Young v. Mulvaine
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02807

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 29, 2021 at 11:29 AM DT (1.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aaron E Young, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #625-294

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron E Young
v.
No Logo Benjamin Blankenship, Defendant
No Logo Brandi Smith, Defendant
No Logo Correctional Officer A. Uy, Defendant
No Logo Dean Mulvaine, Defendant
No Logo James Craig, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Empatage, Defendant
No Logo Lieutenant Prichard, Defendant
No Logo Lorri Shuler, Defendant
No Logo Management & Training Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mansour, Gavin, Gerlack & Manos Company LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth E. Smith +1 216 523 1500 +1 216 523 1705 ksmith@mggmlpa.com
No Logo Neil Turner, Defendant
No Logo R.N. K. Woods, Defendant
No Logo Randy Shears, Defendant
No Logo Ruben Quintero, Defendant
No Logo Sargeant Holycross, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant A. Flores, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant S. Jones, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Extension (of deadlines)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Extension (of deadlines)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Amend Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Extension (of deadlines)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Extension (of deadlines)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order Appointing Pro Bono Attorney
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Initial Order - Judge Zouhary
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Management & Training Corporation. (Smith, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                        Notice of Removal from Marion County Common Pleas Court, case number 2018 CV 0678 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9038949.. Filed by Aaron E Young. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Docket, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, Kenneth)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?