Medina v. K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes Inc

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC1105809
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 6:12 PM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Ahmad Almansreh, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milstein Adelman Llp +1 310 396 9600
No Logo Alberto Medina, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milstein Adelman Llp +1 310 396 9600
No Logo Claudia Castro, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milstein Adelman Llp +1 310 396 9600
No Logo Hector Castro, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milstein Adelman Llp +1 310 396 9600
No Logo Jose Dominguez, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milstein Adelman Llp +1 310 396 9600
No Logo Laura Dominguez, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milstein Adelman Llp +1 310 396 9600
No Logo Maria Cano, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milstein Adelman Llp +1 310 396 9600
No Logo Maria Carrillo, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milstein Adelman Llp +1 310 396 9600
No Logo Norma Casillas, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milstein Adelman Llp +1 310 396 9600
No Logo Rebecca Anderson, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milstein Adelman Llp +1 310 396 9600
Other Parties
No Logo Brennan Electric Inc, Cross-complainant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space The Luti Law Firm +1 323 960 2600
No Logo Executive Plumbinginc A California Corpora, Cross-complainant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hines Carder +1 714 513 1122
No Logo Gateway Plasteringinc A California Corp, Cross-complainant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hines Carder +1 714 513 1122
No Logo K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc., Cross-complainant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Green & Hall Apc +1 916 367 7098
No Logo Western Insulationlp, Cross-complainant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hammons & Baldino,llp +1 310 606 5400
No Logo Brudvik Inc, Cross-defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wait & Colfer +1 909 621 5672
No Logo Concrete Landscapeand Masonryproduction I, Cross-defendant
No Logo Excel Cabinets Inc, Cross-defendant
No Logo Fence Works, Inc., Cross-defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pegan, Kevin +1 714 436 3261
No Logo H20 Landscape And Irrigation Incorporated, Cross-defendant
No Logo Integrity Window Company Inc, Cross-defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diederich & Associates +1 909 793 9002
No Logo K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc., Cross-defendant
No Logo K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc., Cross-defendant
No Logo Ken Ealy Painting Inc, Cross-defendant
No Logo Moes 1 Through 100, Cross-defendant
No Logo Moes 1-100, Cross-defendant
No Logo Precision Plastering Inc, Cross-defendant
No Logo Roes 1through 100, Cross-defendant
No Logo Sc Design Inc, Cross-defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diederick & Associates +1 714 922 1330
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (346) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 346 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Return Mail Received For Order Of Dismissal As To Hines Carder; Reason Returned: Not Deliverable As Addressed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order Of Dismissal; Honorable Judge Craig G. Riemer.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order Of Dismissal; Honorable Judge Craig G. Riemer.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
K.hovnanian Communities Incs Decl For The December 5,2016 Osc Hearing Re Dismissal Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of /in Preparation For December 5 2016 Osc Hearing Re Sanctions Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice As To The Cross Complaint Of K Hovnanian Communites Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 339 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Change Attorney On K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Southern, Inc. From Green & Hall A Professional Corporation To Green & Hall Apc On All Complaints.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 338 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Change Attorney On K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc From Ulich & Terry Llp To Green & Hall Apc On All Complaints.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Change Of Address By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Fenceworks Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Leonard Roofing Inca California Corporatio Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To J&b Manufacturing Corp A California Corp Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 331 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Change Attorney On Hearth & Home Technologies Inc From Tucker Law Firm To Tucker Ellis Llp On All Complaints.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Change Of Handling Attorney By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order On Good Faith Settlement Filed Regarding Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc And Fenceworks Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 327 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Returned Document: Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos Submitted By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 326 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing On Osc Re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant To Crc 3.1385(b) Set On 12/05/16 At 8:30 In Department Ps1 - Rescheduled To:.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 325 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing On Osc Re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant To Crc 3.1385(b) Set On 12/05/16 At 8:30 In Department 05.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Case Reassigned To Judge Craig G. Riemer In Department 05 For All Future Proceedings. (riverside)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Settlement Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure Section 877.6(a)(2) By Fenceworks Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Application For Determination Of G/f/s As To Fenceworks Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 321 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Return To Court's Control
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Defendant Stellar Enterprisesinc A California Corp Filed W Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 319 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Returned Document: Request For Dismissal Submitted By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 318 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing On Osc Re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant To Crc 3.1385(b) Set On 12/05/16 At 8:30 In Department Ps1.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Case Filed - Unconditional Settlement Crc 3.1385 [form Cm 200].
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
System Generated Notice Re: Order To Show Cause Hearing Reg:dismissal.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice As To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Posting Jury Fees By Fenceworks Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 313 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Jury Fee Deposit Of $150.00 Paid By Fenceworks Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To Plaintiff Samuel Lopez, Rocio Lopez, Elizabeth Martinez, Antonio Martinez, Eileen Rodriguez, Juan Uriarte, Lourdes Zaragoza, Miguel Nunez, Hector & Maria Aquino, Miguel & Maria Terriquez Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 311 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Dismissal On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Cnse Countertops Inc A California Corporati, Hearth & Home Technologies Inca California Filed W Prejudice--
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal W Prejudice For J&b Manufacturing By K Hovnanian Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Change Of Handling Attorney By Fenceworks Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 307 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fax Filing By Western Insulationlp ($1.50 Per Page).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Of Cross Complaint Filed 01/20/2012 Of Western Insulationlp Filed Wo Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Defendant Ken Ealy Painting Inc, Western Insulationlp, Pacific Builders Hardware & Lighting Inc A Filed W Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 304 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Returned Document: Disassociation Of Counsel Submitted By Brudvik Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Association Of Counsel On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Defendant Leonard Roofing Inca California Corporatio Adding Attorney Law Offices Of Kevin Pegan Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 302 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complex Case Designation Fee Paid On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Defendant(s)/x-defendant(s) Leonard Roofing Inca California Corporatio; (1 Pymt(s) Received; Total Of 8 Defendant(s) Paid To Date).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Leonard Roofing Inca California Corporatio Represented By Vik Nagpal Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Stipulation And Order Setting Aside Default Entered Filed By Leonard Roofing Inca California Corporatio
Request RequestSpace
Blank 299 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
First Appearance Fee Paid By Leonard Roofing Inca California Corporatio
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Defendant Integrity Window Company Inc, Executive Plumbinginc A California Corpora, Timothy T Creager, Ultra-wall Inc A California Corp Filed W Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Association Of Counsel By Brudvik Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order On Good Faith Settlement Filed Regarding Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc And Western Insulationlp.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Trial Setting Conference And Further Mediation By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Application For Good Faith Settlement Filed By Western Insulationlp.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Mail Of Notice/app/(proposed) Ord Re Good Faith Settlement On All Interested Parties With A Mailing Date Of 01/10/14 Filed. (non-complaint)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Settlement By Western Insulationlp Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 291 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Change Attorney On Fenceworks Inc From Law Offices Of Craig J Silver To Law Offices Of Kevin Pegan On All Complaints.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Substitution Of Attorney Filed; On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Remove Attorney Law Offices Of Craig J Silver For Party(s) Fenceworks Inc And Replace With Attorney Law Offices Of Kevin Pegan
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amended Declaration Of Ryan N Meyer Filed By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc
Request RequestSpace
Blank 288 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee (under One Hour) Paid By Leonard Roofing Inc For Hearing 01/10/14.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Elliot Leonard In Support Of X-deft Leonard Roofing Incs Ex Parte Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Cameron B Gordon In Support Of X-deft Leonard Roofing Incs Ex Parte Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 285 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion Hearing Reservation Re: Ex Parte Application To Set Aside Default Set For 01/10/14 At 09:30 Is Confirmed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 284 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Ex Parte Hearing Set On 1/10/14 At 8:30 In Dept Ps1
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Ex Parte Re: Application To Set Aside Default Or Alternatively By Leonard Roofing Inca California Corporatio Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 282 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fee Paid For On-line Reservation Of Motion ($60.00). Confirmation Number Res29811 For Hearing Reserved On 01/10/14.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 281 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
On-line Motion Reserved On Behalf Of Leonard Roofing, Inc..
Request RequestSpace
Blank 280 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Reserved For Ex Parte Hearing Set 01/10/14 At 9:30 In Dept. Ps1 - Res29811.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Ryan N Meyer Submitted In Advance Of The Order To Show Cause Re Sanctions As To Certain Parties Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of Craig J Silver Re: Order To Show Cause Hearing Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 277 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Returned Document: Order After Hrg Re 5/31/12 Mtn To Consolidate Submitted By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc, K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Southern, Inc..
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Continued Mandatory Settlement Conference By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Entry Of Default Only On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Leonard Roofing Inca California Corporatio Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order On Good Faith Settlement Filed Regarding Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc And J&b Manufacturing Corp A California Corp.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Ruling Re: Ex Parte Application For An Order Appointing Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Mail Of (certified Mail Return Receipt)app/ntc & Ord Good On All Interested Parties With A Mailing Date Of 10/08/13 Filed. (non-complaint)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Application For Good Faith Settlement Filed By J&b Manufacturing Corp A California Corp.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Of Settlement Of J&b Manufacturing Corp Dba San Diego Mirror & Window By J&b Manufacturing Corp A California Corp Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 269 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complex Case Designation Fee Paid On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Defendant(s)/x-defendant(s) J&b Manufacturing Corp A California Corp; (7 Pymt(s) Received; Total Of 1000.00 Defendant(s) Paid To Date).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By J&b Manufacturing Corp A California Corp Represented By Law Offices Of Russell R Arens Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 267 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Returned Document: Answer Submitted By J&b Manufacturing Corp A California Corp.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 266 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion Hearing Reservation Re: Ex Aparte Set For 10/08/13 At 09:30 Is Confirmed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 264 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Ex Parte Hearing Set On 10/08/13 At 8:30 In Dept Ps1
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Ex Parte Application To/for An Order Appointing Settlement By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc, K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Southern, Inc. Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 262 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fee Paid For On-line Reservation Of Motion ($60.00). Confirmation Number Res26826 For Hearing Reserved On 10/08/13.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 261 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
On-line Motion Reserved On Behalf Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc..
Request RequestSpace
Blank 260 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Reserved For Ex Parte Hearing Set 10/08/13 At 9:30 In Dept. Ps1 - Res26826.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Hearth & Home Technologies Inca California
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting Good Faith Settlement By Brudvik Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Alberto Medina, Ahmad Almansreh, Rebecca Anderson, Maria Cano, Maria Carrillo, Norma Casillas, Hector Castro, Claudia Castro
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Transfer To Palm Springs And Reassignment Of Department To Ps1 For All Purposes.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order On Good Faith Settlement Filed Regarding Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc And Brudvik Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Integrity Window Company Inc With Service Date Of 06/26/13 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Application For Good Faith Settlement Filed By Brudvik Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Settlement By Brudvik Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 251 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
First Appearance Fee Paid By Executive Plumbinginc A California Corpora
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Cross-complaint Of Executive Plumbinginc A California Corpora Represented By Hines Carder Filed (superior Court)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Demand For Jury Trial By Executive Plumbinginc A California Corpora Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Executive Plumbinginc A California Corpora Represented By Hines Carder Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 246 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complex Case Designation Fee Paid On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Defendant(s)/x-defendant(s) Integrity Window Company Inc; (4000.00 Pymt(s) Received; Total Of 4 Defendant(s) Paid To Date).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Integrity Window Company Inc Represented By Diederich & Associates Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Uribes Home Ready Inc A California Corp With Service Date Of 06/26/13 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Affidavit Of Reasonable Diligence By K Hovnanian Communities Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On R&l Installations Inc A California Corp With Service Date Of 06/26/13 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On All Servicesinc A California Corporation With Service Date Of 06/26/13 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Truman Door Systemsinc With Service Date Of 06/26/13 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Barcenas Construction Coa California Corpor With Service Date Of 06/26/13 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On J&b Manufacturing Corp A California Corp With Service Date Of 06/17/13 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order Re Applctn Directing Service On X-defts Through The Ca Secretary Of State (granted); Honorable Judge John G Evans.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of Ryan Meyer In Support Of Application For Order Directing Service Through Ca Secretary State Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice & Application For Order Directing Service Of X-complaint Through Ca Secretary Of State By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina By Hearth & Home Technologies Inc Represented By Tucker Ellis Llp Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dimissal Without Prejudice By Alberto Medina Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 231 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 240 To Be Williams Mechanicalinc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 230 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 239 To Be Victor Valley Synthetic Marble--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 229 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 238 To Be Uribe's Home Readyinc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 228 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 237 To Be Ultra-wall Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 227 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 236 To Be Truman Door Systemsinc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 226 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 235 To Be Stellar Enterprisesinc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 225 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 234 To Be Rescom Overhead Doors Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 224 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 233 To Be Rem Concepts Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 223 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 232 To Be R&l Installations Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 222 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 231 To Be Pacific Builders Hardware & Lighting Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 221 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 230 To Be Mckinzie Electricalcontractorsinc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 220 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 229 To Be Masonry Group California South--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 219 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 228 To Be Timothy T Creager--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 218 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 227 To Be Leonard Roofing Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 217 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 226 To Be John Griffin Construction Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 216 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 225 To Be J&b Manufacturing Corp--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 215 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 224 To Be Ge Holdings Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 214 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 223 To Be Group Seven Landscape Development--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 213 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 222 To Be Gateway Plasteringinc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 212 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 221 To Be Gateway Insulationinc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 211 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 220 To Be Hearth & Home Technologies Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 210 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 219 To Be Fireplace Distributors Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 209 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 218 To Be Executive Plumbinginc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 208 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 217 To Be Elite Window--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 207 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 216 To Be Cnse Countertops Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 206 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 25 To Be Barcenas Construction Co--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 205 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 214 To Be All Services Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amendment To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 213 To Be A/c Customs Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 203 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Dismissal On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To Plaintiff Elisa Gomez, Javier Romero, Gustavo Sandoval, Lionel Torres, Jose Martinez, Maria Martinez Without Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To Plaintiff Rebecca Anderson, Maria Cano, Maria Gutierrez, Steven Perez, Sheila Quintero, Vanessa Talavera, Alma Talavera, Norma Cruz, Alondro White Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Status Conference By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Hearth & Home Technologies Inca California
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Stay Of Proceedings - Bankruptcy As To Defendant Rescom Overhead Doors Inc A California Corp Filed. (form Cm-180)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Western Insulationlp
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Alberto Medina
Request RequestSpace
Blank 195 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Change Firm John A Kaniewski For Party(s) Sc Design Inc To Firm Diederick & Associates
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Change Of Firm Name Filed; Change Firm Osman & Associates For Party(s) Sc Design Inc To Firm Diederick & Associates.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Entry Of Default Only On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To H20 Landscape And Irrigation Incorporated, Ken Ealy Painting Inc, Precision Plastering Inc, A/c Customs Inc A California Corporation, Group Seven Landscape Development A Ca Corp, Ge Holdings Inc A California Corporation Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Cnse Countertops Inc A California Corporati; Mailing Date Of 02/15/13 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Rescom Overhead Doors Inc A California Corp; Mailing Date Of 02/15/13 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 190 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Entry Of Default On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To All Defendants John Griffin Construction Inc Acalifornia, Rem Concepts Inc Acalifornia Corp, Williams Mechanicalinc A California Corp--
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Stay Of Proceedings - Bankruptcy As To Defendant Sc Design Inc Filed. (form Cm-180)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Defendant Victor Valley Synthetic Marblea Ca Corp Filed With Prejudice.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 186 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
First Appearance Fee Paid By Brennan Electric Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Demand For Jury Trial By Brennan Electric Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued On Cross Complaint Filed 01/14/2013 Of Brennan Electric Inc And Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Cross-complaint Of Brennan Electric Inc Represented By The Lee Law Group Pc Filed (superior Court)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina By Brennan Electric Inc Represented By The Lee Law Group Pc Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amended First Roe Amendment To Its Cross Complaint Filed By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc, K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Southern, Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Group Seven Landscape Development A Ca Corp With Service Date Of 12/16/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Rem Concepts Inc Acalifornia Corp With Service Date Of 12/12/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Stay Of Proceedings - Bankruptcy As To Defendant Stellar Enterprisesinc A California Corp Filed. (form Cm-180)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Williams Mechanicalinc A California Corp With Service Date Of 11/08/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Ge Holdings Inc A California Corporation; Mailing Date Of 11/14/12 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Fireplace Distributors Inc A California Cor With Service Date Of 11/15/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Gateway Insulationinc A California Corpora With Service Date Of 11/07/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On A/c Customs Inc A California Corporation With Service Date Of 11/15/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Hearth & Home Technologies Inca California Represented By Tucker Law Firm Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Pacific Builders Hardware & Lighting Inc A; Mailing Date Of 11/09/12 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Masonary Group California Southa Ca Corp; Mailing Date Of 11/09/12 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Leonard Roofing Inca California Corporatio; Mailing Date Of 11/13/12 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To John Griffin Construction Inc Acalifornia; Mailing Date Of 11/13/12 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Hearth & Home Technologies Inca California With Service Date Of 11/07/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Gateway Plasteringinc A California Corp With Service Date Of 11/07/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Executive Plumbinginc A California Corpora With Service Date Of 11/07/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Timothy T Creager With Service Date Of 11/08/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Ultra-wall Inc A California Corp With Service Date Of 11/09/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Stellar Enterprisesinc A California Corp With Service Date Of 11/09/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Victor Valley Synthetic Marblea Ca Corp; Mailing Date Of 11/13/12 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued On Cross Complaint Filed 11/14/2012 Of Gateway Plasteringinc A California Corp And Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Demand For Jury Trial By Gateway Plasteringinc A California Corp Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Cross-complaint Of Gateway Plasteringinc A California Corp Represented By Hines Carder Filed (superior Court)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 157 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complex Case Designation Fee Paid On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Defendant(s)/x-defendant(s) Gateway Plasteringinc A California Corp; (3 Pymt(s) Received; Total Of 1000.00 Defendant(s) Paid To Date).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Gateway Plasteringinc A California Corp Represented By Hines Carder Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina By Bruvik Inc Represented By Law Offices Of Wait& Colfer Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Case Management Conference By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc, K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 153 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Naming Roes/moes 28 To Be Williams Mechanicalinc A California Corp--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 152 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Naming Roes/moes 19-28 To Be Pacific Builders Hardware & Lighting Inc A, R&l Installations Inc A California Corp, Rem Concepts Inc Acalifornia Corp, Rescom Overhead Doors Inc A California Corp, Stellar Enterprisesinc A California Corp, Truman Door Systemsinc, Ultra-wall Inc A California Corp, Uribes Home Ready Inc A California Corp, Victor Valley Synthetic Marblea Ca Corp--
Request RequestSpace
Blank 151 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Naming Roes/moes 10-18 To Be Gateway Plasteringinc A California Corp, Group Seven Landscape Development A Ca Corp, Ge Holdings Inc A California Corporation, J&b Manufacturing Corp A California Corp, John Griffin Construction Inc Acalifornia, Leonard Roofing Inca California Corporatio, Timothy T Creager, Masonary Group California Southa Ca Corp, Mckinzie Electricalcontractorsinc--
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amendment To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Naming Roes/moes 001 To Be A/c Customs Inc A California Corporation, All Servicesinc A California Corporation, Barcenas Construction Coa California Corpor, Cnse Countertops Inc A California Corporati, Elite Window A California Corporation, Executive Plumbinginc A California Corpora, Fireplace Distributors Inc A California Cor, Hearth & Home Technologies Inca California, Gateway Insulationinc A California Corpora Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement By Western Insulationlp Filed Untimely Pursuant To Crc 3.725.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina By Sc Design Inc Represented By Osman & Associates Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Western Insulationlp
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of Bad Address Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of Bad Address Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 144 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Amending 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 212 To Be Brennan Electric Inc--
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amendment To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 211 To Be Bruvik Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Alberto Medina
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Served On Precision Plastering Inc With Service Date Of 05/04/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To Western Shower Door; Mailing Date Of 08/21/12 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To H20 Landscape And Irrigation Incorporated; Mailing Date Of 08/21/12 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To Sc Design Inc; Mailing Date Of 08/21/12 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Ruling Re: Hearing 8/14/12 Lift The Stay & For Consolidation Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 136 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion Hearing Reservation Motion To Consolidate Set For 08/14/12 At 09:00 Is Vacated (moving Papers Not Filed).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply To /brief Re:motion To Lift The Stay And For Consolidation By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc, K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Status Conference By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Amendment To Time Of Hrg On Mtn To Lift The Stay & For Consolidation Or By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc, K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Southern, Inc., K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To (plaintiffs) K Hovnanians Motion To Lift Stay By Alberto Medina, Ahmad Almansreh, Rebecca Anderson, Maria Cano, Maria Carrillo Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amended Proof Of Service By Mail Of Motion To Lift The Stay And For Consolidation On All Interested Parties With A Mailing Date Of 07/18/12 Filed. (non-complaint)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 130 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee (under One Hour) Paid By Plaintiff For Hearing 08/14/12.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Alberto Medina
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Judicial Reference In Sppt Of Mtn To Lift Stay & For Consoldiation Is Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of Amanda L Butts In Sppt Of Mtn To Lift Stay & For Consolidation Or Alternatively An Ord Short Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 126 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Set 8/14/12 At 8:30 In Department 2f
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion To/for Lift The Stay & For Consolidation Or Alternatively For An Ord Shortening Time For Mtn T By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Southern, Inc., K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 124 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion Hearing Reservation Re: Hrmot Set For 08/14/12 At 09:00 Is Confirmed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Brudvik Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
System Generated Notice Re: Ex Parte Application For An Order Lifting Stay.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To K Hovnanians Ex Parte Appl For An Order Lifting By Alberto Medina Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 119 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court Reporter Fee (under One Hour) Paid By K Hovnanian Communities For 07/13/12.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Amanda L Butts In Support Of Ex Parte Application For An Order Lifting Stay Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Ex Parte Application To/for An Order Lifting Stay By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc, K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 116 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Ex Parte Hearing Set On 7/13/12 At 8:30 In Dept 2f
Request RequestSpace
Blank 115 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rejected Document: Second Amended Complaint Submitted By Alberto Medina.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 114 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fee Paid For On-line Reservation Of Motion ($40.00). Confirmation Number Res12631 For Hearing Reserved On 08/14/12.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 113 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fee Paid For On-line Reservation Of Motion ($40.00). Confirmation Number Res12629 For Hearing Reserved On 08/14/12.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 112 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Reserved Set 08/14/12 At 9:00 In Dept. 02 - Res12631
Request RequestSpace
Blank 111 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
On-line Motion Reserved On Behalf Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc..
Request RequestSpace
Blank 110 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Reserved Set 08/14/12 At 9:00 In Dept. 02 - Res12629
Request RequestSpace
Blank 109 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
On-line Motion Reserved On Behalf Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc..
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Ruling Re: Motion To Consolidate Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply To Pltfs Supplemental Opposition To Motion By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Pltfs Supplemental Brief In Supt Of Their Oppo To Hovnanians Mtn To Consolidate
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Continued Hearing On Motion To Consolidate By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice On Transfer (by Clerk)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 102 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Assigned To Department 2f For Case Management Purposes (notice To Counsel).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply To Motion For Consolidation By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To K. Hovnanians Motion To Colsolidate Case By Alberto Medina Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To Plaintiff Monica Tarango Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina By Western Insulationlp Represented By Hammons & Baldino Llp Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 96 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rejected Document: Answer To Thrid Amended Complaint Submitted By Western Insulationlp.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina By Fenceworks Inc Represented By Law Offices Of Craig J Silver Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement By Alberto Medina Filed Untimely Pursuant To Crc 3.725.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Served On Excel Cabinets Inc With Service Date Of 04/03/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Served On Fenceworks Inc With Service Date Of 04/03/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Served On Western Insulationlp With Service Date Of 04/03/12 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Errata Re Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion To Consolidate By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Brudvik Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of Amanda L Butts In Support Of Motion To Consolid Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 85 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Set 5/31/12 At 8:30 In Department 02
Request RequestSpace
Blank 84 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion Hearing Reservation Re: Motion To Consolidate Set For 05/31/12 At 08:30 Is Confirmed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion To/for Consolidate Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To Plaintiff Hilda Valenzuela Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 81 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fee Paid For On-line Reservation Of Motion ($40.00). Confirmation Number Res9999 For Hearing Reserved On 05/18/12.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order From District Court Of Appeal Petition For Writ Of Mandate Is Denied.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 79 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Reserved Set 05/18/12 At 8:30 In Dept. 02 - Res9999
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Errata Re Pltfs First Amended Complaint By Alberto Medina Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Brudvik Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Alberto Medina
Request RequestSpace
Blank 75 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rejected Document: Case Management Statement Submitted By Western Insulationlp.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Substitution Of Attorney Filed; On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Remove Attorney Ulich & Terry Llp For Party(s) K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc And Replace With Attorney Green & Hall Apc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Association Of Counsel On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Plaintiff K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Adding Attorney Green & Hall A Professional Corporation Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Served On Sc Design Inc With Service Date Of 12/05/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement By Brudvik Inc Filed Untimely Pursuant To Crc 3.725.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 70 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complex Case Designation Fee Paid On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Defendant(s)/x-defendant(s) Brudvik Inc; (550.00 Pymt(s) Received; Total Of 03 Defendant(s) Paid To Date).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Brudvik Inc Represented By Wait & Colfer Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Ruling Re: Mtn To Dismiss On 1/12 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 67 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rejected Document: Answer To Cross-complaint/case Management Statemen Submitted By Brudvik Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc
Request RequestSpace
Blank 65 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
--also Served Cross Complaint Filed 01/20/2012 Of Western Insulationlp On K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc, K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc With Service Date Of 01/19/12 --
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons On Cross Complaint Filed 01/20/2012 Of Western Insulationlp Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Cross-complaint Of Western Insulationlp Represented By Hammons & Baldino Llp Filed (superior Court)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Western Insulationlp Represented By Hammons & Baldino Llp Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 61 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rejected Document: Answer To Cross Complaint;cross Complaint;summons Submitted By Western Insulationlp.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 60 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complex Case Designation Fee Paid On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Defendant(s)/x-defendant(s) Fenceworks Inc; (550.00 Pymt(s) Received; Total Of 02 Defendant(s) Paid To Date).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Fenceworks Inc Represented By Law Offices Of Craig J Silver Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc By Sc Design Inc Represented By John A Kaniewski Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Alberto Medina
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply To /mtn To Dismiss By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Concrete Landscapeand Masonryproduction I With Service Date Of 12/16/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Brudvik Inc; Mailing Date Of 12/12/11 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To Defs Moiton To Dismiss Or Stay The Action By Alberto Medina Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amendment To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Naming Does 201-210 To Be Concrete Landscapeand Masonryproduction I, Excel Cabinets Inc, Fenceworks Inc, H20 Landscape And Irrigation Incorporated, Integrity Window Company Inc, Ken Ealy Painting Inc, Precision Plastering Inc, Sc Design Inc, Western Insulationlp, Western Shower Door Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Mail On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Ken Ealy Painting Inc Filed; Date Of Mailing 12/05/11
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On H20 Landscape And Irrigation Incorporated With Service Date Of 12/04/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Precision Plastering Inc With Service Date Of 12/06/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Ken Ealy Painting Inc With Service Date Of 12/04/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Excel Cabinets Inc With Service Date Of 12/05/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc As To Fenceworks Inc; Mailing Date Of 12/05/11 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Western Insulationlp With Service Date Of 12/02/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Served On Western Shower Door With Service Date Of 12/07/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To Plaintiff Gregory Powell, Sara Powell, Cesar Torres Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 42 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fee Paid For On-line Reservation Of Motion ($40.00). Confirmation Number Res5383 For Hearing Reserved On 01/12/12.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To Plaintiff Leonel Gutierrez, Cynthia Gutierrez Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Of Chad Fuller In Support Of Mtn To Dismiss Or Alternatively Stay The Action Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued On Cross Complaint Filed 11/18/2011 Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc And Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Compendium Of Non Ca Authority In Support Of Mtn To Dismiss Or Alternatively Stay The Action
Request RequestSpace
Blank 37 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Set 1/12/12 At 9:00 In Department 02
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Cross-complaint Of K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Represented By Ulich & Terry Llp Filed (superior Court)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 35 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion Hearing Reservation Re: Mtn To Dismiss Or Alternatively Stay Set For 01/12/12 At 09:00 Is Confirmed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion To/for Dismiss Or Alternatively Stay The Action And Compel Adr By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Represented By Ulich & Terry Llp Filed. (over $25,000.00)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 32 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Reserved Set 01/12/12 At 9:00 In Dept. 02 - Res5383
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order Of The Court Hearing On 10/25/11 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Ruling Re: Demurrer On 10/11 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Case Management Conference By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply To Opposition To Demurrer To 1st Amended Complaint By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To Demurrer By Alberto Medina Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement Filed By Alberto Medina
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
First Paper Fee Paid As To K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc (on-line Reservation).
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Reserved Set 10/11/11 At 9:00 In Dept. 02 - Res3584
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion Hearing Reservation Re: Demurrer Set For 10/11/11 At 09:00 Is Confirmed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing On Demurrer Set For 10/11/11 At 9:00 In Dept 02
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complex Case Designation Fee Paid On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina By Defendant(s)/x-defendant(s) K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc; (550.00 Pymt(s) Received; Total Of 01 Defendant(s) Paid To Date).
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Erroneously Sued As K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc., A Califo
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Demurrer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina By K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Represented By Ulich & Terry Llp Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
K. Hovnanian Communities, Inc Erroneously Sued As K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc., A Califo, K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Southern, Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina As To Plaintiff Manuel Soto, Letizia Soto Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Served On K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Southern, Inc With Service Date Of 06/20/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Served On K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Southern, Inc. With Service Date Of 06/20/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Served On K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc With Service Date Of 06/20/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Served On K. Hovnanian Forecast Homes, Inc., A Califo With Service Date Of 06/20/11 Filed.(personal Service)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Is Reassigned To The Honorable Commissioner Pamela A Thatcher In Dept. 04 For Case Management Purposes.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons On 1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
1st Amended Complaint Of Alberto Medina Filed. (amended Complaint - Superior Court)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set On 7/06/11 @ 8:00 In Department Clerk
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued On Complaint Filed 04/05/2011 Of Alberto Medina And Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complex Case Designation Fee Paid On Complaint Filed 04/05/2011 Of Alberto Medina.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 7/05/11 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Directly Assigned To Department 04. (riverside)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Is Assigned To Department 02 For Law And Motion Purposes.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?