(PS) J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Estrada Alvarez
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00926-TLN-AC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 17, 2019 at 1:30 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 553
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/28/2018 SCHEDULING a Settlement Conference for 2/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Parties are instructed to have a principal with full settlement authority present at the settlement conference or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms. Each party shall provide a confidential settlement statement to the following email address: ckdorders@caed.uscourts.gov not later than 2/19/2019. Parties are also directed to file a Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Statement. (CC Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney) (Huang, H) Modified on 12/3/2018 (Huang, H).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/21/2018 APPOINTING attorney Matthew Nicholas Becker for Alida Estrada Alvarez for limited purpose counsel. This appointment is for the limited purpose of assisting defendant with preparing for a nd participating in a settlement conference. Matthew N. Becker's appointment will terminate fifteen days after completion of the settlement conference, or any continuation of the settlement conference. Appointed counsel shall notify Sujean Park at (916) 930-4278, or via email at spark@caed.uscourts.gov if he has any questions related to the appointment. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order upon Matthew N. Becker. (Zignago, K.)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/20/2018 STAYING case pending the conclusion of the settlement conference. Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/1/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 15 motion for terminating sanctions. The hearing set for 8/8/2018 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. The parties will appear for a mandatory settlement conference on 9/5/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Zignago, K.)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/9/18 ORDERING that the Motion hearing date of 7/18/18 15 is CONTINUED to 8/8/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Defendant shall file an opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition to the Motion, no later than 7/25/18. Failure to file an opposition or to appear at the hearing will be deemed as a statement of non-opposition and may result in sanctions.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 0 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?