Maitland v. Pompeo
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04604

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 12, 2020 at 4:36 PM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rogelio Maitland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Edward Menn +1 832 654 2948 +1 713 780 2352 stephen_menn@sbcglobal.net
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R. Pompeo"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 451
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for New Trial
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None New Trial
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Final
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/29/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Initial Disclosures
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Designation of Expert Witness List
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Order for Initial Conference - FORMCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT against Michael R. Pompeo (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21417774) filed by Rogelio Maitland.(Menn, Stephen)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Summons Issued as to Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(gclair, 4)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?