Walls v. Booker, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:01-cv-02323-ADM-AJB
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo John Walls, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Christopher Zych, Defendant
No Logo E Laachman, Defendant
No Logo G L Herschberger, Defendant
No Logo J W Booker, Defendant
No Logo Mark Dohahoo, Defendant
No Logo Robert Bennett, Defendant
No Logo S M Pedersen, Defendant
No Logo T Ferritor, Defendant
Attributes
Office DMN
Filed 12/17/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 1/22/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Order
JUDGMENT: 1 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
LREF
Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ( Judge Ann D. Montgomery ) adopting report & recommendation. [2-1] that Petitioner's Petition for writ of habeas corpus is summarily dismissed without prejudice. 1 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
LREF
Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION( to Judge Ann D. Montgomery ) ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus be summarily dismissed without prejudice. 4 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusCourt Filing
FEDERAL PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - Assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per habeas corpus and referred Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Receipt 254085. copy to US Attorney. 7+pg(s) (VEM)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 7 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?