Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-07325-CRB
District Judge Charles R. Breyer, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 15, 2021 at 3:42 PM DT (2.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT, Plaintiff
v.
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 4731 daniel.laguardia@shearman.com
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 4731 daniel.laguardia@shearman.com
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 4731 daniel.laguardia@shearman.com
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
No Logo Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 4731 daniel.laguardia@shearman.com
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 4731 daniel.laguardia@shearman.com
Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 4731 daniel.laguardia@shearman.com
RBC Capital Markets, LLC RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 4731 daniel.laguardia@shearman.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
Space Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 12/4/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 18CV337109[Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ProSe
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
          LREF
          Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
            LREF
            Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Joinder
                Joinder re [32] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Point And Authorities In Support Thereof by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 36 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                    ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Daniel C. Lewis by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [31] Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Adam S. Hakki by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [30] Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Declaration in Support
                        Declaration of Jennifer C. Bretan in Support of [32] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Point And Authorities In Support Thereof and Exhibits A-E filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[32]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Request For Judicial Notice
                          Request for Judicial Notice re [32] MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Point And Authorities In Support Thereof - Request For Judicial Notice And Incorporation By Reference In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[32]) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                            MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Point And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/2/2019. Replies due by 10/14/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019, Terminated: 7/2/2019 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13483038.) filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, Daniel) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019, Terminated: 7/2/2019 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26IH5I0E.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/01/2019 filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hakki, Adam) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: 6/20/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [28] Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019, Terminated: 6/20/2019 stipulation
                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [27] Order on Stipulation Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Adjusting Schedule For Responding To Amended Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONDING TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING PAGE LIMITS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [26] Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019, Terminated: 4/30/2019 stipulation
                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Setting Schedule For Responding To Amended Complaint And Extending Page Limits filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO PROVIDE UPDATE ON SCHEDULE FOR RESPONDING TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [24] Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019, Terminated: 4/8/2019 stipulation
                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [22] Order on Stipulation Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Time To Provide Update On Schedule For Responding To Amended Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                            Motion hearing vacated. Motion Hearing set for March 15, 2019 in C17-5828 has been rescheduled to March 22, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                              Motion hearing vacated. Motion Hearing set for March 15, 2019 in C17-5828 has been rescheduled to March 22, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS (Case Number 17-cv-5828 CRB, ECF No. 49) HEARING on March 8, 2019 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing reset for 3/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/1/2019 (lsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting [21] Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019, Terminated: 2/5/2019 stipulation
                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [20] Amended Complaint, [12] Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Set/Reset Hearings Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Time To Respond To Amended Complaint And Continuing Case Management Conference And Associated Deadlines filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byInter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT. (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 Notice of change of address
                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen J. Oddo (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                          Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: C17-5828 CRB and C18-7325 RS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/14/2018. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting [13] Stipulation setting briefing schedule for motion to remand and extending time for defendants to respond to complaint. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR RELATED CASE DETERMINATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/12/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018, Terminated: 12/12/2018 stipulation
                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [1] Notice of Removal, Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule For Motion To Remand And Extending Time For Defendants To Respond To Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC re [10] Certificate of Interested Entities,,,,, [9] Certificate of Interested Entities,,,,, (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                          Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.; Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays Group US Inc. for Barclays Capital, Inc.; Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC; Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC; Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Other Affiliate CitiGroup Global Markets Holdings Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.; Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank A.G., Other Affiliate DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate DB USA Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.; Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc. for Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.; Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays Group US Inc. for Barclays Capital, Inc.; Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC; Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC; Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Other Affiliate CitiGroup Global Markets Holdings Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.; Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank A.G., Other Affiliate DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate DB USA Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.; Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc. for Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                              Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC re [5] Notice (Other), [6] Notice of Appearance (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                    NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re [1] Notice of Removal, [3] Certificate of Interested Entities, [2] Notice of Appearance (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Corinne Bretan (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 notice of removal
                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 18CV337109. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-12897923). Filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet) (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 658 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?