Smith v. Solarcity Corporation
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC1712309

Tags
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 1:08 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeffrey Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lavi & Ebrahimian Llp +1 310 432 0000
v.
SolarCity Corporation SolarCity Corporation, Defendant
SolarCity Engineering, Inc. SolarCity Engineering, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Entire Action Filed
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Joint Stip To Submit Case To Binding Arbitration & Req For Stay - Honorable Judge John W Vineyard
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 12 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Stipulation And Order Fee Paid By Jeffrey Smith
        Blank 11 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        First Appearance Fee Paid By Solarcity Engineering Inc
          Blank 10 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          First Appearance Fee Paid By Solarcity Corporation
            Blank 9 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Returned Document: Joint Stip To Binding Arb & Req For Stay Submitted By Jeffrey Smith, Solarcity Corporation.
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 07/06/2017 Of Jeffrey Smith Served On Solarcity Engineering Inc With Service Date Of 08/18/17 Filed.(personal Service)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 07/06/2017 Of Jeffrey Smith Served On Solarcity Corporation With Service Date Of 08/18/17 Filed.(personal Service)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice Of Case Management Conference By Jeffrey Smith Filed.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Certificate Of Counsel Filed. The Zip Code Is 92501.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 4 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Non-proof Of Service Hearing Set For 9/05/17 At 8:30 In Dept Cler
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Summons Issued On Complaint Filed 07/06/2017 Of Jeffrey Smith And Filed.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Complaint Filed Fast Track. (riverside)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Case Assigned To Department 07. (riverside)

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 16 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?