6/21/02 at 11:00 a.m. 1pg(s) (JMR)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 MOTION - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER RE: SVC OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION PAPERS by plaintiff for preliminary injunction SVC LTR ( to Judge Donovan W. Frank ) 1pg(s) (JMR)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD ( Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson ) that Defts IPS Corp & Buchen, Incs' time to answer or otherwise plead in the above-entitled matter is extended until 4/19/2. (2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                              NOTICE by defendant IPS Corporation, defendant Buchen, Inc. of association of counsel Jeanette M Bazis (MMC)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson ) that defts time to answer or plead is extended until 4/15/02 2pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (JMR)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                                                                  NOTICE by defendant IPS Corporation, defendant Buchen, Inc. of association of counsel Daniel W McDonald (MMC)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE re summons and complaint executed upon defendants on 3/11/02 3pg(s) (JMR)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson 3/18/02) It appears that more than 120 days have elapsed since suit was filed and that no appearance has been entered by defendant(s). The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this District require that an answer or other pleading be filed. The Court does not permit counsel by agreement to extend the time for filing an answer or other pleading, although an initial motion for extension of time will be liberally considered by the Court in the absence of any objection by opposing counsel. Accordingly, counsel for plaintiff is directed to: 1. Notify defense counsel immediately that he/she is required to make an appearance or move for an extension of time to do so; 2. File an application for entry of default unless the required pleading is filed within 10 days; or 3. Advise the Court in writing of any good cause to the contrary. Unless plaintiffs counsel complies with this order within 20 days of this date, this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution. 2 pgs (cc: all counsel) (
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Summons issued. Assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Patent list and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. Receipt 253530. 21 pg(s) (VEM)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?