FRISBEY v. TENNECO PACKAGING, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00508-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo WALTER D. FRISBEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOSEPH J. MASTER +1 856 227 7220
No Logo TENNECO PACKAGING CORP., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
v.
No Logo Abc Corporation, Defendant
No Logo DEF PARTNERSHIP, Defendant
No Logo GHI COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo TENNECO PACKAGING CORP., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
No Logo WALTER D. FRISBEY, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOSEPH J. MASTER +1 856 227 7220
Office Camden
Filed 2/2/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Gloucester
Terminated 4/11/2000
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case GLO-L-2112-99[SUP.CT.GLO.CNTY.]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and without costs (jm1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 4/11/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jm1)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER removing case from The Arbitration Program. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) n.m. (lc)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 8/7/00 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 10/30/00 Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 9:30 12/14/00 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (lc)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Case No Longer Referred to Arbitration
          CASE WITHDRAWN from Arbitration. (lc)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Scheduling Conference
            Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3.7.00. (lc)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by TENNECO PACKAGING against WALTER D. FRISBEY (lc)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER, set scheduling conference for 11:00 3/7/00 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER (js)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Case Referred to Arbitration
                    CASE REFERRED to arbitration (js)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT, by TENNECO PACKAGING CORP. (js)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT filed in Superior Court Gloucester County on or about November 30, 1999, docket #GLO-L-2112-99; jury demand (js)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Notice of Removal
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TENNECO PACKAGING CORP. Filed with the following state court proceedings, A]Complaint. FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 248450 (js)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 55 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?