USA v. Ashland, Inc.
Criminal Case Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:02-cr-00152-JMR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 5:46 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H Koch
No Logo Marathon Petroleum Company LLC, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by hamline.edu Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H Allen Blair +1 651 523 2941 hblair01@hamline.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William P Hefner +1 612 623 2362 +1 612 378 3737 whefner@envirolawgroup.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office DMN
Filed 5/13/2002
County Washington
Terminated 12/23/2002
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 7413.F
Offense Level 4
427411(e) and 7413(c)(1) QQQ - NEW SOURCE PERFORMANCE STANDARDS (felony count)
Count 2
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 7413.M
Offense Level 3
427413 (c)(4) CLEAN AIR ACT - NEGLIGENT ENDANGERMENT (misdemeanor count)
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1018.M
Offense Level 3
181018 - FALSE CERTIFICATION OR WRITING (misdemeanor count)
Def Custody Status
Flags 4DIV, CLOSED, FRC, INFO
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Ashland, Inc. That all duties and responsibilities originally assigned to the National Park Foundation by way of this Court's original Judgment shall be transferred to the Mississippi River Fund, a 501(c)(3) non-profit entity. This reassignment is being made at the request of the National Park Foundation and the Mississippi river Fund, and with the consent of the US and Ashland, Inc. . Signed by Judge James M. Rosenbaum on 5/10/07. (KNK) Modified text on 5/15/2007 (leg). Copy to FLU and USDC Financial Unit.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: 7/3/2006 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER as to Ashland, Inc. reconsidering and granting [38] MOTION for Order for Early Termination of Probation filed by Ashland, Inc. Defendant is discharged from probation as of June 30, 2006. Signed by Judge James M Rosenbaum on 06/30/2006. (kmc) Modified text on 7/3/2006 (mkf). cc: PO
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Order on Motion to Order forCourt Filing
      ORDER denying [38] Motion for early discharge from probation; matter continued for reconsideration on June 30, 2006. Signed by Judge James M Rosenbaum on 01/05/06. (kmc)cc: Prob. on 1/6/2006 (LPH).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 1/3/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James M Rosenbaum :Motion Hearing as to Ashland, Inc. held on 12/30/2005 re [38] MOTION for Order for Early Termination of Probation filed by Ashland, Inc. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Dawn Hansen) (HLL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Certificate Of Service.
          Certificate of Service by Ashland, Inc..(Volling, James)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Stipulation
            STIPULATION of No Opposition to the Motion for Early Termination of Probation by Ashland, Inc., United States of America (Volling, James)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate
              LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Ashland, Inc. re [39] Memorandum in Support of Motion (Volling, James)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM in Support by Ashland, Inc. re [38] MOTION for Order for Early Termination of Probation (Volling, James)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 1/5/2006 Motion for Order for
                  MOTION for Order for Early Termination of Probation by Ashland, Inc.. (Volling, James)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Judgment of ForfeitureCourt Filing
                    JUDGMENT as to Ashland, Inc. re: [36] Stipulation and Order . Signed by Chief Judge James M Rosenbaum on 2/22/05. (JMM)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER that Count 1 of the Information in this matter dated 5/13/02 is hereby dismissed with prejudice and on the merits, and no further prosecution of said Count 1 may be brought. Signed by Cheif Judge James M Rosenbaum on 2/22/05. (JMM)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 35 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 USCA Judgment
                        JUDGMENT FROM EIGHTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS (certified copy) as to Ashland, Inc. [25] that the amended judgment of the district court is modified. (copies dist'd) 1 page(PJS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 34 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 USCA Opinion
                          OPINION FROM EIGHTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS (certified copy) as to Ashland, Inc. that the amended judgment of the district court is modified. (8 pages)(PJS)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003, Terminated: 2/23/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                            Sent to USCA, St Paul, the original file consisting of two (2) blue folders as to Ashland, Inc. (LEG)
                              LREF
                              Blank 33 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                              PROBATION CONSULTANT'S AGREEMENT (Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum / date signed 9/11/03) as to Ashland, Inc. (cc: all counsel & PROB). 8pgs (LEG) Modified on 10/20/2003
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                STIPULATION AND ORDER by Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum as to deft Ashland Inc. re: Probation Consultant (cc: all counsel & PROB). 3pgs (LEG)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER by Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum as to Ashland, Inc. re Probation Consultant. (cc: all counsel, PO) 2 pages (PJS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER ( Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum / 4/14/03) denying Marathon Ashland Petroleum LLC's motion to intervene [17-1] as to Ashland, Inc. (cc: all counsel) 1 page (PJS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                      Three (3) sealed PSIs sent to USCA, St. Paul, as to Ashland, Inc. (LEG)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 29 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Transcript (Conventional)
                                        TRANSCRIPT OF GUILTY PLEA held 5/13/02 before JMR as to defendant Ashland, Inc. (Court Reporter: Kimberly Evavold w/Shaddix). 40 pages (SEPARATE) (PJS)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003, Terminated: 2/23/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                          Sent to USCA, St Paul, PLEA TRANSCRIPT, Doc. 29, as to Ashland, Inc. (PJS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 28 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Receipt
                                            RECEIPT as to defendant Ashland, Inc. in the amount of $304.00 receipt number 142006 for payment for preparation of the designation of record. 1 pg (
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 27 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                              Clerk's Record on Appeal delivered to the 8th Circuit Court as to Ashland, Inc. (cc: Counsel). 3pgs (LEG)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003, Terminated: 2/23/2004 USCA Case Number
                                                NOTIFICATION BY CIRCUIT COURT of Appellate Docket Number 03-1689 as to defendant Ashland, Inc. (
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 2/23/2004 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                                  Sent to USCA, St Paul, sentencing transcript, Doc. #12, as to Ashland, Inc. (PJS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 2/23/2004 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                                                    DELIVERED TWO COPIES of each of the following to the Court of Appeals, St. Paul Office: Revised information sheet, Notice of Appeal, Order or Judgment and Docket entries (certified) as to defendant Ashland, Inc. (PJS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Receipt
                                                      RECEIPT as to deft Ashland, Inc. in the amount of $105.00 receipt number 265612 for notice of appeal. (PJS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE EIGHTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS by deft Ashland, Inc. (filed by Faegre & Benson) from judgments of JMR filed 1/15/03 and 3/5/03 [13-1] [24-1]. (cc: all counsel) 2 pages (PJS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                          AMENDED JUDGMENT as to defendant Ashland, Inc. by Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum (dated 3/4/03) re probation and special conditions of probation. (Copies dist'd) 6 pages (PJS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                            SATISFACTION OF MONETARY IMPOSITION as to Ashland, Inc. in the amount of $9,150,250.00. 1pg (cc: FSD) (LEG) Modified on 02/27/2003
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                              MOTION for extension of time to file appeal by Ashland, Inc. (3 pages) (PJS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER (Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum / date signed 2/5/03) that defendant Ashland Inc.'s motion for an extension of time to file a Notice of Appeal is granted. Defendant's time within which to file a Notice of Appeal shall be extended for 30 days, under Fed.R.App.P.4(b)(4) (cc: all counsel) (1pg) (BLW
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                  RESPONSE of pltf USA to deft Ashland, Inc.'s motion to amend judgment [18-1]. 4pgs (LEG)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Position on Sentencing/Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                    REPLY POSITION of deft on the issue of probation. (7 pgs) (PJS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                      MOTION to amend judgment by Ashland, Inc. (3 pages) (PJS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003, Terminated: 4/14/2003 Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                        MOTION AND MEMORANDUM by Marathon Ashland as to deft Ashland, Inc. to intervene (to Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum). (6 pages) (PJS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - Defen
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE for Marathon Ashland as to deft Ashland, INc. (1 page) (PJS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Judgment Returned Executed
                                                                            JUDGMENT returned executed as to defendant Ashland, Inc. 1/29/03 (Probation). 6 pgs (
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Position on Sentencing/Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                              POSITION of govt with respect to "Probation Consultant" and MAP as to deft Ashland, Inc. (100 pages) (PJS)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                SENTENCING JUDGMENT as to defendant Ashland, Inc. by Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum (dated 1/14/03). (Copies dist'd) 6 pages (PJS)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Transcript (Conventional)
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF SENTENCING held 12/23/02 before JMR as to defendant Ashland, Inc. (Court Reporter: Dawn M. H. Hansen). 45pg(s) (SEPARATE) (LEG)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTES: before Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum SENTENCING Ashland, Inc. (1) counts 2 & 3 - Probation for 5 yrs, spec assmt of $250.00, fine of $5,400,000 payable as follows: $1.5 million to US Atty and $3.9 million to Nat'l Park Foundation (see details in judgment), restitution in the amt of $3,750,000 payable to Randall Danielson $3,500,00, David Slack $10,000, Steve Hood $10,000, Chris Riley $10,000, Darren Wilson $10,000, Joe Riley $10,000, St Paul Fire Dept $50,000, Cottage Grove Fire Dept $50,000, Newport Fire Dept $50,000, St Paul Park Refinery Emergency Response Team $50,000. Prosecution deferred for up to 4 yrs as to count 1. Attorney's are given 21 days to propose a way to use a specialist as an expert/special probationer. If unable to agree, they will submit position papers to the court. Some funds will be reserved to pay specialist. Court Reporter: Dawn Hansen. 4 pgs (
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/24/2002 Position on Sentencing/Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN AID OF SENTENCING as to deft Ashland, Inc. (16 pages) (PJS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Position on Sentencing/Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                        POSITION of govt with respect to sentencing Ashland, Inc. (30 pages) (
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 Position on Sentencing/Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                          POSITION of deft with respect to sentencing Ashland, Inc. (8 pages) (PJS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                            JOINT MOTION for more time to file objections and proposed amendments to PSI by Ashland, Inc., & USA. 2pgs (LEG)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT (Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum / date signed 5/31/02) case reassigned to Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum from Judge Joan E. Lancaster. (cc: all counsel) 1 pg (
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                PLEA AGREEMENT AND SENTENCING STIPULATIONS as to Ashland, Inc. 14 pgs (
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTES: before Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum first appearance, arraignment & plea of Ashland, Inc; guilty plea entered to misdemeanor counts 2 & 3; prosecution deferred as to count 1 for a period of up to four years from the date of the plea agreement. Power of attorney filed. PSI ordered. Court Reporter: Kim Evavold, Shaddix & Assoc. 1 pg (
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                    Power of Atty as to Ashland, Inc. - Appointing Vice President, Glenn W. Hammer to negotiate, execute, deliver and peform under, and on behalf of the Corporation, a plea agreement. 1 pg (
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Waiver - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by defendant Ashland, Inc. 1 pg (
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Information - Misdemeanor
                                                                                                        INFORMATION by USA William H Koch against Ashland, Inc. (1) counts 1 (felony), 2 & 3 (misdemeanors). 9 pgs ( Modified on 05/13/2002
                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?