Binstock v. Hercules Fire Protection & Plumbing, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02793

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 7:56 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allen Binstock, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Binstock +1 216 522 3716 +1 216 522 2418 allen.binstock@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Iva Young Choe +1 216 522 7961 +1 216 522 2418 iva.choe@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rudra Choudhury +1 216 522 8182 +1 216 522 2418 rudra.choudhury@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M. Pincus +1 216 522 8187 +1 216 522 2418 stephen.pincus@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Hercules Fire Protection & Plumbing, LLC, Respondent
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Order on Motion to dismiss caseCourt Filing
Order granting Petitioner's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Petition. (Related Doc # 3 ). Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 12/21/2018.(R,Sh)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 Dismiss Case
    Motion for voluntary dismissal of petition filed by Petitioner Allen Binstock. (Pincus, Stephen)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
        Petition for injunction under section 10(J) of the National Labor Relations Act against Hercules Fire Protection & Plumbing, LLC.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by Allen Binstock. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Charge, # 3 Exhibit First Amended Charge, # 4 Exhibit Second Amended Charge, # 5 Exhibit Third Amended Charge, # 6 Exhibit Fourth Amended Charge, # 7 Exhibit Complaint, # 8 Exhibit Order Rescheduling Hearing, # 9 Exhibit Amendment to Complaint, # 10 Exhibit Answer) (Pincus, Stephen)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (S,SR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,SR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 14 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?