(PS)Johnson v. Schubert
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00666-JAM-AC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 11:24 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/24/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the Court's order; REFERRING this matter to Judge John A. Mendez; ORDERING that any objections be filed within twenty-one (21) days. (Michel, G.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/14/17 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the court's order. Matter REFERRED to District Judge John A. Mendez. Within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, plaintiff may file written objections with the court. (Kastilahn, A)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/13/2017 GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's Request to Proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED because the complaint is frivolous; Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint that complies with the instructions given.(Reader, L)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?