Mungo v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Carolina District Court, Case No. 0:11-cv-00464
District Judge Margaret B. Seymour, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 6:58 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mary K Mungo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hamilton Martens Ballou and Carroll

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Christi Porter Cox +1 803 329 7672 +1 803 329 7678 christi.cox@hamiltonmartens.com
, Walter Keith Martens +1 803 329 7672 +1 803 329 7678 keith.martens@hamiltonmartens.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGowan Hood Felder & Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Susan Foxworth Campbell +1 803 779 0100 scampbell@mcgowanhood.com
, Chad A. McGowan +1 803 327 7800 +1 803 328 5656 cmcgowan@mcgowanhood.com
v.
No Logo CMFG Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Cmfg Life Insurance Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CMFG Life Insurance Company

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Maria Laucka Domanskis +1 312 876 8000 +1 312 876 7934 maria.domanskis@dentons.com
, Melissa Angelica Economy +1 312 876 2572 +1 312 876 7934 meconomy@sonnenschein.com
, , , Anthony Eliseuson +1 312 876 8000 anthony.eliseuson@dentons.com
, John Joseph Hay +1 212 632 5555 john.hay@dentons.com
, , , Roger Heidenreich +1 312 876 8000 roger.heidenreich@dentons.com
, Steven A Velkei +1 213 892 5007 +1 213 623 9924 steven.velkei@snrdenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Elias Gutzler Spicer LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Greg Garrell Gutzler +1 314 833 6645 +1 314 621 7607 ggutzler@egslitigation.com
, , , , , Tamara Marie Spicer +1 314 833 6645 +1 314 621 7607 tspicer@egslitigation.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Daniel C Leonardi +1 803 765 5076 +1 803 765 5084 dan_leonardi@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Scott K. Attaway +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 sattaway@khhte.com
, , Whitney Cloud +1 202 326 7981 +1 202 326 7999 wcloud@khhte.com
, , , , , David C. Frederick +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 dfrederick@khhte.com
, , , , , Silvija Anna Strikis +1 202 326 7939 +1 202 326 7999 sstrikis@khhte.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Korein Tillery LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Steven M. Berezney +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 sberezney@koreintillery.com
, , , , , John C. Craig +1 314 241 4844 +1 314 241 3525 jcraig@koreintillery.com
, , , , , Michael E. Klenov +1 314 241 4844 +1 314 241 3525 mklenov@koreintillery.com
, , , , , George A. Zelcs +1 312 641 9750 +1 312 641 9751 gzelcs@koreintillery.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawton & Cates, SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Peggy A Lautenschlager +1 608 260 0292 +1 608 260 0002 lautenschlager@bauer-bach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Randall Edwin Long +1 918 582 1173 +1 918 592 3390 rlong@rhodesokla.com
, John H Tucker +1 918 582 1173 +1 918 592 3390 jtuckercourts@rhodesokla.com
No Logo CUMIS Insurance Society, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Maria Laucka Domanskis +1 312 876 8000 +1 312 876 7934 maria.domanskis@dentons.com
, , , Anthony Eliseuson +1 312 876 8000 anthony.eliseuson@dentons.com
, , , Roger Heidenreich +1 312 876 8000 roger.heidenreich@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Daniel C Leonardi +1 803 765 5076 +1 803 765 5084 dan_leonardi@fd.org
No Logo Founders Federal Credit Union, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Padget Graham and Laney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , R Gerald Chambers +1 803 227 4201 +1 803 400 1511 gchambers@turnerpadget.com
, Michelle P Clayton +1 803 254 2200 mclayton@turnerpadget.com
, Franklin Grady Shuler, Jr. +1 803 227 4242 +1 803 400 1527 fshuler@turnerpadget.com
, Walker Duvall Spruill +1 803 254 2200 +1 803 799 3957 dspruill@turnerpadget.com
No Logo Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine A.T. Nelson +1 312 382 3100 cathynelson@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Theodore Dubose Willard, Jr. +1 803 779 3500 +1 803 799 2755 tdw@montgomerywillard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jamie Ballinger-Holden +1 865 549 7000 +1 865 633 7216 jballinger@bakerdonelson.com
, , Chad E. Wallace +1 423 928 0181 +1 423 928 5694 cwallace@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Figari Davenport, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ryan K. McComber +1 214 939 2014 +1 214 939 2090 ryan.mccomber@figdav.com
Space Amber D Reece +1 214 939 2020 +1 214 939 2090 amber.reece@figdav.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Matthew A Colvin +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 colvin@fr.com
, , , , , , , David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
, , , , , , , , , Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James Eugene Youngblood +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 jey@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter W Sorensen +1 602 445 8000 +1 602 445 8100 sorensenp@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Samuel J Clark +1 612 373 8387 +1 612 373 0929 sclark@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 373 8333 +1 612 373 0929 bgilbertson@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Kathryn N Hibbard +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 khibbard@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Mark L Johnson +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mjohnson@greeneespel.com
, , , , , Megan M Walsh +1 612 373 8387 +1 612 373 0929 mwalsh@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Karr Tuttle Campbell, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Medora A. Marisseau +1 206 223 1313 +1 206 682 7100 mmarisseau@karrtuttle.com
Space Jacque Elizabeth St. Romain +1 206 224 8089 jstromain@karrtuttle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klee, Tuchin, Bogdanoff & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , David Max Stern +1 310 407 4025 +1 310 407 9090 dstern@ktbslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Larson King LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, (Inactive), TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED: 02/11/2014, TERMINATED Sarah E Madsen +1 651 312 6591 +1 651 789 4891 smadsen@larsonking.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ryan M Walters +1 505 764 5400 +1 505 764 5467 rwalters@lrrc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ann-Martha Andrews +1 602 262 5707 +1 602 734 3764 ann.andrews@ogletree.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pett Furman PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kristina Beth Pett +1 561 994 4311 +9828 982 982 8985 kpett@pettfurman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cristyn Nicole Chadwick +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 cchadwick@reedsmith.com
, Kathy J Huang +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 khuang@reedsmith.com
, Robert D. Phillips, Jr. +1 510 763 2000 +1 510 273 8832 RPhillips@ReedSmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan Whaley Coldiron and Shandy PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Phillip Gardner Whaley +1 405 239 6040 +1 405 239 6766 pwhaley@ryanwhaley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Well Marble and Hurst PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kelly D Simpkins +1 601 605 6900 +1 601 605 6901 ksimpkins@wellsmar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Chad Brian Walker +1 214 453 6500 +1 214 453 6400 cbwalker@winston.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (165) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, Founders Federal Credit Union, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Mary K Mungo. (Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, motion hearing held on March 12, 2014, before Judge Margaret B. Seymour. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dan Mayo, Telephone number/E-mail Daniel_Mayo@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 5/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2014. (dmayo, ) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Susan F Campbell for 5/8/14-5/20/14 and 8/6/14-8/9/14 (Campbell, Susan) Modified on 4/16/2014 to delete proposed order (mdea, ). (Entered: 04/16/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER to 133 Amended Complaint Third by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER to 133 Amended Complaint Third by Founders Federal Credit Union.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SIXTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/15/2014, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/8/2014, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/7/2014, Discovery due by 9/1/2014, Motion in Limine due by 10/17/2014, Motions due by 9/12/2014, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/14/2014, Pretrial Briefs due by 1/23/2015, Jury Selection Deadline 1/30/2015, ADR Statement due by 8/19/2014, Mediation Due by 9/19/2014 Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/21/2014. (mdea ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              TEXT ORDER The court having ruled on Plaintiff's motion for Class Certification at the hearing held on March 12, 2014, the stay of this case is lifted and the parties are instructed to submit a proposed consent amended scheduling order for the court's consideration by COB on March 21, 2014. A sample of Judge Seymour's amended scheduling order can be found on this court's website at www.scd.uscourts.gov under Judge Seymour's form orders. ( Proposed Consent Amended Scheduling Order due by 3/21/2014.) Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/13/2014. (mdea ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Margaret B Seymour: denying 140 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 141 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 159 Motion to Certify Class; denying 165 Motion to Exclude; denying 168 Motion to Exclude; Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2014 re 168 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Birny Birnbaum and Joinder in Founders Federal Credit Union's Motion to Exclude (Dkt. No. 165) filed by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CMFG Life Insurance Company, 140 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CMFG Life Insurance Company, 141 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Founders Federal Credit Union, 159 MOTION to Certify Class, for Appointment of Class Representative, and for Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Mary K Mungo, 165 MOTION to Exclude Strike Testimony and Opinions of Birny Birnbaum filed by Founders Federal Credit Union. Court Reporter Dan Mayo. (mdea ) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Additional Attachments to Main Document 159 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL. First attachment description: Notice of Filing Supplement to ECF 159 . (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A & B)(Campbell, Susan) Modified on 3/5/2014 to modify description of attachment (mdea, ). (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING motions hearing set for 2/21/2014 at 2:30 cancelled and rescheduled to: Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2014 10:00 AM in Columbia # 3, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. (mdea ) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      TEXT ORDER granting 193 Motion to Continue motions hearing. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 2/10/2014.(mdea ) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Continue Hearing On Pending Motions From Its Scheduled Date Of February 21, 2014 by Founders Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 2/27/2014. No proposed order.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 02/08/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 141 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint, 168 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Birny Birnbaum and Joinder in Founders Federal Credit Union's Motion to Exclude (Dkt. No. 165, 165 MOTION to Exclude Strike Testimony and Opinions of Birny Birnbaum, 159 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL, 140 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2014 02:30 PM in Columbia # 3, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. (mdea ) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            TEXT ORDER granting 189 Motion to Stay Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 12/13/2013.(mdea ) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Joint MOTION to Stay Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of Motion for Class Certification by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/30/2013. No proposed order.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re 159 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL Response filed by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. (Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  TEXT ORDER granting 186 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 12/9/2013.(mdea ) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Doc. 159) by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - CUNA Mutual Defendants' Surreply Regarding New Authority in Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Class Certification)No proposed order.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 168 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Birny Birnbaum and Joinder in Founders Federal Credit Union's Motion to Exclude (Dkt. No. 165) Response filed by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Unpublished Opinion - L&M Beverage Co., Inc. v. Guinness Import Co., No. 94-4492, 1996 WL 368327 (E.D. Pa. June 24, 1996))(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 165 MOTION to Exclude / Strike Testimony and Opinions of Birny Birnbaum Response filed by Founders Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents Case - Ajene Edo v. Geico Casualty Company, et al.)(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document 180 Reply to Response to Motion,. Plaintiff's Local Rule 7.05(A)(4) Appendix. (Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document 181 Response in Opposition to Motion,. First attachment description: Birbaum Depo Transcript Redacted . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit unreported opinion)(Cox, Christi) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 168 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Birny Birnbaum and Joinder in Founders Federal Credit Union's Motion to Exclude (Dkt. No. 165) Response filed by Mary K Mungo.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/21/2013 (Cox, Christi) Modified on 10/15/2013 to reflect additional attachment filed on 10/11/2013 as entry 182 (mdea, ). (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 159 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL Response filed by Mary K Mungo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Thurman v. CUNA)(Campbell, Susan) Modified on 10/15/2013 to reflect additional attachments filed on 10/11/2013 as entry 183 (mdea, ). (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  TEXT ORDER granting 177 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney re Maria L. Domanskis. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 10/8/2013.(mdea ) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Maria L. Domanskis Withdrawing as Attorney for CUNA Mutual Defendants) by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/24/2013. No proposed order.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      TEXT ORDER granting 175 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 168 MOTION to Exclude Testimony 165 MOTION to Exclude Strike Testimony and Opinions of Birny Birnbaum, 159 MOTION to Certify Class 175 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response to Motion due by 10/10/2013. Replies due by 10/10/2013. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 9/27/2013.(asni, ) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 159 MOTION to Certify Class 165 MOTION to Exclude 168 MOTION to Exclude by Mary K Mungo, Founders Federal Credit Union, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CMFG Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2013. No proposed order.(Cox, Christi) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held via telephone before Honorable Margaret B Seymour: Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2013 re 166 MOTION for Leave to File Certain Exhibits to the CUNA Mutual Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Under Seal filed by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CMFG Life Insurance Company, 163 Consent MOTION to Seal Documents (Exhibits 7, 8, 19, 23, and 24 to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. No. 159) filed by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CMFG Life Insurance Company. Court will allow substitution of redacted documents. Court Reporter Jenny Williams. (mdea ) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 163 Consent MOTION to Seal Exhibits 7, 8, 19, 23, and 24 to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. No. 159) : Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 01:00 PM before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. This hearing will be conducted via telephone. Defense counsel shall initiate the call and have all parties on the line prior to contacting the Court at 803-253-3421.(mdea ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              TEXT ORDER granting 169 Motion for Extension of Time for plaintiff to reply to defendants' opposition to class certification and to respond to defendant's motions to exclude 165, 168 . Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 9/18/2013.(mdea ) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2013. No proposed order.(Cox, Christi) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Birny Birnbaum and Joinder in Founders Federal Credit Union's Motion to Exclude (Dkt. No. 165) by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Birnbaum Deposition Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B - Unreported Cases)No proposed order.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 159 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL Response filed by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/19/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A - Birnbaum Deposition Transcript, # 3 Exhibit B - Csiszar Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B-1 - Csiszar Report, # 5 Exhibit C - Fenner Report, # 6 Exhibit D - Founders 01183-84 and CMFGLIFE 41 (Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit E - 2004 PowerPoint re Payment Protection Plan (Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit F - Keepers Declaration, # 9 Exhibit F-1 - Keepers Disclosure (Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit G - Nash Deposition Transcript, # 11 Exhibit H - Founders 01299-1300 (Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit I - Group Insurance Policy, # 13 Exhibit J - Plaintiff's Responses to CUMIS's First Set of Class Related Interrogatories, # 14 Exhibit K - Notice Letters, # 15 Exhibit L - Loan Statements, # 16 Exhibit M - Redacted List of Founders Members Receiving Notice Letters, # 17 Exhibit N - Payment Protection Plan Agreement, # 18 Exhibit O - Unreported Cases)(Leonardi, Daniel) (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/25/2013) (mdea, ). (Attachment 6 replaced on 9/25/2013) (mdea, ). (Attachment 7 replaced on 9/25/2013) (mdea, ). (Attachment 9 replaced on 9/25/2013) (mdea, ). (Attachment 11 replaced on 9/25/2013) (mdea, ). Exhibits B-1, D, E, F-1, H replaced pursuant to 9/24/2013 hearing. (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Certain Exhibits to the CUNA Mutual Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Under Seal by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Non-Confidential Descriptive Index of Exhibits to Be Filed Under Seal)No proposed order.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION to Exclude / Strike Testimony and Opinions of Birny Birnbaum by Founders Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Excerpts from Deposition of Birney Birnbaum, # 3 Index and Copies of Unpublished Cases Cited)No proposed order.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 159 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL Response filed by Founders Federal Credit Union.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/19/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Attachments, # 2 Attachment 1 - Affidavit of Robert Fenner with Report, # 3 Attachment 2 - Affidavit of Charles Alford with Report, # 4 Attachment 3 - Affidavit of Amanda Blackmon with attachments, # 5 Attachment 4 - Affidavit of Sharesa Blackmon, # 6 Attachment 5 - Affidavit of Antony Gilreath, # 7 Attachment 6 - Condensed Deposition Transcript of Nicki Nash with selected exhibits, # 8 Attachment 7 - Excerpts fron Deposition of Birny Birnbaum, # 9 Attachment 8 - Defendant FFCU Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, 6, 27, # 10 Attachment 9 - Defendant FFCU Third Supplemental Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, No. 17, # 11 Attachment 10 - Select Documents Produced by FFCU, # 12 Attachment 11 - Select Documents Produced by Mungo, # 13 Attachment 12 - Summary of Payment Protection Fees paid by Mungo, # 14 Attachment 13 - NCUA Letter to Federal Credit Unions 03-FCU-06, # 15 Attachment 14a. - ECF 1-2, Affidavit of Stephen Bragg, dated 2-24-2011, # 16 Attachment 14b. - ECF 18-1, Affidavit of Phyllis Bunkley, dated 4-4-2011, # 17 Attachment 14c. - ECF 31-2, Affidavit of Stephen Bragg, dated 4-29-2011, # 18 Attachment 14d. - ECF 140-2, Certified Copy of Certificate of Insuance and Group Credit Insurance Policy, # 19 Index and Copies of Unpublished Cases Cited By FFCU in its Memorandum in Opposition)(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Consent MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits 7, 8, 19, 23, and 24 to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. No. 159) by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Non-Confidential Descriptive Index)No proposed order.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              TEXT ORDER granting 160 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 159 MOTION to Certify Class. Response to Motion due by 9/9/2013. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/13/2013.(mdea ) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 159 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2013. No proposed order.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 8/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 1-Corrected Report of Birny Birnbaum Mungo, # 3 Exhibit 2 (abbrev)-2004 Proposal-Founders 1364, # 4 Exhibit 3-Mortgage, Note and Security Agmt- MUN 201-MUN 205_Redacted.pdf, # 5 Exhibit 4-CUNA Enrollment Form-Mun 208_Redacted, # 6 Exhibit 5-CUNA Certificate of Insurance-Mun 209, # 7 Exhibit 6-2003 Credit Disability Claim Analysis-Founders 1510, # 8 Exhibit 7 (abbrev)-Narrative-Founders 1250, # 9 Exhibit 8 (abbrev)-CUNA 2004 Presentation-Founders 1196, # 10 Exhibit 9-Sept 20, 2007 Email from CUNA to Founders-Founders 1296, # 11 Exhibit 10-Nov 26, 2007 Email from CUNA to Founders-Founders 2325-2327_Redacted, # 12 Exhibit 11-Jun 29, 2007 Founders's staff email-Founders 5740, # 13 Exhibit 12 (abbrev)-Nash depo, Page 53, # 14 Exhibit 13 (abbrev)-Founders 2nd Supple Answer to Interrog 18, # 15 Exhibit 14-(Purported debt cancellation contracts, at Founders 5775 and 5778), # 16 Exhibit 15-NCUA letter to Fed Credit Union, May 2003, # 17 Exhibit 16 (abbrev)-Founders Admission 12 dated 12.7.11, # 18 Exhibit 17-Mungo's July 2007 account-Founders 914_Redacted, # 19 Exhibit 18-January 2008 NCUA Opinion Letter 2008 WL 234272 (N.C.U.A.), # 20 Exhibit 19-Remote Signature protocol-Founders 1608-1638, # 21 Exhibit 20-CUNA's draft notice to class members-Founders 5769-5770, # 22 Exhibit 21-Nov 1 2004 Letter to card holders-Founders 1089, # 23 Exhibit 22-Nov 1 2004 Email from Blackmon-Founders 1094.pdf, # 24 Exhibit 23- June 2005 PPP-Founders 1253-1261, # 25 Exhibit 24 (abbrev)-2009 PPP Manual Disability procedures-Founders 1262, 1265-1266, # 26 Exhibit 25-Credit Insurance Policy-Founders 1492-1498_Redacted, # 27 Exhibit 26-Declaration of Chad McGowan, # 28 Exhibit 27-Declaration of Susan F. Campbell, # 29 Exhibit 28-Declaration of Keith Martens, # 30 Exhibit 29-Declaration of Mary K. Mungo (executed))No proposed order.(Campbell, Susan) (Attachment 8 replaced on 9/25/2013) (mdea, ). (Attachment 9 replaced on 9/25/2013) (mdea, ). (Attachment 25 replaced on 9/25/2013) (mdea, ). (Attachment 20 replaced on 9/25/2013) (mdea, ). (Attachment 24 replaced on 9/25/2013) (mdea, ). Modified on 9/25/2013 to replace exhibits 7, 8, 19, 23, 24 per 9/24/2013 hearing (mdea, ). Modified on 3/5/2014 to reflect additional attachment filed as entry 196 (mdea, ). (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Motions Relating to Class Certification by Mary K Mungo, Founders Federal Credit Union, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CMFG Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2013. No proposed order.(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting 153 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery due June 24, 2013 and file motions related to class certification due July 24, 2013 ; finding as moot 152 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 6/4/2013.(asni, ) Modified to edit text on 6/5/2013 (asni, ). (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Extend Expert Discovery and Class Certification Deadlines) by Mary K Mungo, Founders Federal Credit Union, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CMFG Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2013. No proposed order.(Cox, Christi) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Limited Purpose of Deposing Expert by Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 6/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Correspondence, # 2 Exhibit 2 Notice/Subpoena)No proposed order.(Cox, Christi) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 140 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Opinions)(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              TEXT ORDER granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 140 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Replies due by 5/1/2013. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 4/30/2013.(asni, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 141 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint Response filed by Founders Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unpublished Cases and Other Authorites Cited) Refiled by the clerk to correct event type.(asni, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 140 MOTION to Dismiss by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2013. No proposed order.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document 144 Response in Opposition to Motion,. First attachment description: Exhibit 1-Unpublished opinions . (Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 140 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 141 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint Response filed by Mary K Mungo.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/29/2013 (Campbell, Susan) additional attachment 145 added on 4/19/2013 (asni, ). (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting 142 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 141 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint, 140 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 4/18/2013. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 4/8/2013.(asni, ) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 140 Motion to dismiss 141 Motion to Dismiss by Mary K Mungo, Founders Federal Credit Union, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CMFG Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 4/25/2013. No proposed order.(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Founders Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 4/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Appendix A - Certificat eof Insurance, # 3 Appendix B - Group Policy -- Certificate of Insurance, # 4 Part 1 - Unpublished Cases and Other Authorities Cited, # 5 Part 2 - Unpublished Cases and Other Authorities Cited)No proposed order.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Group Policy, # 3 Exhibit B - Enrollment Form and Certificate of Insurance, # 4 Exhibit C - Notice Letters, # 5 Exhibit D - Unpublished Cases)No proposed order.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(a)(2) by Founders Federal Credit Union.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Mary K Mungo. Notice of Filing Defendants' Acceptance of Service of Third Amended Complaint CMFG Life Insurance Company served on 2/26/2013, answer due 3/19/2013; CUMIS Insurance Society Inc served on 2/26/2013, answer due 3/19/2013; Founders Federal Credit Union served on 2/26/2013, answer due 3/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 EX. 1-CUNA's Acceptance of Service of Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Ex 2-Founders Acceptance of Service of Third Amended Complaint)(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by CMFG Life Insurance Company, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      FIFTH AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER( Answer to Third Amended Complaint due 3/25/2013, Defendants ID of Expert Witness on issues of class certification due 3/15/2013, Expert Discovery due 5/24/2013, Motions relating to class certification due 6/21/2013, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/3/2014, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/14/2014, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/15/2014, Non-expert Discovery due by 3/3/2014, Motion in Limine due by 8/15/2014, Motions due by 6/16/2014, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/8/2014, Pretrial Briefs due by 10/8/2014, Jury Selection Deadline 10/15/2014, ADR Statement due by 6/17/2014, Mediation Due by 7/17/2014,) granting 130 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 120 Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 3/7/2013. (asni, ) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Withdrawal of Motions: 129 MOTION to Quash filed by Mary K Mungo.. (Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society, Founders Federal Credit Union, filed by Mary K Mungo. (Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            ORDER AND OPINION granting 95 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 2/25/2013.(asni, ) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 120 Scheduling Order by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society, Mary K Mungo, Founders Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 3/11/2013. No proposed order.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Quash by Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 2/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1-January 25, 2013-Letter from Leonardi serving subpoena to Birnbaum, # 2 Ex. 2-February 5, 2013-Letter from Leonardi serving subpoena to Birnbaum, # 3 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoenas, # 4 Ex. 1-Memorandum in Support of Motion-unpublished opinions)No proposed order.(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER granting 123 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 1/3/2013.(asni, ) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document 123 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . First attachment description: Notice of Filing Consent to Substitution and Withdrawal of Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Substitution and Withdrawal of Counsel)(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Walker Duvall Spruill on behalf of Founders Federal Credit Union (Spruill, Walker) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Founders Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 1/7/2013. No proposed order.(Shuler, Franklin) additional attachment entry 126 added on 12/20/2012 (asni, ). (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Mary K Mungo.(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            FOURTH AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER( Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/3/2014, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/14/2014, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/16/2014, Discovery due by 11/29/2013, Motion in Limine due by 6/16/2014, Motions due by 3/17/2014, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/11/2014, Pretrial Briefs due by 8/8/2014, Jury Selection Deadline 8/15/2014, ADR Statement due by 3/15/2014, Mediation Due by 4/15/2014,) Motions terminated: granting 119 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 103 Scheduling Order Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 10/4/2012. (asni, ) Modified to edit text on 10/9/2012 (asni, ). (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 103 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,, by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society, Founders Federal Credit Union, Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2012. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER and OPINION denying 90 Motion to Strike ; denying 91 Motion to Strike Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 8/24/2012.(asni, ) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 108 Motion to Stay Scheduling Order deadlines pending ruling on motions to stike. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 6/26/2012.(asni, ) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Stay Scheduling Order deadlines pending ruling on motions to stike PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 16.00(C), DSC by Mary K Mungo, Founders Federal Credit Union, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/2/2012 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on May 10, 2012, before Judge Margaret B. Seymour. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathleen Richardson, RPR, CRR, Telephone number/E-mail (803)779-6709 or kathleen_richardson@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 6/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2012. (kari, ) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2012 re 91 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Founders Federal Credit Union, 90 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from the Second Amended Complaint filed by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society, 95 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Mary K Mungo. Court takes motions under advisement, written order forthcoming. Court Reporter Kathleen Richardson. (mdea, ) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 95 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint Response filed by Mary K Mungo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Email granting extension of time)(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            THIRD AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER( Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/18/2012, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/20/2012, Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2012, Expert Discovery due by 10/15/2012, Motions relating to class certification due by 10/29/2012) Motions terminated: granting 102 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 93 Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 5/7/2012. (asni, ) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 93 Scheduling Order by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society, Founders Federal Credit Union, Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 5/21/2012 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint Response filed by Founders Federal Credit Union.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/14/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unpublished Cases)(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint Response filed by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/14/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Group Credit Insurance Policy, # 2 Exhibit B - Unreported Cases)(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 95 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint, 90 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from the Second Amended Complaint, 91 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from Second Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2012 10:00 AM in Columbia # 5, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour. (asni, ) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT by Founders Federal Credit Union to 97 Reply to Response to Motion, 91 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Memorandum in Support, 83 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Notice to Court of Prior Incorrect Statement of Fact. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix July 30, 2007 letters, # 2 Appendix July 16, 2007 letter)(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Founders Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Walsh v. Woods, # 2 Exhibit Estock v. Associated Hospital Service of New York, # 3 Exhibit Hunter, et al. v. American General Life and Accident)(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 90 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from the Second Amended Complaint Response filed by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Dec. 15, 2011), # 2 Exhibit B - Unpublished Cases)(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 5/3/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Supp of Motion to File TAC_Mungo, # 2 EX. A-Mungo Third Amended Complaint FINAL)No proposed order(Campbell, Susan) (Main Document 95 replaced on 4/17/2012) (asni, ). Modified to replace document at the request of chambers on 4/17/2012 (asni, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/20/2013) (asni, ). Modified to replace document at the request of chambers to assert Count VI unjust enrichment claim as to Defendant Founders only on 2/20/2013 (asni, ). (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Memorandum in Support, 90 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from the Second Amended Complaint Response filed by Mary K Mungo.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/23/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Mary Mungo's CUNA Certificate of Insurance, # 2 Exhibit B-Excerpts from Founders Answers to 1st requests, # 3 Exhibit C-Excerpts from Founders 2nd Supplemental Answers, # 4 Exhibit D-to Mungo Response to Ds Motions to Strike-unreported case)(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER( Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/16/2012, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/18/2012, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/20/2012, Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2012, Expert discovery due 9/14/2012, Motions relating to class certification due 9/28/2012) granting 92 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 4/5/2012. (asni, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Scheduling Order by Mary K Mungo, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society, Founders Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 4/23/2012 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Allegations from 47 Second Amended Complaint by Founders Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 4/13/2012 No proposed order(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from 47 Second Amended Complaint by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. Response to Motion due by 4/12/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support)No proposed order(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/6/2012, Fact Discovery due 6/1/2012, Expert Discovery Report due by 9/14/2012, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/18/2012, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/20/2012, Motions relating to class certification due by 9/28/2012,. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour on 2/17/2012. (asni, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry. Proceedings held via telephone before Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour: granting 80 Motion to Compel; Status Conference held on 2/10/2012; Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2012 re 80 MOTION to Compel FFCU's discovery responses filed by Mary K Mungo. Court will bifurcate discovery. Parties to submit proposed consent amended scheduling order by 2/17/2012. Court Reporter Dan Mayo. (mdea ) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 85 Reason: document doesn't comply with judges filing preferences. Proposed orders are not filed in ECF. The attorney has been instructed to file a motion to amend the scheduling order and submit the proposed amended scheduling order to the judges filing box. (asni, ) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 80 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2012 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour. This hearing will be conducted via telephone after the status conference previously scheduled. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and have all parties on the line prior to contacting the Court at 803-253-3421.(asni, ) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 80 MOTION to Compel FFCU's discovery responses Response filed by Founders Federal Credit Union.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit July 16, 2007 letter - mortgages, # 2 Exhibit July 16, 2007 letter - consumer loans, # 3 Exhibit August 1, 2007 letter- mortgages, # 4 Exhibit August 1, 2007 letter- consumer loans, # 5 Exhibit Real Estate PPP Agreement, # 6 Exhibit Consumer Loan PPP Agreement, # 7 Exhibit Mungo July 2007 Statement, # 8 Exhibit Mungo August 2007 Statement, # 9 Appendix Unpublished Cases)(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/10/2012 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Margaret B Seymour. This hearing will be conducted via telephone. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and have all parties on the line prior to contacting the Court at 803-253-3421.(asni, ) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 47 Second Amended Complaint, by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel FFCU's discovery responses by Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 2/3/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Plt's discovery requests to FFCU, # 2 Exhibit B-FFCU Answers to Plt's discovery requests, # 3 Exhibit C-Letter to FFCU's counsel re discovery responses, # 4 Exhibit D-Email to FFCU's counsel re Rule 37.01 extension)No proposed order(Cox, Christi) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on December 15, 2011, before Judge Margaret B. Seymour. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathleen Richardson, RPR, CRR, Telephone number/E-mail (803)779-6709 or Kathleen_Richardson@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 2/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2012. (kari, ) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 77 Motion for Confidentiality Order Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 1/3/2012.(asni, ) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society, Founders Federal Credit Union, Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Clean Copy of Proposed Order, # 2 Redlined Version of Standard Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER denying 60 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Having reviewed the motion to dismiss, related pleadings, and arguments of counsel at the hearing, the court finds that Plaintiff's Complaint is sufficient under Bell Atlantic Corp. v. Twombly, 550 U.S. 544 (2007) and DENIES the motion to dismiss. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 12/19/2011.(mdea ) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Margaret B Seymour: Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2011 re 60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. Court takes under advisement, written order forthcoming. Court Reporter Kathleen Richardson. (mdea ) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice Letter)(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 61 Motion to Stay Scheduling order as to defendants CUNA Mutual Insurance Society and CUMIS Insurance Society Inc only pending the outcome of the motion to dismiss. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/29/2011.(asni, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 70 Reason: wrong case caption and event type. Corrected Filing Document Number 71 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 11/28/2011 (asni, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Mary K Mungo.(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Founders Federal Credit Union.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 26(f) Report by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society, Founders Federal Credit Union, Mary K Mungo. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order, # 2 Appendix Founders Proposed Scheduling Order)(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Mary K Mungo.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/8/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1-Unpublished Opinions, # 3 Exhibit 2-Chapter 4-Consumer Protection Code)(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 61 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.00(C), DSC MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.00(C), DSC Response filed by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Unpublished Cases)(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2011 10:00 AM in Columbia # 5, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. (asni, ) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.00(C), DSC MOTION to Stay Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.00(C), DSC Response filed by Mary K Mungo.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/21/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A-Decl of Christy Cox, # 3 Exhibit B-Order granting D'S MTD, # 4 Exhibit C-April 25 2005 Board Meeting re arbitration, # 5 Exhibit D- Letter to Frank Shuler and response, # 6 Exhibit E-Unpublished opinion (Webster v Rumsfeld), # 7 Exhibit F-Corporate Law and Practice Article)(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay 54 Conference and Scheduling Order Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.00(C), DSC by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Unpublished Cases)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Founders Payment Protection Plan Contract, # 3 Exhibit B - Unpublished Cases)No proposed order(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER granting 56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/18/2011.(asni, ) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roger K. Heidenreich ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-3714320) by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Roger K. Heidenreich)No proposed order(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maria L. Domanskis ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-3714292) by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Maria L. Domanskis)No proposed order(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony T. Eliseuson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-3714203) by CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Anthony T. Eliseuson)No proposed order(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Leonardi on behalf of CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society (Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/10/2011, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/28/2011, Rule 26 Report due by 11/28/2011, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/5/2011, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/4/2012, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/3/2012, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/3/2012, Discovery due by 4/3/2012, Motion in Limine due by 7/16/2012, Motions due by 4/18/2012, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/2/2012, Pretrial Briefs due by 8/1/2012, Jury Selection Deadline 8/6/2012, ADR Statement due by 5/18/2012, Mediation Due by 6/18/2012,. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 10/21/2011. (asni, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Margaret B Seymour. Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (glev, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Founders Federal Credit Union, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Mary K Mungo. (Willard, Theodore) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 47 Amended Complaint, by Founders Federal Credit Union.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to CUMIS Insurance Society Inc. (bshr, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to CUNA Mutual Insurance Society. (bshr, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Founders Federal Credit Union, CUNA Mutual Insurance Society, CUMIS Insurance Society Inc, filed by Mary K Mungo. (Cox, Christi) Modified on 9/23/2011 to add text and to remove attachments and file separately as ECF Nos. 48 and 49 (bshr, ). (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/16/2011.(bshr, ) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting 44 Motion to Withdraw 31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration; finding as moot 31 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/16/2011.(bshr, ) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw 31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Founders Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 10/3/2011 No proposed order(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline on Arbitration-Related Briefs. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 09/12/2011.(bshr, ) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline on Arbitration-Related Briefs by Founders Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2011 Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 33 MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint Response filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Willard, Theodore) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 33 MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint Response filed by Mary K Mungo. (Cox, Christi) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint Response filed by Founders Federal Credit Union.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/11/2011 (Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Susan F Campbell for July 25-27 and August 3-5 2011 (Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER: The court grants the plaintiff's request for leave to engage in limited arbitration-only discovery. Both parties may submit supplemental briefs on the motion to compel arbitration on or before September 14, 2011. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 07/14/2011. (bshr, ) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Response filed by Mary K Mungo.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/25/2011 (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT APPENDIX, # 2 Exhibit A-5.21.01 Consumer Loan Note and Security Agmt, # 3 Exhibit B- 5.21.01 Real Estate Future Advance Mortgage, # 4 Exhibit C- 5.21.01 CUNA Mutual Group Credit Insurance Enrollment forms, # 5 Exhibit D- 7.16.07 Letter from Founders to Dear Member, # 6 Exhibit E-Chart distinguishing facts, # 7 Exhibit F-Mungo's Proposed Arbitration Roggs to Founders, # 8 Exhibit G-Mungo's Proposed Arbitration RTP to Founders, # 9 Exhibit H-Letter from Minnesota Attorney General to AAA, # 10 Exhibit I- 7.27.09 Press Release from AAA, # 11 Exhibit J-Status of AAA's Moratorium as of 7.5.11, # 12 Exhibit K -Local Rule 7.05(A)(4) Appendix)(Campbell, Susan) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint by Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2nd amended complaint)No proposed order(Martens, Walter) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Founders Federal Credit Union. Response to Motion due by 7/14/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Stephen Michael Bragg - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Stephen Michael Bragg - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit McCollum v. Tenet Healthcare Corp., # 5 Exhibit Callan v. Singletary, # 6 Exhibit Joyner v. GE Healthcare, # 7 Exhibit K & M Merchandixing v. American Western Home Insurance Co.)No proposed order(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying with permission to re-file 9 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 06/22/2011.(bshr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: taking under advisement 9 Motion to Remand to State Court; Motion Hearing held on 5/24/2011. Court Reporter Anna Lanahan, CS. (dpat, ) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Keith Martens on behalf of Mary K Mungo (Martens, Walter) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2011 01:00 PM in Charleston Courtroom #6, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. (mflo, ) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Willard, Theodore) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Surrebuttal. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 04/19/2011.(bshr, ) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Surrebuttal by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 5/5/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Surrebuttal Regarding Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum For Motion to Remand)No proposed order(Willard, Theodore) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Mary K Mungo. (Cox, Christi) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Founders Federal Credit Union.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/14/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Phyllis Bunkley, # 2 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Stephen Michael Bragg, # 3 Appendix Bowen v. Houser, # 4 Appendix Northern Virginia Foot Clinic v. PenFed, # 5 Appendix TCT Fed. Credit Union v. Cumis)(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/14/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Kathryn Schmidt, # 2 Exhibit 2-Report and Recommendation: Smalls v. Advance America, C.A. No. 2:07cv-3240)(Willard, Theodore) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Willard, Theodore) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.(Willard, Theodore) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelly D. Simpkins for defendant Minnesota Life (Theodore Willard, local counsel). Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 3/21/2011. (ghay) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly D. Simpkins ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-3273072) by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 4/7/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kelly D. Simpkins, # 2 Letter of Good Standing for Kelly D. Simpkins)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Willard, Theodore) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint by Founders Federal Credit Union.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mary K Mungo. Response to Motion due by 4/4/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit Founders 2009 Annual Report - Excerpt, # 3 Exhibit Notice of Removal in 0:11-cv-00358-JFA-JRM)No proposed order(Cox, Christi) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Founders Federal Credit Union.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Founders Federal Credit Union, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, filed by Mary K Mungo. ***Filed in State Court***(bshr, ) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Founders Federal Credit Union. ***Filed in State Court*** (bshr, ) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.(bshr, ) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lancaster County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2011-CP-29-91. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-3228282), filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kelly C. Iverson, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Stephen Michael Bragg, # 3 Exhibit C - State Court Documents, # 4 Consent to Removal by Founders Federal Credit Union)(bshr, ) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?