Shortridge v. Skilling, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:02-cv-00400-DSD-SRN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter J Shortridge, Plaintiff

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Represented by Matthew B. Moreland, Attorney at Law

Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

v.
No Logo Andrew S Fastow, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Andersen, Defendant
No Logo Charles A Lemaistere, Defendant
No Logo Cindy K Olson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo J Mark Metts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo James V Derrick, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Clifford Gunter, III +1 713 221 1335 +1 713 221 1212
Space Abigail K Sullivan
No Logo Jeffrey K Skilling, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey McMahon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Joe H Foy, Defendant
No Logo John H Duncan, Defendant
No Logo Joseph M Hirko, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Joseph W Sutton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600
Space Jason C. Norwood +1 713 654 7760
Space Jack O'Neill +1 713 425 8410 +1 713 300 6010

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Ken L Harrison, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth D Rice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"
No Logo Lou L Pai, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Mark A Frevert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Mark E Koenig, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Michael S McConnell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Norman P Blake, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Rebecca P Mark-Jusbasche, Defendant
No Logo Richard A Causey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Richard B Buy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Robert A Belfer, Defendant
No Logo Robert K Jaedicke, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie C Chan, Defendant
No Logo Stanley C Horton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Steven J Kean, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C. Nickens +1 713 654 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D Flack +1 713 353 6664 +1 713 571 9652 pflack@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Wendy L Gramm, Defendant
Office DMN
Filed 2/19/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Winona
Terminated 7/31/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TRANSF
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Order
Certified Copy Of Conditional Transfer ORDER (Michael J. Beck, Clerk of the MDL Panel) Case transferred to Southern District Of Texas Houston Division 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (JMR) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2005 (jlv).
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Docket Annotation
    Mailed entire Clerk's file with certified copies of the docket sheet and Conditional Transfer Order to the USDC in the Southern District of Texas Houston Division (mailed by certified mail to Michael Milby, Clerk; P.O. Box 61010; Houston, TX 77208-1010). (JMR)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      NOTICE (Clerk Richard D. Sletten / 6/19/02) Case referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson 1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (GJS)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER (Magistrate Judge John M. Mason) granting substitution of counsel - the attys.-in-charge and of counsel for deft. Sutton for the purpose of service for all papers are Jack O'Neill and Jason Norwood 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (JMR) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2005 (jlv).
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
          Por hac vice request to Admission's Clerk on behalf of attys., Jack O'Neill and Jason Norwood (JMR)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
            MOTION by defendant Joseph W Sutton to substitute attorney ( to Magistrate Judge John M. Mason ) 9pg(s) (copy) (JMR)
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER (Magistrate Judge John M. Mason) granting the parties' stipulated motion for extension of time for all defts to answer. All defts must answer, move or otherwise respond to pltf's complaint within 30 days after a ruling by the MDL Panel on the motion to transfer or until 7/1/02 whichever is earlier. (c: attys.) 1pg (JMR)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Affidavit
                AFFIDAVIT of Abigail K. Sullivan 10pg(s) (JMR)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Motion to ExtendCourt Filing
                  Stipulated MOTION by plaintiff Peter J Shortridge, defendant James V Derrick Jr to extend time for all defts to answer pursuant to anticipated transfer by the MDL ( to Magistrate Judge John M. Mason) 3pg(s) (JMR)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                    Pro hac vice request to attys J. Clifford Gunter III and Abigail K. Sullivan (JMR)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Order
                      PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice ( Clerk Richard D. Sletten ) on behalf of plaintiff by Daniel E. Becnel, Jr. 1pg(s) (c: attys.) (JMR)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER (Magistrate Judge John M. Mason / 3/25/02) that defts. Richard Causey, Mark Frevert, Stanley Horton, Kenneth Rice, Richard Buy, Lou Pai, Mark Koenig, Steven Kean, Michael McConnell, Jeffrey McMahon, Cindy Olson, J. Metts and Joseph Sutton shall have until 5/7/02 to answer or to otherwise respond to pltf's complaint in this case. 2pgs (c: attys.) (JMR)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          MINUTES:(Magistrate Judge John M. Mason) Telephone conference. Parties agree that time for response to complaint shall be extended to 5/7/02, to accomadate MDL's procedures. 1pg (JMR)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Motion to ExtendCourt Filing
                            Agreed MOTION by plaintiff Peter J Shortridge, defendants Richard A Causey, Mark A Frevert, Stanley C Horton, Kenneth D Rice, Richard B Buy, Lou L Pai, Joseph M Hirko, Mark E Koenig, Steven J Kean, Michael S McConnell, Jeffrey McMahon, Cindy K Olson, J Mark Metts, Joseph W Sutton for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint until 5/7/02 (to Magistrate Judge John M. Mason) 3pgs (JMR)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                              Pro hac vice request to Admission's Clerk on behalf of attys., Jacks C. Nickens and Paul D. Flack (JMR)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                COMPLAINT - Summons issued. Assigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty per securities list and referred to Magistrate Judge John M. Mason. Receipt 255067. 94pg(s) (JMR)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                                  Pro hac vice request sent to Admission's Clerk on behalf of atty., Daniel Becnel (JMR)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Docket Annotation
                                    Per attachment to civil cover sheet many related cases in Arkansas, California, Florida, and Texas (JMR)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?