Navarre Corporation v. Red Hat, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:02-cv-00861-RHK-SRN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Navarre Corporation,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey R Ansel +1 612 604 6400 +1 612 604 6800 jansel@winthrop.com
Space Matthew R McBride +1 612 604 6400 +1 612 604 6800 mmcbride@winthrop.com
v.
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hayden Judson Silver, III +1 919 420 1700 +1 919 420 1800 jaysilver@kilpatrickstockton.com
Office DMN
Filed 4/23/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $90000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hennepin
Terminated 8/21/2002
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ATYADM, CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Order
JUDGMENT: (1 pg) (cc: all counsel) (MKC)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( Judge Richard H. Kyle ), upon the merits and without costs or disbursements to anyparty. (2 pgs)(cc: all counsel) (MKC)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( Judge Richard H. Kyle / 8/21/2) that this action is dismissed with prejudice, the Court retaining jurisdiction for 30 days to permit any party to move to reopen the action, for good cause shown, or to submit & file a stipulated form of final judgment, or to seek enforcement of the settlement terms. (1pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DDB)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/10/2002 Amended Answer to Complaint
        AMENDED ANSWER [1-1] by defendant 4pg(s) (GJS)
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES ( Judge Richard H. Kyle / 7/31/02; Judge Ann D. Montgomery/ 8/1/02) re: Civil 02-1325 ADM/AJB be reassigned to Judge Rhichard H. Kyle (1 pg) (cc: all counsel) (MKC)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson / 6/19/02) ; amd pleadings set for 8/9/02; discovery completed by 1/15/03 ; non-dispositive motions filed by 1/29/03 ; dispositive motions by 4/1/03; and this case ready for trial on 6/1/03 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (GJS)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
              JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETINg. 4pg(s) (VEM)
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Notice of Hearing.
                NOTICE of Pretrial Conference ; pretrial status conference set for 2:30pm on 6/18/02; Rule 26(f) report ddl set for 6/10/02 5pg(s) (GJS)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Order
                  PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice (Clerk Richard D. Sletten) on behalf of defendant by Hayden J. Silver III 1pg(s) (GJS) Modified on 05/02/2002
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Answer
                    ANSWER by defendant 4pg(s) (GJS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Notice of RemovalCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, together with copies of complaint and summons; Assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. Receipt # 422439 for $150.00 (21 pgs) (MKC)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Notice - Miscellaneous
                        NOTICE given to Admissions Clerk to send out PHV to out of state attorney: Hayden J. Silver. (MKC)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2002 Stipulation
                          STIPULATION TO AMEND ANSWER 2pg(s) (GJS)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 112 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?