Cortese v. State of California, Department of Transportation
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG17883759

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 9, 2018 at 5:52 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cortese, Diane, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo State Of California, Department of Transportation, Defendant
No Logo Ikeda, Tiffany S., Attorney
No Logo Sack, Dana, Attorney
No Logo Schmidt, Karl H., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Real Property
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Conf Continuance 06/14/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
    Blank 36 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 06/04/2019 09:30 AM D- 301
      Blank 35 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Civil Jury Trial 07/01/2019 09:30 AM D- 25
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Case Management Conference Order Issued (4 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Case Management Statement of State of California, Department of Transportation Filed (6 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Case Management Statement of Diane Cortese Filed (6 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for State of California, Department of Transportation (7 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Overruled (3 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Reply Filed (38 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed (5 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Rejection Letter Issued on Notice of (1 Page)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Case Management Statement of State of California, Department of Transportation Filed (6 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 23 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/12/2018 09:00 AM D- 25
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 05/24/2018 09:00 AM D- 25
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by State of California, Department of Transportation (27 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Notice of posting jury fees Filed (2 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Case Management Statement of State of California, Department of Transportation Filed (6 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/09/2018 09:00 AM D- 25
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Case Management Statement of Diane Cortese Filed (6 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Case Management Statement of Diane Cortese Filed (6 Pages)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Dropped from dept: 25 date: 03/29/2018 time: 09:00 AM
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    First Amended Complaint Filed (16 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 03/29/2018 09:00 AM D- 25
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Demurrer to Complaint Filed by State of California, Department of Transportation (9 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Filed for State of California, Department of Transportat (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Proof of Service on Complaint As to State of California, Department of Transportation Filed (2 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Proof of Service on Complaint As to State of California, Department of Transportation Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Initial Case Management Conference 04/11/2018 09:00 AM D- 25 (2 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Summons Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Complaint Other Real Property Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for State of California, Department of Transportation (1 Page)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?