Robey v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-00190

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 5, 2019 at 10:28 AM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Memorandum and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Continue Other
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Recommendations
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER denying without prejudice 89 Motion for Reconsideration; defendant shall have (20) days to answer or respond to Amended Complaint; terminating as moot 91 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 2/5/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/16/2019. (tmg)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Limited AdmissionCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting 83 Motion for Limited Admission; granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to obtain local counsel. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order to obtain local counsel, establish the required association and to cause to be filed a motion to appear pro hac vice.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/12/2018. (eef)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Limited Admission
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None case transferred in - district transfer
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?