JALEEL v. WHITAKER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02862

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 1:29 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MOHAMMED JALEEL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer E Nimer +1 614 451 3232 +1 614 451 3222 jnimer@cair.com
v.
No Logo CARL RISCH, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo KATHERINE HADDA, Defendant
No Logo KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, Defendant
No Logo MATTHEW WHITAKER, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MIKE POMPEO"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
          PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5825409) filed by MOHAMMED JALEEL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Passport Bio Page, # 2 Exhibit I-129 Approval Notice, # 3 Exhibit I-140 Approval Notice, # 4 Exhibit 221(g) Refusal, # 5 Exhibit DS-5535 Request from Consulate, # 6 Exhibit DS-5535 Receipt Confirmation from Consulate, # 7 Exhibit Plaintiff's 3 Visa Stamps, # 8 Exhibit Inquiry from AMM to Consulate, # 9 Exhibit Inquiry from AMM to Congressman and Senator, # 10 Exhibit CEAC Online Case Status, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons US Attorney DC Summons, # 13 Summons US AG Summons, # 14 Summons Ass. Sec for Consular Affairs Summons, # 15 Summons Sec of State Summons, # 16 Summons Sec of Homeland Security Summons, # 17 Summons CG Summons, # 18 Summons Consular Officers Summons)(Nimer, Jennifer)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 3 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?