Synchrony Bank v. Boyd

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC1708388
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 11:02 AM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
Synchrony Bank Synchrony Bank, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patenaude & Felix,a.p.c +1 858 244 7675
v.
No Logo Jason Boyd, Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Acknowledgment Of Full Satisfaction Of Judgment For Judgment Debtor, Jason Boyd Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Filed By Synchrony Bank.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Judgment By Default By Clerk Filed 10/25/17
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of /for Reimursement Of Costs Ccp 1033 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of /affidavit In Support Of Application For Entry Of Default Judgment Ccp 585 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Of Does/roes On The Complaint (collection - Riverside) Filed 05/09/2017 Of Synchrony Bank Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Entry Of Default And Clerk's Judgment On The Complaint (collection - Riverside) Filed 05/09/2017 Of Synchrony Bank As To Jason Boyd Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Complaint (collection - Riverside) Filed 05/09/2017 Of Synchrony Bank As To Jason Boyd; Mailing Date Of 07/05/17 Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Returned Document: Clerks Judgment Submitted By Synchrony Bank.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
System Generated Notice Re: Dept Assignment & Order To Show Cause Hearing.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued On Complaint (collection - Riverside) Filed 05/09/2017 Of Synchrony Bank And Filed.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate Of Counsel Filed. The Zip Code Is 92545-8963.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complaint And Party Information Entered (collection) (riverside)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order To Show Cause Set 6/28/18 At 8:30 In Department 11.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Directly Assigned To Department 11 For Case Management Purposes (collection).
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Limited Civil-general Civil Complaint For Collections Under $10,000. Crc 3.740 Filed. (riverside)
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?