Armstrong v. Symetra Life Insurance Co.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Middle District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00974
District Judge John T. Nixon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 7:47 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John D. Armstrong, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Edward T. Farmer +1 931 245 0077 +1 931 245 0079 efarmer@callmyattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Fletcher Whaley Long +1 931 896 2066 +1 931 896 2067 flong@fletcherlong.com
No Logo Robert D. Armstrong, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Edward T. Farmer +1 931 245 0077 +1 931 245 0079 efarmer@callmyattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Fletcher Whaley Long +1 931 896 2066 +1 931 896 2067 flong@fletcherlong.com
No Logo Travelers Indemnity Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 5th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Charles Chejfec +1 312 579 3132 +1 312 251 3035 charles.chejfec@actuatelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrew Stuart Amer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Andrew Stuart Amer

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Hal Kemp Litchford +1 407 422 6600 +1 407 841 0325 hlitchford@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryce Allan Pashler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Bryce Allan Pashler

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Bryana Lisette Blessinger +1 206 292 8930 bryana.blessinger@bullivant.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Ronald J. Clark +1 503 499 4413 +1 503 295 0915 ron.clark@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlson Calladine & Peterson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael C. Cooper +1 415 391 3911 mcooper@ccplaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert M. Peterson +1 415 391 3911 +1 415 391 3898 rpeterson@ccplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chad Brian Walker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Chad Brian Walker

Toggle Switch Represented by Courington Kiefer & Sommers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brittney Bullock Ankersen +1 504 524 5510 bankersen@courington-law.com
, , , , , , , Kaye N. Courington +1 504 524 5510 +1 504 524 7887 kcourington@courington-law.com
Space Dawn Danna Marullo +1 504 524 5510 dmarullo@courington-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Thomas O'Connor Farrish +1 860 275 0397 +1 860 275 0343 tofarrish@daypitney.com
, Mitchell R. Harris +1 860 275 0332 +1 860 275 0343 mrharris@daypitney.com
, Meredith A Long +1 860 275 0100 mlong@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Anthony Thomas Eliseuson +1 312 876 8000 +1 312 876 7934 aeliseuson@sonnenschein.com
, , , , Mark L. Hanover +1 312 876 8000 +1 312 876 7934 mark.hanover@dentons.com
, , , , Donna J. Vobornik +1 312 876 7370 +1 312 876 7457 ndil_ecf@sonnenschein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dillingham & Murphy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Mitchell B. Greenberg +1 415 397 2700 mgreenberg@abbeylaw.com
, , , , Stephanie Leigh Walker +1 707 542 5050 +1 707 542 2589 swalker@abbeylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com
Space Donald Charles Weinberg +1 703 336 8700 +1 703 336 8750 dweinberg@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Douglas Conrad Longman , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Douglas Conrad Longman, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Arthur M. Kaufman +1 216 274 2263 +1 216 241 2824 amkaufman@hahnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey Matthew Burg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Jeffrey Matthew Burg

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Morris Klevenhagen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Erin E Jones +1 713 589 5061 +1 713 589 5513 erin@jmkllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Gary Jude Russo +1 337 262 9000 +1 337 262 9001 grusso@joneswalker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KARBAL, COHEN, ECONOMOU, SILK & DUNNE, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Del Blum +1 312 431 3644 cblum@karballaw.com
, , Roderick T. Dunne +1 312 431 3700 +1 312 431 3670 rdunne@karballaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KATTEN AND MUCHIN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Patrick C. Harrigan - NOT SWORN +1 312 902 5584 +1 312 577 4464 patrick.harrigan@kattenlaw.com
, Kathy Piemont Josephson +1 312 902 5200 +1 312 577 8861 kathy.josephson@kattenlaw.com
, Ross O. Silverman +1 312 902 5240 +1 312 577 8989 ross.silverman@kattenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ROBERT F SPRINGFIELD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Katherine Knight Layhew +1 615 724 3200 +6153 615 615 3319 klayhew@burr.com
, , , Thomas K Potter, III +1 615 724 3231 +1 615 724 3331 tpotter@burr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas A. Leghorn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Lawrence Schiffman +1 212 972 1000 +1 212 972 1030 bschiffman@londonfischer.com
Space James Walsh +1 212 972 1000 +1 212 972 1030 jwalsh@londonfischer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lazare Potter & Giacovas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Yale Howard Glazer +1 212 784 3291 +1 212 888 0919 yglazer@lpgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LETHER & ASSOCIATES PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Thomas Lether +1 206 467 5444 +1 206 467 5544 tlether@letherlaw.com
Space Daniel McLafferty +1 206 467 5444 dmclafferty@letherlaw.com
, Eric J Neal +1 206 467 5444 eneal@letherlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ian Matthew Fischer +1 602 262 5724 +1 602 262 5747 ifischer@lrrc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by London Fischer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg D. Minkin +1 212 972 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Lugenbuhl Wheaton et al (NO)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Osborne Hannan +1 504 568 1990 khannan@lawla.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Ralph S Hubbard, III +1 504 568 1990 +1 504 310 9195 rhubbard@lawla.com
, Tina L. Kappen +1 504 568 1990 tkappen@lawla.com
, Reed S. Minkin +1 504 568 1990 rminkin@lawla.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Seth Andrew Schmeeckle +1 504 568 1990 +1 504 310 9195 sschmeeckle@lawla.com
, Seth Andrew Schmeeckle +1 504 568 1990 +1 504 310 9195 sschmeeckle@lawla.com
, Travis Brendon Wilkinson +1 504 568 1990 twilkinson@lawla.com
, , , Kristopher T. Wilson +1 504 568 1990 kwilson@lawla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynn Katherine Neuner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Lynn Katherine Neuner

Toggle Switch Represented by Madison Harbour & Mroz PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jennifer L Collins +1 505 242 2177 jlc@madisonlaw.com
, M. Eliza Stewart +1 505 242 2177 +1 505 242 7184 mes@madisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mary Beth Forshaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Mary Beth Forshaw

Toggle Switch Represented by Mendes & Mount

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Matthew B. Anderson +1 212 261 8412 +1 212 261 8750 matthew.anderson@mendes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Andrew Bittner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Andrew Bittner

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , David Frank McDowell +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 dmcdowell@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Mark Emerson Hanna +1 504 595 3000 mhanna@mblb.com
Space Michael H. Rodrigue, Jr. +1 504 595 3000 mrodrigue@mblb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Neil J. McNabnay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Neil J. McNabnay

Toggle Switch Represented by Neuner Pate

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara Rodrigue Buggs +1 337 237 7000 +1 337 233 9450 sbuggs@neunerpate.com
, James L. Pate +1 337 237 7000 +1 337 233 9450 jpate@neunerpate.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nistico, Crouch & Kessler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Maxwell Micah Kessler +1 713 781 2889 +1 713 781 7222 mkessler@nck-law.com
Space Joseph F Nistico, Jr. +1 713 781 2889 +1 713 781 7222 jnistico@nck-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagen Meyer PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth M Bartolucci +1 312 422 6123 ebartolucci@ohaganmeyer.com
Space Kevin M O'Hagan +1 312 422 6100 +1 312 422 6110 kohagan@ohaganmeyer.com
Space Kristine S Phillips +1 312 422 6100 +1 312 422 6110 kphillips@ohaganmeyer.com
, Luke P Sheridan +1 312 422 6100 +1 312 422 6110 lsheridan@ohaganmeyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PECKAR & ABRAMSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Mark R Berry +1 202 293 8815 +1 202 293 7994 mberry@pecklaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Andrew Branca +1 202 293 8815 +1 202 293 7994 mbranca@pecklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Putney Twombly Hall & Hirson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Alan Martin +1 212 682 0020 +1 212 682 9380 tmartin@putneylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC - Plano

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Wm. Lance Lewis +1 214 880 1827 +1 214 871 2111 llewis@qslwm.com
, Marcie L. Schout +1 214 871 2100 +1 214 871 2111 mschout@qslwm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rae Caroline Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Rae Caroline Adams

Toggle Switch Represented by Rita Kathleen Maxwell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Rita Kathleen Maxwell

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiller, Osbourn, Barnes & Maloney, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Stephen Keller +1 502 583 4777 +1 502 583 4780 skeller@sobmlegal.com
, , , Michael S. Maloney +1 502 583 4777 +1 502 583 4780 mmaloney@sobmlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shackelford Melton McKinley & Norton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, John Nefflen +1 615 329 4440 +1 615 329 4485 jnefflen@shackelfordlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jonathan M. Allen +1 303 634 2086 +1 303 634 2020 jmallen@swlaw.com
Space Allison L. Biles +1 303 634 2000 +1 303 634 2020 abiles@swlaw.com
, , , Amy Michelle Samberg +1 520 882 1266 +1 520 884 1294 asamberg@swlaw.com
Space Amy Michelle Samberg +1 520 882 1266 +1 520 884 1294 asamberg@swlaw.com
, Amy Lynn Stein +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 astein@swlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sonnenschein, Nath & Rosenthal - Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Meghan E. Norton +1 312 876 2824

Toggle Switch Represented by Spicer Rudstrom, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Marc O Dedman +1 615 259 9080 +1 615 259 1522 mod@spicerfirm.com
, , Brent S. Usery +1 615 259 9080 +1 615 259 1522 bsu@spicerfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Mary +2 027 429 3000 +1 202 429 3902 mpoag@steptoe.com
, John Reginald Casciano +1 202 429 6268 +1 202 263 3563 jcasciano@steptoe.com
, Catherine Danielle Cockerham +1 202 429 3000 +1 202 429 3902 ccockerham@steptoe.com
, , , Joseph S Kiefer +1 602 257 5288 +1 602 257 5299 jkiefer@steptoe.com
, Jon T Neumann +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 jneumann@steptoe.com
, James Elmer Rocap, III +1 202 429 8152 +1 202 429 3902 jrocap@steptoe.com
, Joshua R. Taylor +1 202 429 3000 +1 202 261 0658 jrtaylor@steptoe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Laura E. Besvinick +1 305 358 9900 +1 305 459 6550 lbesvinick@stroock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Vayda Dembinski +1 248 476 6900 +1 248 476 6564 ndembinski@lmdlaw.com
Space Rik O. Mazzeo +1 248 476 6900 +1 248 476 6564 rmazzeo@lmdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taj Jamar Clayton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Taj Jamar Clayton

Toggle Switch Represented by The Travelers Indemnity Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Michael F. Grennan +1 504 832 7630 +1 504 833 4969 mgrennan@travelers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Troy Nathan Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Troy Nathan Bell

Toggle Switch Represented by W. Gray Dunlap, Jr., PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, W. Gray Dunlap, Jr. +1 813 514 1927 +1 813 514 1932 gdunlap@wgd-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Norman K. Beck +1 312 558 5600 nbeck@winston.com
, , , , , , , Timothy John Rooney +1 312 558 5600 trooney@winston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brad E Brewer +1 214 742 3000 +1 214 760 8994 bbrewer@zelle.com
, , , , , , , Jennifer L Gibbs +1 214 742 3000 +1 214 760 8994 jgibbs@zelle.com
, , , Terrence Charles McRea +1 214 742 3000 tmcrea@zelle.com
v.
No Logo Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ROBERT F SPRINGFIELD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Katherine Knight Layhew +1 615 724 3200 +6153 615 615 3319 klayhew@burr.com
, , , Thomas K Potter, III +1 615 724 3231 +1 615 724 3331 tpotter@burr.com
No Logo Pacific Life Insurance Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Jordan Phillips +1 615 244 2582 +1 615 252 6394 jphillips@babc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Harris +1 215 988 2806 +1 215 988 2757 stephen.harris@dbr.com
Space Michael J Miller +1 215 988 2782 +1 215 988 2757 Michael.Miller@dbr.com
Space Jenifer Smith +1 215 988 3397 jenifer.smith@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reid Leitner Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reid D. Leitner +1 615 933 7900 +1 615 888 4185 reid.leitner@reidleitnerlaw.com
No Logo St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ROBERT F SPRINGFIELD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Katherine Knight Layhew +1 615 724 3200 +6153 615 615 3319 klayhew@burr.com
, , , Thomas K Potter, III +1 615 724 3231 +1 615 724 3331 tpotter@burr.com
No Logo Structured Benefits of Florida, Defendant
No Logo Symetra Life Insurance Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L Eric Ebbert +1 865 549 7000 eebbert@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by bfusa.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily H. Plotkin +1 615 937 1384 +1 615 493 2703 plotkinemily@bfusa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lathrop & Gage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space S. Russell Headrick +1 816 292 2000 +1 816 292 2001 rheadrick@lathropgage.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Symetra Life Insurance Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Symetra Life Insurance Co.
No Logo Beverly Armstrong, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Burchell Goldblatt & MacKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Allen MacKay +1 202 642 4646

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Hawkins & Farmer, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kenneth Ray Jones, Jr. +1 615 726 0050

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Lisa M. Goldblatt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Merren Goldblatt +1 443 574 5037 +1 443 576 0624
No Logo Bob Armstrong, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Hawkins & Farmer, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kenneth Ray Jones, Jr. +1 615 726 0050
No Logo Travelers Casualty And Surety Company, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Hal Kemp Litchford +1 407 422 6600 +1 407 841 0325 hlitchford@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Laura E. Besvinick +1 305 459 6622 +1 305 459 6550 laura.besvinick@HoganLovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ROBERT F SPRINGFIELD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Katherine Knight Layhew +1 615 724 3200 +6153 615 615 3319 klayhew@burr.com
, , , Thomas K Potter, III +1 615 724 3231 +1 615 724 3331 tpotter@burr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Connor, O'Connor Law Firm - Albany Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Dianne C. Bresee +1 518 465 0400 +1 518 465 0015 bresee@oobf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Russell E. Reviere +1 731 423 2414 rreviere@raineykizer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shackelford Melton McKinley & Norton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, John Nefflen +1 615 329 4440 +1 615 329 4485 jnefflen@shackelfordlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Catherine Danielle Cockerham +1 202 429 3000 +1 202 429 3902 ccockerham@steptoe.com
, James Elmer Rocap, III +1 202 429 8152 +1 202 429 3902 jrocap@steptoe.com
, Joshua R. Taylor +1 202 429 3000 +1 202 261 0658 jrtaylor@steptoe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Travelers Indemnity Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Broy +1 901 756 3046 +1 901 756 3171 jbroy@travelers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Sneed +1 615 660 6201 dsneed@travelers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Norman K. Beck +1 312 558 5600 nbeck@winston.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Timothy John Rooney +1 312 558 5600 trooney@winston.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (118) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re 117 Order. (tmw) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 12/16/10. (tmw) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL "AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL" filed by Beverly Armstrong, Bob Armstrong. (Jones, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER: On 11/11/2010, the parties filed a mediation report 114, advising that they were able to reach a settlement of all claims in this case as a result of their participation in private mediation conducted on 11/9/2010. As a result, the Motion to Dismiss or to Remand filed by the third-party defendants 104 is rendered MOOT and the Clerk is directed to terminate that motion as pending. Therefore, by 12/13/2010, counsel for the parties shall file a proposed "New Orleans" order, providing that the parties have reached a full settlement and that the case is dismissed with prejudice, but that the parties have leave to reopen the case, upon motion, if the settlement is not consummated by [whatever deadline]. The Clerk is directed to forward the file in this case to the Honorable John T. Nixon for his consideration of the parties' proposed "New Orleans" agreed order of dismissal to be filed by 12/13/2010. Unless otherwise directed by the Court or upon motion of the parties, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 11/29/10. (dt) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Report of Parties Regarding Mediation Efforts by Symetra Life Insurance Co.(Headrick, S.) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: Motion of defendants Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty & Surety Company for Katherine Knight Layhew to withdraw 111 is GRANTED. The motion of defendant/cross defendant Symetra Life Insurance Co. ("Symetra") and defendant/cross-plaintiff Travelers Indemnity Company ("Travelers") for an extension of time for cross-defendant Symetra to respond to the cross-claim filed by Travelers 112 is GRANTED. Defendant/cross-defendant Symetra shall have until 11/15/2010, to file a response to the cross-claim of defendant/cross-plaintiff Travelers 102 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 10/14/10. (dt) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 102 Crossclaim, by Symetra Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time Within Which Defendant and Cross-Defendant Symetra Life Insurance Co. May Respond to Defendant and Cross-Claimant Travelers Indemnity Company's Cross-Claim)(Headrick, S.) Modified Text on 10/14/2010 (dt). (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Katherine Layhew as Attorney)(Nefflen, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Nefflen on behalf of Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company (Nefflen, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Certified Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 95 Order. Mail sent to Beverly & Bob Armstrong, envelope marked Return to Sender, Unclaimed, Unable to Forward. (dt) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER: Parties' Joint Motion to Amend Order 107 is Granted. The order entered 9/30/2010 106 is amended as follows: The deadline for filing any response to the motion of third-party defendants to dismiss, or alternatively, to remand to state court 104 is extended to 11/23/2010. Any reply, if necessary, shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the response or by 12/7/2010, if the response is filed on 11/23/2010. The file will be forwarded to Judge Nixon, as appropriate, for his consideration of the pending motion, any response, and any reply. After review of the parties' joint mediation report to be filed by 11/12/2010, as provided in the order entered 9/13/2010 95, the file will be forwarded to Judge Nixon, as appropriate, for his consideration of the pending motion, any response, and any reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 10/4/10. (dt) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 106 Order,, by Symetra Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Order (Doc. 106))(Headrick, S.) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER: On 9/30/2010, third-party defendants Bob and Beverly Armstrong filed a motion to dismiss or, alternatively, to remand to state court 104 . In accord with the order entered 5/10/2010 50, any response to the pending motion shall be filed by 10/21/2010. Any reply, if necessary, shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of any response or by 11/4/2010, if the response is filed on 10/21/2010. After review of the parties' joint mediation report to be filed by 11/12/2010, as provided in the order entered 9/13/2010 95, the file will be forwarded to the Honorable John T. Nixon, as appropriate, for his consideration of the pending motion, any response, and any reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 9/30/10. (dt) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of 104 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Third-Party Defendants or, Alternatively, to Remand Case to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Beverly Armstrong, Bob Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment case - salmon v. old nat bank)(Jones, Kenneth) Modified Text on 10/1/2010 (dt). (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Third-Party Defendants or, Alternatively, to Remand Case to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction by Beverly Armstrong, Bob Armstrong. (Jones, Kenneth) Modified Text on 10/1/2010 (dt). (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Certified Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 90 Order. Mail sent to Bob and Beverly Armstrong, envelope marked Return to Sender, Unclaimed, Unable to Forward. (dt) Modified Text on 9/23/2010 (dt). (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Travelers Indemnity's ANSWER to 88 Crossclaim by Symetra, CROSSCLAIM by Travelers Casualty & Surety against Symetra Life Insurance Co. by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TRAV43, # 2 Exhibit TRAV6-10)(Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: The motion filed by third-party defendants for extension of time for response to third-party complaints 100 is GRANTED. The time for third-party defendants Beverly and Bob Armstrong to file responses to the third-party complaints (Docket Entry Nos. 61, 62, and 64 ) is extended to 9/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 9/20/10. (dt) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Beverly Armstrong, Bob Armstrong. (Jones, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Ray Jones, Jr on behalf of Beverly Armstrong, Bob Armstrong (Jones, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Certified Mail Return Receipt Card received this date as to DE #95 mailed to Beverly & Bob Armstrong signed for by B. Armstrong on 9/15/10. (dt) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT addressed to Beverly & Bob Armstrong, 4230 Armstrong Road, Springfield, TN 37172 re 95 Order. (af) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT addressed to Beverly & Bob Armstrong re 95 Order. (af) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER: In accord with the order entered August 30, 2010 (Docket Entry No. 90), defendant Travelers Casualty & Surety Company and Travelers Indemnity Company filed a mediation status report on behalf of all parties in the case, advising the Court that Bob and Beverly Armstrong have retained counsel, and that the parties have scheduled a mediation on November 9, 2010. Third-party defendants Beverly and Bob Armstrong shall ensure that their attorney files a notice of entry of appearance on their behalves as soon as possible. By November 12, 2010, the parties shall file another joint mediation report, confirming that they participated in private mediation on November 9, 2010, and advising whether they were able to reach a settlement, and, if so, when they will file an agreed order or stipulation of dismissal or other dismissal/settlement document, and, if not, whether the potential for settlement remains. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 9/13/10. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(af) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  STATUS REPORT by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER: Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty & Surety Company's Motion for Extension of Time 92 is Granted. The time for defendants Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty & Surety Company to file a response to the cross-claim filed by defendant Symetra Life Insurance Co. 88 is extended to 9/21/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 9/1/10. (dt) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Symetra's Cross-Claim by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re 90 Order.(dt) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: Telephone conference call held on 8/25/10, at which time Mr. Armstrong reported that he believes that they are "very close" to obtaining a lawyer. By 9/10/2010, the parties shall file a status report, advising whether or not Bob and Beverly Armstrong have obtained an attorney and when he/she will enter an appearance on their behalves, if such attorney has not already done so, and when private mediation is scheduled and with whom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/30/10. (dt) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER: Telephone conference held on 8/12/2010 with third-party defendants Beverly and Bob Armstrong and with counsel for the plaintiffs and defendants. Discovery deadline extended to 10/1/2010. Deadline for filing any motions relating to fact discovery is extended to 10/15/2010. All other deadlines provided in the orders entered 5/10/2010 49 and 50 remain in full force and effect. A further telephone conference call is scheduled with counsel for the plaintiffs and defendants and with Beverly and Bob Armstrong on Wednesday, 8/25/2010, at 3:00 p.m., to be arranged by counsel for defendant Pacific Life Insurance Co., to address whether Mr. and Mrs. Armstrong have obtained counsel and, if so, whether or when the parties have scheduled private mediation. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Bob and Beverly Armstrong, 4230 Armstrong Road, Springfield, TN 37172, by regular, first class mail (only). Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/13/10. (xc: Bob and Beverly Armstrong by regular, first class mail)(dt) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CROSSCLAIM against Travelers Indemnity Company, filed by Symetra Life Insurance Co..(dt) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 84 Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file and docket the cross-complaint of defendant Symetra LifeInsurance Company. Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company shall have until 8/31/2010, to file a response to the cross-complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/10/10. (dt) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/12/2010 at 2:00 PM, central time, to be initiated by counsel for defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company, to address the potential for settlement, the parties' plans to engage in mediation, and any other appropriate matters. If third party defendants Bob and Beverly Armstrong have obtained a lawyer to represent them in this case, their lawyer shall participate in the conference call. If they have not yet obtained a lawyer to represent them, counsel for defendant Pacific Life shall insure that they participate in the conference call themselves. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Bob and Beverly Armstrong, by regular, first class mail (only). Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/2/10. (dt) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Settlement/Mediation Status Report by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company(Potter, Thomas) Modified Text on 8/2/2010 (dt). (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Claim Against Travelers Indemnity Company by Symetra Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ebbert, L.) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER: Parties filed a "Settlement/ADR Report" on 7/15/2010 82, in which they advised that they are currently engaged in settlement discussions and "believe that mediation may be beneficial following those efforts." By 7/30/2010, the parties shall file another mediation/status report. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Bob and Beverly Armstrong by regular, first class mail (only). Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/19/10. (xc: Bob and Beverly Armstrong by regular, first class mail.)(dt) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Report of Parties Regarding Mediation Efforts by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company(Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. Beverly Armstrong waiver sent on 6/8/2010; Bob Armstrong waiver sent on 6/8/2010. (Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE by Symetra Life Insurance Co. Notice of Deposition of Robert D. Armstrong (Ebbert, L.) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE by Symetra Life Insurance Co. Notice of Deposition of John D. Armstrong (Ebbert, L.) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE by Symetra Life Insurance Co. Notice of Deposition of Jean Armstrong (Ebbert, L.) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE by Symetra Life Insurance Co. Notice of Deposition of Bob Armstrong (Ebbert, L.) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE by Symetra Life Insurance Co. Notice of Deposition of Beverly Armstrong (Ebbert, L.) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Summons issued as to Beverly Armstrong and Bob Armstrong. (dt) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          SUMMONS returned executed by Pacific Life Insurance Co. Bob Armstrong served on 6/9/10. (Phillips, Joshua) Modified Text on 6/14/2010 (dt). (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            SUMMONS returned executed by Pacific Life Insurance Co. Beverly Armstrong served on 6/9/2010. (Phillips, Joshua) Modified Text on 6/14/2010 (dt). (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              SUMMONS returned executed by Symetra Life Insurance Co.. Beverly Armstrong served on 6/9/2010; Bob Armstrong served on 6/9/2010. (Ebbert, L.) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Symetra Life Insurance Co. re 60 Notice of Appearance (Ebbert, L.) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Summons issued as to Bob Armstrong and Beverly A. Amstrong. (dt) Modified Text on 6/9/2010 (dt). (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Deposition of Robert D. Armstrong (Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Deposition of John D. Armstrong (Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Deposition of Jean Armstrong (Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Deposition of Bob Armstrong (Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Deposition of Beverly Armstrong (Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Amended ANSWER to Complaint and, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Beverly Armstrong, Bob Armstrong by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company.(Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Summons issued as to Beverly Armstrong and Bob Armstrong. (dt) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Beverly Armstrong, Bob Armstrong, filed by Pacific Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B: 1990 Order, # 3 Exhibit C: Confederation Annuity, # 4 Exhibit D: Nations Bank Authorization, # 5 Exhibit E: Adoption Papers, # 6 Exhibit F: Assumption Certificate, # 7 Exhibit G: Pacific Life Payment Records, # 8 Exhibit H: Bob and Beverly Armstrong Correspondence)(Phillips, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bob Armstrong, Beverly Armstrong, filed by Symetra Life Insurance Co..(Ebbert, L.) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by L. Eric Ebbert on behalf of Symetra Life Insurance Co. (Ebbert, L.) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 55 Motion for L. Eric Ebbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/4/10. (dt) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RECEIPT #34675012398 in the amount of $75.00 posted by Baker Donelson Bearman for L. Eric Ebbert, attorney for Symetra Life Insurance Co., re 55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dt) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Lee Eric Ebbert from the United States District Court for the Eastern of Tennessee filed by Symetra Life Insurance Co.. (dt) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of L. Eric Ebbert in support of 55 MOTION for attorney(s) Lee Eric Ebbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid on 6/2/10) by Symetra Life Insurance Co.. (dt) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MOTION for attorney(s) Lee Eric Ebbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid on 6/2/10) by Symetra Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(dt) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint 53 is Granted. The defendants have leave to file a third party complaint against Robert and Beverly Armstrong. However, the defendants shall file the third party complaints no later than June 8, 2010, and shall effect service upon the third party defendants as expeditiously as possible, so that they can beserved and have the opportunity to obtain counsel prior to the depositions scheduled on July 7-9, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 6/2/10. (dt) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaints by Pacific Life Insurance Co., Symetra Life Insurance Co., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave)(Phillips, Joshua) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 51 Motion to Substitute Party. Travelers Casualty & Surety Company and Travelers Indemnity Company added. Aetna Casualty & Surety Co. and St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/17/10. (dt) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Substitute Party by Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Substitution)(Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Counsel for the parties called the Court on 4/26/10, at which time the following matters were addressed: On 7/15/10, the parties shall file a joint mediation report. In consultation with Judge Nixon's office, a Jury Trial is set for 5/31/2011 at 9:00 AM. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/13/2011. Pretrial Conference is set for 5/20/2011 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 5/13/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/10/10. (dt) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 9/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2011 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/10/10. (dt) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Symetra Life Insurance Co. (Headrick, S.) Modified Text on 4/26/2010 (dt). (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Counsel for the parties shall convene a Telephone Conference all with the Court on 4/26/2010 at 3:00 PM, central time, to be initiated by counsel for Symetra, to address extended deadlines, a new trial date, whether the names of any of the defendants should be revised, whether Structured Benefits of Florida is a separate defendant, the potential for settlement, propriety of ADR, and any other appropriate matters. Prior to 4/26/2010, counsel for the parties shall confer with each other to determine if they can agree upon proposed extended scheduling deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/12/10. (dt) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Defendants failed to demonstrate the absence of a genuine issue of material fact regarding any of Plaintiffs' claims in the instant matter. For the reasons stated within this order, the Court Denies Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 30 . Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 4/1/10. (dt) (Attachment(s): # 1 Text Search Order) (dt). Modified Text on 4/8/2010 (dt). (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER:The parties' joint motion to cancel deadlines and settings 44 is GRANTED. The deadlines provided in the orders entered November 13, 2008 26 - 27 will be extended as appropriate after the resolution of the pending motion for summary judgment 44 . The Court assumes that the parties also sought cancellation of the pretrial conference and trial. Therefore, in consultation with the office of the Honorable John T. Nixon, the pretrial conference and trial, scheduled on 3/26/2010, and 4/6/2010, respectively, are CANCELLED, and will be rescheduled upon resolution of the pending motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 1/20/10. (dt) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Cancel Deadlines and Settings Set Out in the Current Case Management Order by Symetra Life Insurance Co., Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co., Robert D. Armstrong, Pacific Life Insurance Co., John D. Armstrong. (Plotkin, Emily) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Court is currently considering Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Parties' Joint Motion to Ascertain Status 40 is Granted. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 11/17/09. (dt) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 41 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. Deadline for Completion of all Discovery is extended to 2/12/10. Except as modified herein, the orders entered 11/12/2008 26 - 27 remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 11/6/09. (dt) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Symetra Life Insurance Co., Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co., Robert D. Armstrong, Pacific Life Insurance Co., John D. Armstrong. (Plotkin, Emily) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Ascertain Status of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re 30 by Symetra Life Insurance Co., Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co., Robert D. Armstrong, Pacific Life Insurance Co., John D. Armstrong. (Plotkin, Emily) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert D. Armstrong. (Long, Fletcher) Modified Text on 3/18/2009 (dt). (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 32 STATEMENT of Undisputed Material Facts filed by Robert D. Armstrong and John D. Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Previous Order from Chancery and affidavit of Mr. Armstrong)(Long, Fletcher) Modified Text on 3/18/2009 (dt). (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The plaintiffs' two identical motions for extension of time 35 and 36 are GRANTED. The time for the plaintiffs to respond to the pending motion of defendant Travelers Indemnity Company for summary judgment 30 is extended to 3/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 2/19/09. (dt) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by John D. Armstrong. (Long, Fletcher) Modified Text on 2/19/2009 (dt). (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Robert D. Armstrong. (Long, Fletcher) Modified Text on 2/19/2009 (dt). (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT SETTLEMENT-CONFERENCE REPORT by St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co.(Potter, Thomas) Modified Text on 2/23/2009 (dt). (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: On 2/6/09, defendant Travelers Indemnity Company filed a Motion for Summary Judgment 30 . In accord with the order entered 11/13/08 27, any response shall be filed by 2/20/09. Any reply, if necessary, shall be filed within 2 weeks of the filing of the response. The Clerk is directed to forward the file in this case to Judge Nixon for his consideration of the motion for summary judgment filed by defendant Travelers and accompanying filings (Docket Entry Nos. 30-32), the plaintiffs' response to be filed by 2/20/09, and the reply, if necessary, to be filed no later than 3/6/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 2/6/09. (dt) Modified Text on 2/9/2009 (dt). (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of Undisputed Material Facts filed by Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., Symetra Life Insureance Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co., Pacific Life Insurance Co. in support of 31 Memorandum in Support, 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s Supporting Statement of Facts for MSJ)(Potter, Thomas) Modified Text on 2/9/2009 (dt). (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., Pacific Life Insurance Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co. and Symetra Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Singer Asset Decision)(Potter, Thomas) Modified Text on 2/9/2009 (dt). (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pacific Life Insurance Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co., Symetra Life Insurance Co. and Aetna Casualty & Surety Co. (Potter, Thomas) Modified Text on 2/9/2009 (dt). (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 28 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Reid Daniel Leitner terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 1/5/09. (dt) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Notice of Appearance by Pacific Life Insurance Co.. (Phillips, Joshua) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: By contemporaneously entered order, the Court has approved and entered the parties' proposed case management order, with modifications addressed at the initial case management conference held on 11/10/08. Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 3/2/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2009. In consultation with Judge Nixon's Office, a Jury Trial set for 4/6/2010 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2010 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 11/12/08. (dt) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 11/10/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 11/12/08. (dt) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Symetra Life Insurance Co..(Plotkin, Emily) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co.. (Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint filed by Pacific Life Insurance Co. (Leitner, Reid) Modified Text on 11/5/2008 (dt). (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECEIPT #34675-4720 in the amount of $75.00 posted by Leitner Williams Dooley for Jenifer Smith, attorney for Pacific Life Insurance Co., re 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dt) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co..(Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 15 Motion for Stephen R. Harris and Jenifer N. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 10/28/08. (dt) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RECEIPT #34675-4567 in the amount of $75.00 posted by Leitner Williams Dolley for Stephen R. Harris, attorney for Pacific Life Insurance Co., re 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dt) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Pacific Life Insurance Co. in support of 15 MOTION for attorney Stephen R. Harris and Jenifer N. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company)(Leitner, Reid) Modified Text on 10/16/2008 (dt). (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Jenifer N. Smith from the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by Pacific Life Insurance Co.. (Leitner, Reid) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Stephen R. Harris from the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by Pacific Life Insurance Co.. (Leitner, Reid) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for attorney Stephen R. Harris and Jenifer N. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company by Pacific Life Insurance Co.. **PHV FEE PAID on 10/17/08 and 10/30/08** (Leitner, Reid) Modified Text on 10/16/2008 (dt). Modified Text on 11/3/2008 (dt). (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The motion of defendants identified as St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co. and Aetna Casualty & Surety Company for an extension 11 and the motion of defendant Symetra Life Insurance Company for an extension 12 are GRANTED. These defendants shall have until 11/6/08, to file a response to the plaintiffs' complaint. Prior to the Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/08, at 1:00 p.m., counsel for the parties shall confer and shall prepare a proposed, joint initial case management order. Counsel shall e-file the proposed order prior to the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 10/14/08. (dt) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Removal filed 10/9/08 10, the Clerk is directed to terminate Michael J. Miller as counsel for defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company. Attorney Michael J. Miller terminated. Once Stephen R. Harris files a motion for admission pro hac vice, together with a certificate of good standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court to which he is admitted and a $75.00 pro hac vice admission fee, Mr. Harris will be added as counsel for defendant Pacific Life. Ms. Smith and Mr. Leitner are currently listed as counsel for defendant Pacific Life. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 10/9/08. (dt) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Symetra Life Insurance Co.. (Plotkin, Emily) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co.. (Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Pacific Life Insurance Co. Notice of Removal of Michael J. Miller as Counsel for Defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company (Leitner, Reid) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co.. (Potter, Thomas) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Defendant Pacific Life Insurance Company's Motion for Extension 4 is Granted. Pacific Life Insurance Co. response to the complaint is due by 11/6/2008. By notice issued contemporaneously with the filing of the Notice of Removal, the initial case management conference was scheduled on 11/10/08, at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. The stay of discovery is Lifted. Prior to the initial case management conference, counsel for the parties shall confer and shall prepare a proposed, joint initial case management order. Counsel shall e-file the proposed order prior to the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 10/6/08. (dt) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Clerk to Atty Jennifer Smith re Compliance with Local Rule 83.01. (dt) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Clerk to Atty Michael J. Miller re Compliance with Local Rule 83.01. (dt) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pacific Life Insurance Co.. (Leitner, Reid) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Responsive Pleading by Pacific Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Pacific Life's Motion for Extension to Respond)(Leitner, Reid) Modified Text on 10/7/2008 (dt). (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday 11/10/2008 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. (eh) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE from USDC Clerk regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement requirement (eh) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Symetra Life Insurance Co., Aetna Casualty & Surety Co., St. Paul Travelers Casualty & Surety Co., Pacific Life Insurance Co. from Circuit Court for Robertson County, Tennessee, case number 12357.Filing fee paid $350. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Original Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eh) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?