State Farm Mutual v. Castro
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC1709283

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 11:51 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Inc. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pillemer & Pillemer +1 818 994 4321
v.
No Logo Alexia Castro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dwayne S. Beck & Associates, Apc
No Logo Alexia Castro, Cross-complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dwayne S. Beck & Associates, Apc
No Logo Blanca Jimenez, Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hartsuyker Stratman & Williams-abrego
Space Hartsuyker, Stratman & Willams-abrego
No Logo Shannon Manago-kau, Cross-defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pillemer & Pillemer +1 818 994 4321
No Logo Shannon Smith, Cross-defendant
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
System Generated Notice Re: Clerks Certificate Of Mailing.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 56 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Hearing On Osc Re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant To Crc 3.1385(c) Set 10/01/18 At 8:30 In Dept. 11.
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Case Filed - Conditional Settlement Crc 3.1385 (05a*rmccond) Form Cm-200.
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 54 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Jury Fee Deposit Of $150.00 Paid By Blanca Jimenez.
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Demand For Jury And Ntc Of Posting Jury Fees
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Answer To 1st Amended Cross Complaint Of Alexia Castro By Blanca Jimenez Represented By Hartsuyker Stratman& Williams-abrego Filed. ($10,000 Or Under)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Declaration Of Kevin B Bevins Re Osc Re:failure To File Responsive Pleadings Filed
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Declaration Of David B Pillemer Re Order To Show Cause Filed
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 49 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Fax Filing By State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance ($2.00 Per Page).
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Declaration Of Dwayne S. Beck Re:order To Show Cause Set For 5/29/18 Filed
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Motion To Vacate Sanctions Imposed On Shannon Smith; Order
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 46 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Pos Timely/waived - Proof Of Service On Motion To/for Vacate Sanctions On Calendar 05/16/18 Is Timely/waived.
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Minute Order: Re Hearing Of April 27 2018
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Declaration Of Dwayne S. Beck Re:osc Re:proof Of Service Filed
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 43 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Hearing Re Motion To Vacate Set 5/16/18 At 8:30 In Department 11
                                Blank 42 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Motion Hearing Reservation Re: To Vacate Sanctions Imposed Set For 05/16/18 At 08:30 Is Confirmed.
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Motion To Vacate Sanctions Imposed By State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Filed
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 40 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Fee Paid For On-line Reservation Of Motion ($60.00). Confirmation Number Res77507 For Hearing Reserved On 05/16/18.
                                      Blank 39 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Hearing Reserved Set 05/16/18 At 8:30 In Dept. 11 - Res77507
                                        Blank 38 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        On-line Motion Reserved On Behalf Of Shannon Managao-kau Also Sued As Shannon Smith.
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Declaration Of Gillian R. Mellon Re:order To Show Cause Filed
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Declaration Of Gillian R Mellon Re:order To Show Cause & Sanctions Imposed On Erroneously Sued Shannon Sm Filed
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Minute Order: Re Hearing Of March 21 2018
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Notice Of Trial Setting Conference By State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Filed.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Declaration Of Dwayne S Beck Filed
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Declaration Of Dwayne S Beck Filed
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Stipulation And Order For Set Aside Default Is Gra; Honorable Commissioner David E. Gregory.
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Stipulation And Order Fee Paid By Blanca Jimenez
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Minute Order: Impose Sanctions And Continue Osc & Tsc
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Request For Entry Of Default Only On The 1st Amended Cross Complaint Of Alexia Castro As To Blanca Jimenez Filed.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Minute Order: Impose Sanctions And Continue Osc
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice Of Order To Show Cause By State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Filed.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Proof Of Service On The 1st Amended Cross Complaint Of Alexia Castro Served On Blanca Jimenez With Service Date Of 09/17/17 Filed.(personal Service)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Answer To 1st Amended Cross Complaint Of Alexia Castro By Shannon Manago-kau Represented By Pillemer & Pillemer Filed. (over $25,000.00)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Notice Of Ruling Re: Demurrer Filed
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Opposition To Demurrer By Shannon Manago=kau By Alexia Castro Filed
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Hearing On Demurrer Set For 11/02/17 At 8:30 In Dept 11
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Demurrer To 1st Amended Cross Complaint Of Alexia Castro By Shannon Manago-kau Represented By Pillemer & Pillemer Filed. (10,000.00 And Under)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Motion Hearing Reservation Re: Demurrer Set For 11/02/17 At 08:30 Is Confirmed.
                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Limited Civil First Paper Fee (under $10,000) Paid As To Shannon Manago-kau (on-line Reservation).
                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  On-line Motion Reserved On Behalf Of Cross-defendants.
                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    First Appearance Fee Paid By Shannon Manago-kau (on-line Reservation).
                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Hearing Reserved For Demurrer On 11/02/17 At 8:30 In Department 11 - Res71292.
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Summons Issued On 1st Amended Cross Complaint Of Alexia Castro And Filed.
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          1st Amended Cross Complaint Of Alexia Castro Filed. (limited Civil Amended Complaint)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Summons Issued On Cross Complaint Filed 07/07/2017 Of Alexia Castro And Filed.
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Cross-complaint Of Alexia Castro Represented By Dwayne S. Beck & Associates, Apc Filed (superior Court)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Demand For Jury Trial By Alexia Castro Filed
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Jury Fee Deposit Of $150.00 Paid By Alexia Castro.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed 05/23/2017 Of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance By Alexia Castro Represented By Dwayne S. Beck & Associates, Apc Filed. ($10,000 Or Under)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Complaint Filed 05/23/2017 Of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance As To Alexia Castro; Mailing Date Of 05/29/17 Filed.
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Summons Issued On Complaint Filed 05/23/2017 Of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance And Filed.
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Non-proof Of Service Hearing Set For 7/24/17 At 8:30 In Dept Cler
                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Set 11/20/17 At 8:30 In Dept. 11.
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Under $10k Filed. (riverside)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Limited Civil Case Assigned To Department 11. (riverside)
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Certificate Of Counsel Filed. The Zip Code Is 92503.
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?