Vision-Ease Lens Inc v. Younger Mfg Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:02-cv-00012-JMR-FLN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vision-ease Lens, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Merchant & Gould, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher John Sorenson +6123325 300 336 4645 +1 612 332 9081 csorenson@merchantgould.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jake M. Holdreith +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 jmholdreith@rkmc.com
Space Christopher A. Seidl +1 612 349 8468 caseidl@rkmc.com
No Logo Younger Manufacturing Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon Marie Hansen +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8400 shansen@kirkland.com
Space Robert G. Krupka +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 bob_krupka@chicago.kirkland.com
Space Nick Gregory Saros +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 nsaros@kirkland.com
v.
No Logo Younger Manufacturing Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dicker, David H. +1 818 788 3381

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon Marie Hansen +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8400 shansen@kirkland.com
Space Robert G. Krupka +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 bob_krupka@chicago.kirkland.com
Space Nick Gregory Saros +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 nsaros@kirkland.com
No Logo Vision-ease Lens, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Merchant & Gould, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher John Sorenson +6123325 300 336 4645 +1 612 332 9081 csorenson@merchantgould.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jake M. Holdreith +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 jmholdreith@rkmc.com
Office DMN
Filed 1/2/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 145 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hennepin
Terminated 3/24/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROTO
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 68 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. 1 pg (LLJ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2005 (jlv).
    LREF
    Legal Document 67 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) of dismissal with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorney fees termination notice 4pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL)
      LREF
      Blank 66 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Transcript (Conventional)Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT OF motion to compel held 2/10/03 before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (C/R Leslie R. Pingley) 25pg(s) (SEPARATE) (RJL)
        LREF
        Blank 65 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Letter
        LETTER dated 2/14/03 from Jeanette M. Bazis withdrawing motion to compel 1pg(s) (DFL)
          LREF
          Blank 64 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Miscellaneous Document
          LETTER dated 2/14/03 from Christopher A. Siedl withdrawing motion to compel discovery [54-1] 1pg(s) (DFL)
            LREF
            Legal Document 63 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER CONCERNING ABEYANCE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULE (Magistrate Judge Franklin L Noel / 2/14/03), The Pretrial Schedule set by Order dated 6/6/02 and amended by Order dated 12/18/02, is hereby placed in abeyance for a period of thirty days from the date of this Order. In the event that this matter is not dismissed by stipulation before expiration of such time, the Pretrial Schedule will be taken out of abeyance, and all remaining deadlines under the current Pretrial Schedule will be extended by a period of thirty days. 2 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (SEA)
              LREF
              Blank 62 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              MINUTES: ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) taking under advisement on the motion to compel discovery [54-1]; written order to follow 1pg(s) (DFL)
                LREF
                Blank 61 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Affidavit
                AFFIDAVIT of Nick Saros regarding motion to compel discovery [54-1] 2pg(s) (DFL)
                  LREF
                  Blank 60 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                  EXHIBIT B to affidavit of Nick Caros in support of Younger's opposition to Vision-Ease's motion to compel. [59-1] (SEPERATE & SEALED) (RJL)
                    LREF
                    Blank 59 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT of Nick Saros regarding motion to compel discovery. [54-1] 3pg(s) (RJL)
                      LREF
                      Blank 58 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                      MEMORANDUM by defendant in opposition to motion to compel discovery. [54-1] 7pg(s) (RJL)
                        LREF
                        Blank 57 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                        EXHIBITS F, K, &P of Declaration of Christopher A. Seidl. [56-1] (SEPERATE & SEALED) (RJL)
                          LREF
                          Blank 56 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                          DECLARATION of Christopher A. Seidl re motion to compel discovery. [54-1] 4+pg(s) (RJL)
                            LREF
                            Blank 55 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of motion to compel discovery. [54-1] 10pg(s) (RJL)
                              LREF
                              Blank 54 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                              MOTION by plaintiff to compel discovery.( to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) ret. 2/10/03 at 9:00am. 3pg(s) (RJL)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 53 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER ( Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum / 1/24/03) Deft's motion for summary judgment is denied. [35-1] 1 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (VEM)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 52 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  MINUTES: ( Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum / Hansen, Dawn) taking under advisement on the motion for summary judgment. [35-1] 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 51 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Affidavit
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Shannon Hansen regarding motion for summary judgment. [35-1] 3pg(s) (RJL)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 50 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                      AMENDED NOTICE by defendant setting hearing for motion for summary judgment. ( to Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) [35-1]ret. at 9:30am on 1/17/03. 2pg(s) (RJL)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 49 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Affidavit
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Diane L. Simerson . (26 pgs) (MKC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 48 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 LetterCourt Filing
                                          LETTER to Judge Rosenbaum from plaintiff's counsel re: response to Younger's reply brief. (4 pg(s) (MKC)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 47 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                            DECLARATION of Christopher A. Seidl re motion for summary judgment. [35-1] 4pg(s) (RJL)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 46 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition of motion for summary judgment. [35-1] 6pg(s) (RJL)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 45 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Affidavit
                                                Copy of AFFIDAVIT of Shannon Hansen in support of motion for summary judgment. [35-1] (SEPERATE & SEALED) (RJL)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion for summary judgment. [35-1] (SEPERATE & SEALED) (RJL)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                    EXHIBITS I, J, and L, part of Thomas J. Moravec.[42-1] (SEPERATE & SEALED) (RJL)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Affidavit
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Thomas J. Moravec regarding motion for summary judgment. [35-1] 14+pg(s) (SEPERATE) (RJL)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                        EXHIBITS C,D, and L by plaintiff declaration of Christopher A. Seidl. [40-1] (SEPERATE & SEALED) (RJL)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                          DECLARATION of Christopher A. Seidl re motion for summary judgment. [35-1] 87pg(s) (RJL)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                            MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment. [35-1] 31pg(s) (RJL)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Affidavit
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Richard J. Kapash regarding motion for summary judgment. [35-1] 8pg(s) (RJL)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Affidavit
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Nick Saros regarding motion for summary judgment. [35-1] 54pg(s) (SEPERATE) (RJL) Modified on 01/16/2003
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                  MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion for summary judgment. [35-1] 17pg(s) (RJL)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement
                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by plaintiff Vision-Ease Lens Inc, counter-defendant Vision-Ease Lens Inc - BMC Industries, Inc. 1pg(s) (RJL)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 1/9/2003 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement
                                                                      RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendant Younger Mfg Company that no other corporation is its parent corporation, and no publicly-owned corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. 3pg(s) (JMH)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003 Order
                                                                        PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten ) on behalf of defendant by David H Dicker 1pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 12/18/2) [29-1]. (2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003 Transcript (Conventional)Court Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF hearing held 10/28/02 before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ( Thorsgaard, Lisa M., Neil K. Johnson Reporting Agency) 25pg(s) (SEPARATE) (DFL)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/28/2002 Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                              JOINT MOTION by pltf & deft to amend pretrial schedule (to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) (3pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 11/2/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                MINUTES:( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / Tape 000 to 322) Pltf's motion to compel discovery responses & for privilege log is hereby Granted with details in Order to follow [20-1]. (1pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 1/16/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                  MOTION by defendant for summary judgment. ( to Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) ret. 1/17/03 at 9:30am. 2pg(s) (RJL)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                    ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT of Nick Saros in support of defts memorandum in opposition to pltf's motion to compel discovery responses & a privilege log [20-1]. (3pg(s) (DDB) Modified on 10/26/2002
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002 MOTION - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                      LETTER RE: SVC OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION PAPERS by deft for summary judgment - SVC.LTR ( to Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) (1pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                        COPY OF AFFIDAVIT of Nick Saros in support of deft's memorandum in opposition to pltf's motion to compel discovery responses & a privilege log [20-1]. (6pg(s) (DDB) Modified on 10/26/2002
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by deft in opposition to pltf's motion to compel discovery responses & a privilege log [20-1]. (5pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Christopher A. Seidl re pltf's motion to compel discovery responses & a privilege log [20-1]. (56pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by pltf in support of its motion to compel discovery responses & a privilege log [20-1]. (7pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                MOTION by pltf to compel discovery responses & a privilege log ( to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) ret. on 10/28/2 at 9:00 a.m. (4pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 10/31/2) that pltf's motion to compel discovery responses & for production os a privilege log is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART [20-1]. (1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONSTRUCTION OF CLAIM TERMS ( Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum ). (4 pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Nick Saros regarding deft's memorandum in support of its motion to compel discovery responses [9-1]. (4pg(s) +EXHIBITS (EXHIBIT "N" SEALED & SEPARATE) (DDB)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by deft in support of its motion to compel discovery responses [9-1]. (22 pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ( Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum ) The Court, having received & reviewed the foregoing Stipulation & Protective Order, hereby Orders that the parties be bound by all provisions & terms stated therein. (17pg(s)(cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 8/20/2) that Deft's motion to compel discovery responses & for production of privilege log is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART [9-1]. (2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                              EXHIBIT O to Declaration of Christopher J. Sorenson [13-1] opposing dft's motion to compel discovery [9-1] (sealed - separate) (SJH)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Christopher J. Sorenson re motion to compel discovery [9-1] 6+pg(s) (separate) (SJH)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to motion to compel discovery [9-1] 23pg(s) (SJH)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER ( Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum / 8/2/2) that 1.The parties shall identify disputed claim terms with proposed constructions by 8/9/2. 2. The parties shall submit claim construction briefs by 8/19/2. (1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTES:( Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum / Dawn Hansen) MARKMAN HEARING SCHEDULE. (1pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MOTION by deft/counter-clmt to compel discovery responses (to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel ) (2pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 6/3/2) amend pleadings & adding parties is set for 8/1/02; discovery set for 3/1/03; non-dispositive motions set for 3/1/03; dispositive motions set for 5/1/03; ready for trial set 6/1/03. (3pg(s) (cc: counsel) (DDB)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTES:( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / ) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. (3pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                              REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETING by pltf & deft. (7pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Reply to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                ANSWER by Vision-Ease Lens Inc to Counterclaim [2-2] 4pg(s) (DFL)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                  PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten) on behalf of deft by N. Saros, S. Hansen & R> Krupka. (3pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ( Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel / 4/23/2) initial pretrial conference set for 9:45 a.m. on 5/31/02 (3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to complaint [1-1] and COUNTERCLAIM; jury demand by deft against pltf. (7pg(s) (DDB)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT - Summons issued. Assigned to Chief Judge James M. Rosenbaum per Patent list and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (22pg(s) Receipt #254252 (DDB)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                          copy of complaint sent to the Commissioner of Patents & Trademarks. (DDB)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?