Ally Financial, Inc v. Provident Funding Associates, LP
Federal Court Proceeding Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:17-mc-00014
District Judge Susan Richard Nelson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2019 at 3:00 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BMO Harris Bank, NA d/b/a M and I Bank, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY W Anders Folk +1 612 335 1559 +1 612 335 1657 anders.folk@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy P Griffin +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 timothy.griffin@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Robin Markowitz +1 612 335 1974 sharon.markowitz@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd A Noteboom +1 612 335 1894 +1 612 335 1657 todd.noteboom@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Thomson +1 612 335 1500 william.thomson@stinson.com
No Logo Cadence Bank, NA, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY W Anders Folk +1 612 335 1559 +1 612 335 1657 anders.folk@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Robin Markowitz +1 612 335 1974 sharon.markowitz@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd A Noteboom +1 612 335 1894 +1 612 335 1657 todd.noteboom@stinson.com
No Logo Colonial Savings, F.A., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel N Moak +1 612 977 8721 +1 612 977 8650 dmoak@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark G Schroeder +1 612 977 8450 +1 612 977 8650 mschroeder@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel J Supalla +1 612 977 8870 +1 612 977 8650 dsupalla@briggs.com
No Logo CTX Mortgage Company LLC, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin E Gurstelle +1 612 977 8400 bgurstelle@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul J. Hemming, PHV +1 612 977 8719 +1 612 977 8650 phemming@briggs.com
No Logo Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth V Kniffen +1 612 359 4261 +1 612 336 9100 ekniffen@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel J Millea +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 dmillea@zelle.com
No Logo E-loan, Inc., Respondent
Officially listed as "E-Loan, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark S Enslin +1 612 371 3211 enslinm@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Terrence J Fleming +1 612 492 7496 tfleming@fredlaw.com
No Logo E*trade Bank, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Ostlund Baer & Louwagie PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brooke D Anthony +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 banthony@aoblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph W. Anthony +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 janthony@aoblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amelia R Selvig +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 aselvig@anthonyostlund.com
No Logo EFC Holdings Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY W Anders Folk +1 612 335 1559 +1 612 335 1657 anders.folk@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Robin Markowitz +1 612 335 1974 sharon.markowitz@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd A Noteboom +1 612 335 1894 +1 612 335 1657 todd.noteboom@stinson.com
No Logo Embrace Home Loans, Incorporated f/k/a Advanced Financial Services, Incorporated, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY W Anders Folk +1 612 335 1559 +1 612 335 1657 anders.folk@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Robin Markowitz +1 612 335 1974 sharon.markowitz@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd A Noteboom +1 612 335 1894 +1 612 335 1657 todd.noteboom@stinson.com
No Logo Equifirst Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY W Anders Folk +1 612 335 1559 +1 612 335 1657 anders.folk@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Robin Markowitz +1 612 335 1974 sharon.markowitz@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd A Noteboom +1 612 335 1894 +1 612 335 1657 todd.noteboom@stinson.com
No Logo First Guaranty Mortgage Corporation, Respondent
No Logo First Mortgage Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Minenko & Hoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gene A Hoff +1 952 922 6766 +1 952 928 8370 gene@minenkohoff.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J Minenko +1 952 922 6766 +1 952 928 8370 mike@minenkohoff.com
No Logo Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com
No Logo Home Loan Center, Inc., Respondent
Officially listed as "Home Loan Center, Incorporated"
HSBC Finance Corporation HSBC Finance Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicole M. Moen +1 612 492 7000 +1 612 492 7077 nmoen@fredlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd A. Wind +1 612 347 7061 +1 612 492 7077 twind@fredlaw.com
No Logo Impac Funding Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com
No Logo iServe Residential Lending, LLC f/k/a United Residential Lending, LLC, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com
No Logo Plaza Home Mortgage, Incorporated, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Ostlund Baer & Louwagie PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brooke D Anthony +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 banthony@aoblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph W. Anthony +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 janthony@aoblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amelia R Selvig +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 aselvig@anthonyostlund.com
No Logo Provident Funding Associates, L.P., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel N Moak +1 612 977 8721 +1 612 977 8650 dmoak@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark G Schroeder +1 612 977 8450 +1 612 977 8650 mschroeder@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel J Supalla +1 612 977 8870 +1 612 977 8650 dsupalla@briggs.com
No Logo Standard Pacific Mortgage, Incorporated, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com
No Logo Synovus Mortgage Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark G Schroeder +1 612 977 8450 +1 612 977 8650 mschroeder@briggs.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel J Supalla +1 612 977 8870 +1 612 977 8650 dsupalla@briggs.com
No Logo Universal American Mortgage Company, LLC, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY W Anders Folk +1 612 335 1559 +1 612 335 1657 anders.folk@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Robin Markowitz +1 612 335 1974 sharon.markowitz@stinson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd A Noteboom +1 612 335 1894 +1 612 335 1657 todd.noteboom@stinson.com
No Logo Ally Financial, Inc., Movant
Officially listed as "Ally Financial, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Damon Andrews +1 202 879 5000 damon.andrews@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 10/06/2017, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 10/06/2017, PRO HAC VICE Jason R Parish +1 202 879 2000 jason.parish@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Njus, P.a

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen M Harris +1 612 630 3259 +1 612 337 5894 sharris@meyernjus.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Neil M Meyer +1 612 630 3232 +1 612 337 5894 nmeyer@meyernjus.com
No Logo Timothy Devine, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Damon Andrews +1 202 879 5000 damon.andrews@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 10/06/2017, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 10/06/2017, PRO HAC VICE Jason R Parish +1 202 879 2000 jason.parish@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Njus, P.a

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen M Harris +1 612 630 3259 +1 612 337 5894 sharris@meyernjus.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Neil M Meyer +1 612 630 3232 +1 612 337 5894 nmeyer@meyernjus.com
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 999 - Miscellaneous Cases
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/22/2018. (SMD) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine . (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      TEXT ONLY ENTRY: No activity having been docketed in this case since July 2017, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall meet and confer and file a joint letter on or before MARCH 9, 2018, regarding whether the Court may now close its file or, if not, what issues remain open for resolution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/22/2018. (JMK) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Oral ORDER. Based on the letter filed by Movants Ally Financial, Inc. and Timothy Devine [Doc. No. 34], the Motion to Quash Subpoenas [Doc. No. 1] is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court will not close the case at this time, however, in light of the Movants' reservation of rights to seek costs and fees in connection with the deposition and the Respondents' reservation of rights to seek additional testimony from Mr. Devine after reviewing the deposition transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 07/26/2017. (ALM) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine . (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine . (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine . (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court previously held in abeyance Ally Financial, Inc. and Timothy Devine's Motion to Quash [Doc. No. 1] and ordered the parties to meet and confer and update the Court about the status of their discussions. [Doc. No. 30.] The parties emailed to chambers a letter dated June 6, 2017, describing certain agreements the parties had reached and stating that the parties were working to schedule a deposition. The parties emailed a further update on July 7, 2017, notifying the Court that the deposition has been scheduled for July 18, 2017. To assure that the docket is complete as to the status of this matter, the parties are ORDERED to (1) e-file their June 6, 2017, and July 7, 2017, letters; and (2) e-file no later than July 25, 2017, a joint update letter stating whether there are any issues raised by Ally's and Devine's motion that are yet unresolved, or whether the Court may now deny the motion as moot and close its file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 07/10/17. (JMK) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Motion Hearing held on 5/18/2017 re 1 filed by Timothy Devine, Ally Financial, Incorporated. See Minutes for details. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD) Modified text on 6/1/2017 (KMM). (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 28 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re 10 Memorandum, 15 Exhibit, 13 Exhibit, 14 Exhibit, 16 Exhibit . Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 10, 13, 14, 15, 16. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 6/1/2017 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/4/2017. (KNK) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re 10 Memorandum, 15 Exhibit, 13 Exhibit, 14 Exhibit, 16 Exhibit filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P.. (Supalla, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Reply/Surreply. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/28/2017. (SMD) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 24 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply/SurreplyMemorandum of Law filed by Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine.(Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine.(Harris, Stephen) Modified text on 4/27/2017 (kt). (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                First MOTION for Leave to File Reply/SurreplyMemorandum of Law filed by Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A, proposed Reply Memorandum of Law, # 2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate re: proposed Reply Memorandum, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Damon Clarke Andrews for Ally Financial, Incorporated and for Timothy Devine. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/26/17. (JLW) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason R. Parish for Ally Financial, Incorporated and for Timothy Devine. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/25/17. (JLW) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Damon C. Andrews. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5465102 filed by Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine. (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason R. Parish. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5465055 filed by Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine. (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Harris on behalf of Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine. (Harris, Stephen) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. re 10 Memorandum, 15 Exhibit, 12 Declaration in Opposition, 11 Redacted Document, 17 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact, 13 Exhibit, 14 Exhibit, 16 Exhibit (Supalla, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for 15, 13, 14, 16 Statement Instead of Redacted Document filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P..(Supalla, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                SEALED EXHIBIT 11 re 12 Declaration in Opposition, filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P..(Supalla, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  SEALED EXHIBIT 10 re 12 Declaration in Opposition, filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P..(Supalla, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    SEALED EXHIBIT 9 re 12 Declaration in Opposition, filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. (Supalla, Daniel) Modified text on 4/13/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      SEALED EXHIBIT 8 re 12 Declaration in Opposition, filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. (Supalla, Daniel) Modified text on 4/13/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        DECLARATION of Susannah S. Geltman in Opposition to 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7). (Supalla, Daniel) Modified text on 4/13/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Redacted Document for 10 Redacted Memorandum in Opposition to Ally Financial, Inc. and Timothy Devine's Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P..(Supalla, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Ally Financial, Inc. and Timothy Devine's Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Provident Funding Associates, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Supalla, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              TEXT ENTRY NOTICE to Counsel: Pursuant to Judge Susan Richard Nelson's Order 8 dated 4/12/17, case 17mj17 PAM/HB has been opened. (MKG) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER Regarding Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/12/17. (SMD) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jason R. Parish, Richard Gottlieb, Brett Natarelli, A. Paul Heeringa, William T. Russell, Jr., David Woll, Anthony Narula, Philip R. Stein, Shalia Sakona, Carly Baratt, John Charles Ertman, Michael S. Winograd, David Crichlow, Jerry L. Hall, Jr., David J. Stagman, Peter L. Loh, R. Hackney Wiegmann, Matthew V. Johnson, Jesse T. Smallwood, N. Mahmood Ahmad, Stuart M. Richter, Gregory S. Korman, David J. Stagman, Victor L. Hayslip, Brent D. Hitson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms. (kt) CC: Michael Winograd, Jason Parish, William Russell, David Woll, Carly Baratt, John Ertman. (kt) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 17-mc-14 SRN/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/3/2017 and by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 4/6/2017. (ACH) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Leonid E. Feller as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms. (kt) CC: Leonid E. Feller. (kt) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:17-mc-50414. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau per Miscellaneous List. (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (LHos) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/30/2017.] (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Timothy Devine re 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Timothy Devine, Ally Financial, Incorporated. Receipt No: 0645-6148253 - Fee: 47 dollars filed by Ally Financial, Incorporated, Timothy Devine. (Feller, Leonid) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/30/2017.] (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Timothy Devine, Ally Financial, Incorporated. Receipt No: 0645-6148253 - Fee: 47 dollars (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Findings of Fact (Excerpts), # 3 Exhibit 2 - Confirmation Order (Excerpts), # 4 Exhibit 3 - First Amended Complaint (Excerpts), # 5 Exhibit 4 - May 8, 2015 Subpoena to Produce Documents to AFI, # 6 Exhibit 5 - May 20, 2015 Letter from D. Donovan, # 7 Exhibit 6 - September 29, 2015 Letter from J. Parish, # 8 Exhibit 7 - October 16, 2015 Letter from R. Gallo, # 9 Exhibit 8 - October 23, 2015 Letter from J. Parish, # 10 Exhibit 9 - October 28, 2015 Email chain from R. Gallo, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Order Granting Motion to Remand, # 13 Exhibit 12 - April 19, 2016 Hearing Transcript (Excerpts), # 14 Exhibit 13 - AFI's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Movant-Defendants' Motion to Compel, # 15 Exhibit 14 - May 25, 2016 Letter from J. Parish, # 16 Exhibit 15 - May 27, 2016 Letter from J. Parish, # 17 Exhibit 16 - August 8, 2016 Letter from N. Ahmad, # 18 Exhibit 17 - August 22, 2016 Letter from J. Parish, # 19 Exhibit 18 - August 25, 2016 Email chain from K. Anderson, # 20 Exhibit 19 - September 9, 2016 Letter from J. Parish, # 21 Exhibit 20 - December 6, 2016 Letter from J. Parish, # 22 Exhibit 21 - January 3, 2017 Letter from J. Parish, # 23 Exhibit 22 - January 23, 2017 Letter from J. Parish, # 24 Exhibit 23 - March 3, 2017 Notice of Subpoena to AFI, # 25 Exhibit 24 - March 3, 2017 Notice of Subpoena to T. Devine, # 26 Exhibit 25 - March 21, 2016 Notice of Subpoena to AFI, # 27 Exhibit 26 - Joint Defense Agreement) (Feller, Leonid) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/30/2017.] (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/30/2017.]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?