Management One v. Boyd

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC361725
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 4:17 AM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Management One, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E. Bouzane +1 909 825 3680
v.
No Logo Jason Boyd, Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Paper Records Destroyed/digitally Archived. Paper Documents/file Destroyed In Accordance With Administrative Policy/records Management A.10.400.1, Paper Records Retention And Destruction Schedule.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration And Order For To Set Aside Jmt & Dismiss Entire Action By Management One Filed; Honorable Pro Tem John St. Clair.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Dec/ord To Dismiss Jmt Rec'd & Forwd To Dept. Mv01
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Writ Of Possession Returned Unsatisfied
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Application For Issuance Of Writ Of Possession Filed (form Ri-003).
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 9 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Writ Of Possession Issued For The County Of Riverside
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request For Entry Of Default And Clerk's Judgment For Possession Only On The Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed 07/24/2001 Of Management One As To Jason Boyd
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Application For Judgment For Restitution Of Premises Only, Pursuant To C.c.p. 1169.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Judgment By Default By Clerk - Possession Only Filed 07/31/01
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons And Proof Of Service Of Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed 07/24/2001 Of Management One On Jason Boyd Service Date Of 07/24/01 (personally Served)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed; Clerks Notice Of Complaint For Unlawful Detainer.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 3 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal Of Unlawful Detainer Case Set 11/02/01 At 13:00 In Dept. Mv01
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Blank 2 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Prejudgment Claim Of Right To Possession Attached To The Complaint
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Limited Civil Unlawful Detainer Complaint Under $10,000 Filed - Summons Issued.
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?