United States v. Owens
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00693-RMB-1

Tags
Last Updated May 27, 2021 at 3:40 PM DT (3.3 weeks ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristy Jean Greenberg +1 212 637 2469 kristy.greenberg@usdoj.gov
Space Michael Parker +1 703 299 3700 michael.parker@usdoj.gov
Space Sarah Elizabeth Paul +1 212 637 2326 +1 212 637 2937 sarah.paul2@usdoj.gov
Space Nathan Martin Rehn +1 212 637 2354 +1 212 637 2527 nathan.rehn@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Ramses Owens, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy M Iandolo +1 718 305 1702 +1 718 395 1732 iandololaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrillo &Carrillo, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charlie Ezra Carrillo +1 202 808 4074 +1 301 576 4453 charlie@carrillobrux.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Ramses Owens (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/27/2018
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F ATTEMPT AND CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT TAX EVASION
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956-4999.F MONEY LAUNDERING - FRAUD, OTHER
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Petition in Response to Forfeiture Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Remark
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Reply Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Response to motionCourt Filing
                            LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs Eun Young Choi and Thane Rehn and Trial Attorneys Michael Parker and Parker Tobin dated December 23, 2019 re: [174] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from William Burck dated Dec. 20, 2019 re: Adjournment of Trial Date .. Exclusion of Speedy Trial Time, and Extension of Date for Motion to Dismiss Opposition and Reply (Choi, Eun Young)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Sealed document
                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Sealed document
                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Sealed document
                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Richard Gaffey (3), Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz (4) granting [150] JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Thane Rehn dated December 6, 2019 re: Scheduling Arraignment. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. Time excluded under Speedy Trial Act. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/9/2019) (ap)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Sealed document
                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019, Terminated: 12/9/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                        JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Thane Rehn dated December 6, 2019 re: Scheduling Arraignment . Document filed by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Rehn, Nathan)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                          MEMO ENDORSEDgranting [145] LETTER MOTION Scheduling Arraignment as to Ramses Owens (1), Dirk Brauer (2), Richard Gaffey (3), Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz (4)...ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Time is excluded pursuant to the speedy trial act for the reasons set forth in this letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/22/19) (jbo)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019, Terminated: 11/22/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                            JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Thane Rehn dated November 21, 2019 re: Scheduling Arraignment . Document filed by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Rehn, Nathan)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: 11/14/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ramses Owens. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/6/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: 11/14/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ramses Owens re: Conference held on 11/6/19 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                  NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: Notice to Attorney Rehn, Nathan to RE-FILE Document [140] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/9/2019, Entered: 11/9/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz re [139] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from William Burck dated Nov. 8, 2019 re: to request clarification of the Court's scheduling order, Dkt. No. [138] .. (Rehn, Nathan) Modified on 11/12/2019 (ka).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 138 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. As discussed at today's conference, the Court hereby attaches a chart setting forth the Government's disclosures and time frames in response to the motions filed by Richard Gaffey, dated April 11, 2019 and May 7, 2019, that were joined in by Harald Joachim von der Goltz by letters, dated April 15, 2019 and May 7, 2019 respectively. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/6/2019)(bw)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Oral Argument
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Oral Argument as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz held on 11/6/2019. AUSA Thane Rehn, Eun Young Choi, Parker Tobin and Michael Parker present; Defendant von der Goltz present with attorneys William Burck and Daniel Koffmann; Defendant Gaffey present with attorneys William Lovett and Robert Buehler; Court Reporter Eve Giniger present; conference/oral argument held on outstanding motions; see transcript of proceedings held for a complete record; next conference is scheduled for 1/6/20. (lnl)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Ramses Owens regarding the application of the Fugitive Disentitlement Doctrine. (Carrillo, Charlie)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                            NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ramses Owens: Notice to Attorney Carrillo, Charlie to RE-FILE Document [136] Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support(non-motion) found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/2/2019, Entered: 11/2/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition
                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Ramses Owens regarding the application of the Fugitive Disentitlement Doctrine. (Carrillo, Charlie) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ka).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Memorandum of Law
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz re: [128] Status Report filed by Ramses Owens . (Parker, Michael)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 response
                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz re: [128] Status Report filed by Ramses Owens . (Parker, Michael) Modified on 10/31/2019 (ka).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: Notice to Attorney Parker, Michael to RE-FILE Document [134] Response. Use the event type Memorandum of Law(non-motion) found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. The Government is directed to respond to the "Status Report" filed by Defendant Owens on October 23, 2019, Docket Number 128, with respect to the question of whether Owens is entitled to litigate any outstanding motions in this Court, at this time, pursuant to the fugitive disentitlement doctrine. The Government's response is due by Thursday, October 31, 2019, at noon. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/29/19)(jbo)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: Responses due by 10/31/2019. (jbo)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. The oral argument in this matter is rescheduled from 9:00 am on October 29, 2019 to 11:00 am on November 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/28/2019)(dif)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  terminate deadlines and hearings
                                                                            Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: 10/29/2019 Status Conference terminted. (lnl)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: Oral Argument set for 11/6/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.. (dif)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 129 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Status report
                                                                                STATUS REPORT PERTAINING TO DOC. 95 by Ramses Owens. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Carrillo, Charlie)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Status report
                                                                                STATUS REPORT REGARDING DOC. 121 by Ramses Owens. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Carrillo, Charlie)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. The conference is rescheduled from 11:00 am on October 16, 2019 to 9:00 am October 29, 2019 in light of the previously scheduled oral argument on October 29, 2019. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/15/19)(jbo)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: Status Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (jbo)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: The oral argument in this matter is rescheduled from 10:00 am on October 29, 2019 to 9:00 am on October 29, 2019. (Oral Argument set for 10/29/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/18/2019) (lnl)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz re: [110] MOTION Application of the Crime Fraud Exception and Waiver of the Attorney-Client Privilege . . (Rehn, Nathan)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. The Court is rescheduling the oral argument (15 minutes per side) on the outstanding motions from Thursday, September 19, 2019 at 12:30 pm to Tuesday, October 29, 2019 at 10:00 am. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/5/2019)(bw)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSED granting [120] LETTER MOTION Extension of Time to File Reply as to Ramses Owens (1), Dirk Brauer (2), Richard Gaffey (3), Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz (4)...ENDORSEMENT: On consent of the Defendants, the Government's request for an extension to extension to file its reply in support of the Government's Motion for Application of the Crime-Fraud Exception and Waiver of the Attorney-Client Privilege (Dkt. No. 110) to September 10, 2019 is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/3/19) (jbo)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ramses Owens (1), Dirk Brauer (2), Richard Gaffey (3), Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz (4) granting [119] CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from William Burck dated Aug. 29, 2019 re: Request for Adjournment of Sept. 16, 2019 Hearing. ENDORSEMENT: Adj. to 9/19/19 @ 12:30. If Owens' counsel is seeking to obtain permission for client to appear in NYC, they should meet & confer with Govt ASAP & seek to arrange prior to 9/19. 4 (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/3/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: Replies due by 9/10/2019. (jbo)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: Oral Argument set for 9/19/2019 at 12:30 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (ap)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019, Terminated: 9/3/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Thane Rehn dated August 30, 2019 re: [110] MOTION Application of the Crime Fraud Exception and Waiver of the Attorney-Client Privilege . re: Extension of Time to File Reply . Document filed by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Rehn, Nathan)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019, Terminated: 9/3/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                        CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from William Burck dated Aug. 29, 2019 re: Request for Adjournment of Sept. 16, 2019 Hearing . Document filed by Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Burck, William)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Ramses Owens as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz re [110] MOTION Application of the Crime Fraud Exception and Waiver of the Attorney-Client Privilege .. (Carrillo, Charlie)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: The Court will hold oral argument (15 minutes per side) on the outstanding motions on Monday, September 16, 2019 at 9:30 am. (Oral Argument set for 9/16/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 8/28/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER by Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from William Burck dated Aug. 28, 2019 re: Government's Motion, Dkt. No. [110] Document filed by Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE to Motion by Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz re: [110] MOTION Application of the Crime Fraud Exception and Waiver of the Attorney-Client Privilege .. (Burck, William) Modified on 8/28/2019 (ka).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz: Notice to Attorney Burck, William to RE-FILE Document [115] Response to Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. New Address: Hogan Lovells US LLP, 125 High Street, Suite 2010, Boston, Massachusetts, United States of America 02110, 617-371-1000. (Lovett, William)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                      AFFIRMATION of Thane Rehn in Support by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz re [110] MOTION Application of the Crime Fraud Exception and Waiver of the Attorney-Client Privilege .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Rehn, Nathan)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                        MOTION Application of the Crime Fraud Exception and Waiver of the Attorney-Client Privilege . Document filed by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Rehn, Nathan)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019, Terminated: 8/13/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Thane Rehn dated August 12, 2019 re: Adjournment of Trial Date . Document filed by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Rehn, Nathan)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ramses Owens as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Jeremy M. Iandolo and Charlie Carrillo dated June 17, 2019 re [95] SECOND LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Jeremy Iandolo dated May 30, 2019 re: Amended Letter Motion to Exclude Evidence .. AMENDED REPLY TO THE GOVERNMENTS OPPOSITION (Iandolo, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ramses Owens addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Jeremy M. Iandolo and Charlie Carrillo dated June 17, 2019 re [95] SECOND LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Jeremy Iandolo dated May 30, 2019 re: Amended Letter Motion to Exclude Evidence .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Resolution May 15, 2018, # (2) Exhibit Status Conference Dec 17, 2018, # (3) Exhibit Proceeding from Magistrate to National Imm Serv., # (4) Exhibit Proceeding from Magistrate to General Director, # (5) Exhibit Proceeding from Secretary to Second Pros., # (6) Exhibit Articles, # (7) Exhibit MLAT US PANAMA)(Iandolo, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/29/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz re: Conference held on 5/29/19 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Ramses Owens addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Parker Tobin dated June 7, 2019 re: [94] FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Ramses Owens dated May 28, 2019 re: Request to Appear and Participate in the Status Conference Scheduled for May 29, 2019 ., [95] SECOND LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Jeremy Iandolo dated May 30, 2019 re: Amended Letter Motion to Exclude Evidence .. (Tobin, Parker)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz re [74] MOTION to Compel the Government to Identify the Documents It Intends to Use at Trial.. (Rehn, Nathan)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      SECOND LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Jeremy Iandolo dated May 30, 2019 re: Amended Letter Motion to Exclude Evidence . Document filed by Ramses Owens as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Attorney Marcela Arauz Quintero)(Iandolo, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Ramses Owens, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz held on 5/29/2019. AUSAs Thane Rehn, Eun Young Choi, Parker Tobin and Michael Parker present; Defendant von der Goltz present with defense attorneys William Burck and Daniel Koffmann; Defendant Gaffey not present; Defense counsel for Gaffey William Lovett and Robert Buehler present; Defense counsel Iandolo and Carrillo present for defendant Ramses Owens; Court Reporter Jennifer Thun present; conference held re: motions; government to produce documents by 6/7/19; defense motion to suppress to be filed by 7/8/19; government response is due 8/5/19; defense reply by 8/16/19; government to submit letter by 7/19/19 re: proposed schedule for crime fraud exception; defense counsel for von der Goltz to file a letter re: proposed motion to dismiss; government to respond to letter from Owens counsel by 6/7/19; see transcript of proceedings held on 5/29/19 for a complete record. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 94 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: 5/28/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Ramses Owens dated May 28, 2019 re: Request to Appear and Participate in the Status Conference Scheduled for May 29, 2019 . Document filed by Ramses Owens as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit ATTORNEY MARCELA ARAUZ QUINTERO)(Iandolo, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz on re: [90] LETTER MOTION filed by USA addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Thane Rehn dated May 22, 2019 re: Request to Re-Schedule Status Conference. The Government respectfully submits this letter in response to the Court's order dated May 21, 2019, setting a conference for May 28, 2019, at 9:15 a.m. Dkt. No. 89. The undersigned attorney is not available on that date. ENDORSEMENT: Conference is adjourned to May 29, 2019 at 12:00 noon. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/22/2019)(bw)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019, Terminated: 5/22/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Thane Rehn dated May 22, 2019 re: Request to Re-Schedule Status Conference . Document filed by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Rehn, Nathan)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Thane Rehn dated May 21, 2019 re: Request to Set Pretrial Motion Schedule . Document filed by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Rehn, Nathan)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/9/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs Eun Young Choi and Thane Rehn, and Trial Attorneys Michael Parker and Parker Tobin dated May 9, 2019 re: [74] MOTION to Compel the Government to Identify the Documents It Intends to Use at Trial. re: Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Compel the Government to Identify the Documents It Intends to Use at Trial . Document filed by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Choi, Eun Young)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Eun Young Choi appearing for USA. (Choi, Eun Young)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/12/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz re: Conference held on 3/12/19 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Sarah E. Paul dated 4-17-2019 re: [59] MOTION for Bill of Particulars . re: Extension of Time to Respond . Document filed by USA as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Paul, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 48 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Belmont Buehler appearing for Richard Gaffey. Appearance Type: Retained. (Buehler, Robert) Modified on 12/19/2018 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [13] Motion for William J. Lovett to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ramses Owens. The motion of William J. Lovett for admission to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned matter is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above-captioned litigation in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/17/18) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Parker Reid Tobin, I appearing for USA. (Tobin, Parker)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [14] Motion for Shaun Donnelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ramses Owens (1), Dirk Brauer (2), Richard Gaffey (3), Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz (4). The motion of Shaun Donnelly for admission to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned matter is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned litigation in the US District Court for the Southern District of NY. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/17/18) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018, Terminated: 12/17/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Shaun Donnelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16058760. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Richard Gaffey as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Shaun Donnelly, # (2) Ceritficate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Donnelly, Shaun)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018, Terminated: 12/17/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for William J. Lovett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16058624. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Richard Gaffey as to Ramses Owens. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of William J. Lovett, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Lovett, William)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael Parker appearing for USA. (Parker, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [14] MOTION for Shaun Donnelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16058760. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [13] MOTION for William J. Lovett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16058624. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [14] MOTION for Shaun Donnelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16058760. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [13] MOTION for William J. Lovett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16058624. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeremy M Iandolo appearing for Ramses Owens. Appearance Type: Retained. (Iandolo, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charlie Ezra Carrillo appearing for Ramses Owens. Appearance Type: Retained. (Carrillo, Charlie)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kristy Jean Greenberg appearing for USA. (Greenberg, Kristy)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3, Sealed Defendant 4. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/4/18)(jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Paul,Nathan Martin Rehn for USA added. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                        Case as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz ASSIGNED to Judge Richard M. Berman. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Designated ECF as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Ramses Owens, Dirk Brauer, Richard Gaffey, Harald Joachim Von Der Goltz. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 2, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 3, 4, 5, 6-9, Sealed Defendant 4 (4) count(s) 3, 4, 5, 6-9, 10-11. (Attachments: # (1) indictment part 2) (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?