FREY v. MINTER
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Middle District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00191

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2020 at 2:19 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Scheduling/Discovery Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying 41 Motion to Transfer Case; granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss; denying 16 Motion Motion to Remand; finding as moot 23 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/04/2018 (CCL)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to transfer case
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to stay
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?