Anderson v. Jack In The Box

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC1103779
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 5:19 PM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Rebecca Anderson, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alder Law Pc +1 310 275 9131
Space EDWARD J. SELTZER +1 818 886 1700
v.
No Logo Jack In The Box Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peterson Charles. +1 310 265 8000
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (116) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 116 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Exhibits Destroyed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed: Certificate And Order Re Disposition Of Exhibits
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Destruction Of Exhibits.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 113 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk's Calender - Review Exhibit Status Set 8/20/18 At 8:00 In Dept. Riexh.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 112 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trust Exoneration - Jury
Request RequestSpace
Blank 111 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Post Unclaimed - Jury Deposit Ccp 631.3
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Memorandum Of Costs (summary) In The Amount Of $$13,258.54 By Rebecca Anderson Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 109 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trust Used - Jury
Request RequestSpace
Blank 108 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trust Used - Jury
Request RequestSpace
Blank 107 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trust Used - Jury
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Change Of Address By Rebecca Anderson Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Filed By Rebecca Anderson.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Judgment On Special Verdict
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
System Generated Notice Re: Clerks Certificate Of Mailing.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 102 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk's Calender - Review Exhibit Status Set 8/28/13 At 8:00 In Dept. Riexh.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 101 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plff(13)def(5)court(1)exh Fr Dept 6/sandra Portill
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Receipt For Exhibits Filed By Exhibits Clerk From Department 06.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 99 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Jury Question(s) Filed - (confidential)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Information Sheet-random Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Information Sheet- Alphabetic Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 96 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Juror Telephone Number - (confidential)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 95 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Juror Seating Chart - (confidential)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amended Special Verdict
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Jury Instructions
Request RequestSpace
Blank 92 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee (partial) In The Amount Of $259.00 Paid By Defendant For 01/28/13
Request RequestSpace
Blank 91 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trust Deposit - Jury
Request RequestSpace
Blank 90 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee (partial) In The Amount Of $259.00 Paid By Defendant For 01/28/13
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Exhibit List
Request RequestSpace
Blank 88 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Jury Fee Deposit Of $150.00 Paid By Rebecca Anderson.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 87 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee In The Amount Of $518.00 Paid By Plaintiff For 01/28/13
Request RequestSpace
Blank 86 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Jury Fees Due In The Amount Of $371.92 To Be Paid By Rebecca Anderson Forthwith. Court Reporter Fees In The Amount Of $518.00 Are To Be Paid Forthwith For The Trial Date Of 01/28/13.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 85 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Jury Fees Due In The Amount Of $0.00 To Be Paid By Jack In The Box Inc Forthwith. Court Reporter Fees In The Amount Of $518.00 Are To Be Paid Forthwith For The Trial Date Of 01/28/13.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 84 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee In The Amount Of $518.00 Paid By Pltf For 01/24/13
Request RequestSpace
Blank 83 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trust Deposit - Jury
Request RequestSpace
Blank 82 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee In The Amount Of $518.00 Paid By Jack In The Box For 01/25/13
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Amended Trial Exhibit List Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants 2nd Amended Trial Witness List Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Amended Exhibit List Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 78 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee In The Amount Of $129.50 Paid By Pltf For 01/17/13
Request RequestSpace
Blank 77 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee In The Amount Of $388.50 Paid By Pltf For 01/17/13
Request RequestSpace
Blank 76 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trust Deposit - Jury
Request RequestSpace
Blank 75 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee In The Amount Of $518.00 Paid By Deft For 01/17/13
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Witness List Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Exhibit List Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Trial Witness List Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Trial Exhibit List Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Mil # 1,2,3,4,5,6,7,8,9,11,13 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service Of Statement Of Case,mil 1-6,exhibit, Witness List Served On Plaintiff Served 01/03/13 Filed (non-complaint)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plantiffs Statement Of Non-opposition To Defendants Mil #1 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Request For Caci Jury Instructions
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Jury Instructions Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Request For Mini-0pening And Supplemental Court-conducted Voir Dire Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Statement Of The Case Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Reply To Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Mil #2 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Second Objection To Plaintiffs Designation Of Trial Witnesses Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Jury Statement Of The Case Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of Charles Peterson In Support Of Dfts 2nd Object Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #2 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #3,5,6,8,9,11 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #13 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #4 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #1 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #7 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine #4 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine #6 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine #3 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion In Limine #2 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Motion In Limine #6 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Motion In Limine #3 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Motion In Limine #4 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Motion In Limine #1 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Motion In Limine #2 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #14 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #11 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #12 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #13 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #10 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #6 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #7 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #8 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #9 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #5 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #2 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #3 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #4 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #1 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Stipulation To Agree To A Trial Assignment Mediation Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of In Supporto Of Obj To Untimely Exchange Of Docs Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Plaintiffs Failure To Participate In Exchange Of Pre-trial Documents By Jack In The Box Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Posting Jury Fees By Rebecca Anderson.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 26 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Jury Fee Deposit Of $150.00 Paid By Rebecca Anderson.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Objection To Plaintiffs Designation Of Trial Witnesses Filed By Jack In The Box Inc
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fax Filing By Rebecca Anderson ($1.50 Per Page).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Association Of Counsel On The Complaint Filed 03/02/2011 Of Rebecca Anderson As To Plaintiff Rebecca Anderson Adding Attorney Alderlaw Pc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed By Plaintiff Rebecca Anderson
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trial Setting Conference Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hmoti Hearing Set For 02/24/12 At 09:00 Is Vacated -for The Reason: Per Moving Party Request
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of And Withdrawl Of Motion To Compel Responses By Rebecca Anderson Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Separate Statement In Support Of Opposition
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To Mtn To Compel By Jack In The Box Inc Filed Untimely Per 1005ccp/317(a)crc/437c(b)ccp
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Set 2/24/12 At 9:00 In Department 02
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion To/for Compel Responses To Special Interrogatories And Req For Reasonable Sanctions And Atty Fees By Rebecca Anderson Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of Antoniette Jauregui Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Jack In The Box Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Ruling Re: Cmc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement By Jack In The Box Inc Filed Untimely Pursuant To Crc 3.725.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Rebecca Anderson
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Complaint Filed 03/02/2011 Of Rebecca Anderson By Jack In The Box Inc Represented By Law Offices Of Charles Peterson Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Case Re-assigned To Assigned Judge In Department 04. (no Department Change)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 03/02/2011 Of Rebecca Anderson Served On Jack In The Box Inc With Service Date Of 03/03/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons On Complaint Filed 03/02/2011 Of Rebecca Anderson Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 5/31/11 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Directly Assigned To Department 04. (riverside)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Is Assigned To Department 02 For Law And Motion Purposes.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?