Porsche Leasing v. Mount
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC1814868

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 6:13 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Porsche Financial Services, Inc. Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tharpe & Howell Etal +1 408 271 0600
No Logo Porsche Leasing Ltd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tharpe & Howell Etal +1 408 271 0600
v.
No Logo Afshin Hashemi, Defendant
No Logo David Mount, Defendant
No Logo Department Of Motor Vehicles, Defendant
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Entire Action Filed
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Stipulation And Order For Waiver Of Apperance Bya Nd Of Monetary Recovery Is Gra; Honorable Judge Daniel A Ottolia.
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 07/20/2018 Of Porsche Leasing Ltd Served On David Mount With Service Date Of 08/21/18 Filed.(personal Service)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 07/20/2018 Of Porsche Leasing Ltd Served On Department Of Motorvehicles With Service Date Of 07/24/18 Filed.(personal Service)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Complaint Filed 07/20/2018 Of Porsche Leasing Ltd As To Afshin Hashemi; Mailing Date Of 08/12/18 Filed.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 5 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Non-proof Of Service Hearing Set For 9/18/18 At 8:30 In Dept Cler
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Summons Issued On Complaint Filed 07/20/2018 Of Porsche Leasing Ltd And Filed.
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Certificate Of Counsel Filed. The Zip Code Is 92320.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Complaint Filed Fast Track. (riverside)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Case Assigned To Department 04. (riverside)

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?