Bowens v. Weber County Correctional Facility
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00155

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 3, 2019 at 12:39 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael A. Bowens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Bowens
v.
No Logo Weber County Correctional Facility, Defendant
No Logo Prisoner Litigation Unit, Notice Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Probation Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Prisoner Litigation Unit utdecf_prisonerlitigationunit@utd.uscourts.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to appoint counsel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Service of Process - Prisoners Only
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Bowens. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 12/04/2018) (tlh)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?